Delaware District Court
Judge:Jennifer L Hall
Case #: 1:24-cv-00641
Nature of Suit320 Torts - Personal Injury - Assault, Libel, & Slander
Cause28:1446 Petition for Removal
Case Filed:May 30, 2024
Case in other court:DE Superior Court, N24C-05-00262 FJJ
Last checked: Tuesday Nov 26, 2024 3:26 AM EST
Defendant
Fox 11 Los Angeles
Represented By
John Leonard Reed
Dla Piper LLP
contact info
Defendant
Fox 13 Tampa
Represented By
John Leonard Reed
Dla Piper LLP
contact info
Defendant
Fox 29 Philadelphia
Represented By
John Leonard Reed
Dla Piper LLP
contact info
Defendant
Fox 35 Orlando
Represented By
John Leonard Reed
Dla Piper LLP
contact info
Defendant
Fox 5 Atlanta
Represented By
John Leonard Reed
Dla Piper LLP
contact info
Defendant
Fox Business
Represented By
John Leonard Reed
Dla Piper LLP
contact info
Defendant
Fox Corporation
Represented By
John Leonard Reed
Dla Piper LLP
contact info
Defendant
Megan Henney
Represented By
John Leonard Reed
Dla Piper LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Allison Baver
131 Continental Dr., Suite 305
Newark, DE 19713


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, May 02, 2025
30 30 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Fri 05/02 2:21 PM
ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's requests to remand this case and to direct the Superior Court of Delaware to correct its docket (D.I.11 ) are DENIED. Plaintiff's request for an extension of time to properly effect service of the amended complaint (D.I.11 ,12 ) is GRANTED-IN-PART. Plaintiff is ordered to perfect service on all named Defendants in accordance with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the Local Rules, and Court Order on or before June 6, 2025. Plaintiff is warned that failure to timely serve a Defendant will result in dismissal of the claim(s) against that Defendant. Plaintiff's remaining pending motions (D.I.21 ,25 ,29 ) are DENIED. Signed by Judge Jennifer L. Hall on 5/2/2025. ***Copy mailed to Pro Se Plaintiff on 5/2/2025*** (ceg)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 04, 2025
29 29 respm Reply to Response to Motion Fri 04/04 1:01 PM
REPLY to RESPONSE to Motion D.I.25 MOTION to Strike22 Response to Motion filed by Allison Baver.(mrr)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A-J,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order,
Att: 3 Certificate of Service,
Att: 4 Envelope
Tuesday, March 18, 2025
28 28 order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Tue 03/18 8:10 AM
ORAL ORDER: Having reviewed Plaintiff's motion for an extension of time (D.I.27 ), IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. On or before April 4, 2025, Plaintiff shall file a reply to Defendant's Opposition to the Motion to Strike. Ordered by Judge Jennifer L. Hall on 3/18/2025. ***Copy mailed to Pro Se Plaintiff on 3/18/2025*** (ceg)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 14, 2025
27 27 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Fri 03/14 3:43 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Reply as to D.I.26 RESPONSE to Motion re25 MOTION to Strike22 Response to Motion, Fox Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff's Rule 12(f) Motion to Strike - filed by Allison Baver.(oam)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A-B,
Att: 2 Certificate of Service,
Att: 3 Envelope
Friday, March 07, 2025
26 26 respm Response to Motion Fri 03/07 11:54 AM
RESPONSE to Motion re25 MOTION to Strike22 Response to Motion, Fox Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff's Rule 12(f) Motion to Strike , filed by Fox Corporation, Fox News Network, LLC, Megan Henney. Related [+] Modified docket text on 3/7/2025 (ceg)
Related: [-] ed, John
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Friday, February 21, 2025
25 25 motion Strike Fri 02/21 2:08 PM
MOTION to Strike Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Entry of Default (D.I.22 ) - filed by Allison Baver.(mpb)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order,
Att: 3 Certificate of Service,
Att: 4 Envelope
24 24 respm Reply to Response to Motion Fri 02/21 2:02 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re21 REQUEST for Default as to Fox Corporation, Fox News Network, LLC, Megan Henney - filed by Allison Baver.(mpb)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Wednesday, February 12, 2025
23 23 misc Mail Returned Wed 02/12 2:43 PM
Return of courtesy copies of D.I.20 ,21 , sent to Allison Baver. Reason for return: Return to sender, not deliverable as addressed, unable to forward. (scs)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 10, 2025
22 22 respm Response to Motion Mon 02/10 4:11 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re21 REQUEST for Default as to Fox Corporation, Fox News Network, LLC, Megan Henney Defendants' Opposition To Plaintiff's Motion For Entry Of Default filed by Megan Henney, Fox Corporation, Fox News Network, LLC. Related [+]
Related: [-] ed, John
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Monday, January 27, 2025
21 21 motion Default (Request for Clerk's Entry of Default) Mon 01/27 10:34 AM
REQUEST for Default as to Fox Corporation, Fox News Network, LLC, Megan Henney - filed by Allison Baver.(mpb)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A-G,
Att: 2 Envelope
20 20 respm Brief - Reply Mon 01/27 10:17 AM
REPLY to D.I.17 Defendant's Opposition To Plaintiff's Response to Show Cause Order - filed by Allison Baver.(mpb)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A-G,
Att: 2 Envelope
Friday, December 27, 2024
19 19 order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Fri 12/27 10:01 AM
ORDER granting D.I.18 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to D.I.17 Response to Order filed by Allison Baver. Reply due 1/27/2025. Ordered by Judge Jennifer L. Hall on 12/27/2024. (twk)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 26, 2024
18 18 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Thu 12/26 10:58 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to D.I.17 Response to Order. - filed by Allison Baver.(mrr)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Monday, December 16, 2024
17 17 respm Response to Order Mon 12/16 10:02 AM
RESPONSE to Order re 10 Order,5 Order to Show Cause, Defendant's Opposition To Plaintiff's Response to Show Cause Order filed by Megan Henney, Fox Corporation, Fox News Network, LLC. Related [+] Modified on 12/16/2024 (ceg)
Related: [-] ed, John
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Certificate of Service
utility Add Attorneys - PHV only Mon 12/16 8:29 AM
Pro Hac Vice Attorney Patrick F. Philbin for Fox Corporation, Fox News Network, LLC, Megan Henney added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (scs)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 13, 2024
utility - CORRECTING ENTRY Fri 12/13 7:31 AM
CORRECTING ENTRY: The certificate of service filed at D.I. 16 has been removed from the docket. The filing was incompletely formatted. The filing lacked a proper case caption. Counsel is to refile the certificate of service accordingly. (ceg)
Related: [-]
order SO ORDERED Fri 12/13 2:06 PM
SO ORDERED, re14 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Patrick F. Philbin filed by Megan Henney, Fox Corporation, Fox News Network, LLC. Ordered by Judge Jennifer L. Hall on 12/13/2024. ***Copy mailed to Pro Se Plaintiff on 12/13/2024*** (ceg)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 12, 2024
16 16 service Certificate of Service Thu 12/12 7:24 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Motion and Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice and Certification By Counsel to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (Patrick F. Philbin) by Megan Henney, Fox Corporation, Fox News Network, LLC re Deficiency Notice,14 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Patrick F. Philbin Related [+]
Related: [-] ed, John
15 15 misc -District Court Pro Hac Vice Fee - 01 Attorney Credit Card Payment Thu 12/12 3:13 PM
Pro Hac Vice Fee - Credit Card Payment received for Patrick F. Philbin. ( Payment of $ 50, receipt number ADEDC-4569000) Related [+]
Related: [-] ed, John
14 14 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 12/12 3:01 PM
MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Patrick F. Philbin - filed by Megan Henney, Fox Corporation, Fox News Network, LLC. Related [+]
Related: [-] ed, John
Att: 1 Certification by Counsel to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice of Patrick F. Philbin
13 13 misc Letter Thu 12/12 12:29 PM
Letter to The Honorable Jennifer L. Hall from John L. Reed, Esq regarding Defendants' intention to file a short response to Plaintiff's December 11, 2024 response to the Court's November 27, 2024 Order to Show Cause - re11 Response to Order. Related [+]
Related: [-] ed, John
misc Deficiency Notice Thu 12/12 3:17 PM
DEFICIENCY NOTICE by the Court issued to Defendants re14 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. This filing does not comply with Local Rule 5.2(b)(1). Defendants are directed to supplement the docket accordingly with a certificate of service. (ceg)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 11, 2024
12 12 cmp Complaint - Amended Wed 12/11 11:38 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Fox Corporation, Megan Henney, Fox News Network, LLC- filed by Allison Baver.(mpb)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
11 11 respm Response to Order Wed 12/11 10:52 AM
RESPONSE to D.I. 10 Oral Order - filed by Allison Baver.(mpb)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A-D,
Att: 2 Envelope
Wednesday, November 27, 2024
10 10 order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Wed 11/27 2:00 PM
ORAL ORDER: Having reviewed Plaintiff's motion for an extension of time (D.I.9 ), IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED in part. On or before December 11, 2024, Plaintiff shall show cause why this case should not be dismissed for failure to effect service on Defendants. Ordered by Judge Jennifer L. Hall on 11/27/2024. ***Copy mailed to Pro Se Plaintiff on 11/27/2024*** (ceg) Modified on 11/27/2024 (ceg)
Related: [-]
utility - CORRECTING ENTRY Wed 11/27 2:04 PM
CORRECTING ENTRY: The docket text for the Oral Order found at D.I. 10 has been modified to reflect the motion has been GRANTED in part. The NEF has been regenerated. (ceg)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 26, 2024
9 9 motion Extension of Time to File Document Wed 11/27 10:25 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time to Show Cause per D.I.7 - filed by Allison Baver.(mrr)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Envelope
Wednesday, November 13, 2024
utility Remark Wed 11/13 2:48 PM
Remark: D.I.7 Order remailed to Pro Se Plaintiff on 11/13/2024. (ceg)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 12, 2024
8 8 misc Mail Returned Wed 11/13 11:44 AM
Return of Undeliverable Mail sent to Allison Baver. D.I.7 Return to Sender: Not Deliverable as Addressed Unable to Forward. (oam)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 29, 2024
7 7 1 pgs order Order to Show Cause Tue 10/29 5:02 PM
ORDER: Having considered Plaintiff's Response (D.I.6 ) to the Order to Show Cause (D.I.5 ), Plaintiff's request for an extension of time is DENIED, as Plaintiff's filing fails to show good cause for an extension. On or before November 12, 2024, Plaintiff shall show cause why this case should not be dismissed for failure to effect service on Defendants. Signed by Judge Jennifer L. Hall on 10/29/2024. ***Copy mailed to Pro Se Plaintiff on 10/29/24*** (ceg)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 22, 2024
6 6 respm Response to Order Mon 10/28 11:57 AM
RESPONSE to D.I.5 Order to Show Cause - filed by Allison Baver.(mrr)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A-C,
Att: 2 Exhibit Order
Thursday, September 19, 2024
5 5 1 pgs order Order to Show Cause Thu 09/19 11:49 AM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that on or before October 21, 2024, Plaintiff shall show cause why the case should not be dismissed for Plaintiff's failure to prosecute, pursuant to D. Del. LR 41.1. Signed by Judge Jennifer L. Hall on 9/19/2024. ***Copy mailed to Pro Se Plaintiff 9/19/2024*** (ceg)
Related: [-]
utility - CORRECTING ENTRY Thu 09/19 8:15 AM
CORRECTING ENTRY: The Plaintiff's address has been updated per chambers' request, and the case assignment information has been reissued to the Plaintiff. (vfm)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 20, 2024
4 4 misc Mail Returned Mon 06/24 11:29 AM
Return of Undeliverable Mail of Case Assignment Notification dated June 5th, 2024, sent to Allison Baver. Return to Sender, Not Deliverable as Addressed, Unable to Forward. (mpb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 05, 2024
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 06/05 12:49 PM
Case Assigned to Judge Jennifer L. Hall. Please include the initials of the Judge (JLH) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 03, 2024
3 3 misc Disclosure Statement - Rule 7.1 Mon 06/03 1:56 PM
Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Fox 11 Los Angeles, Fox 13 Tampa, Fox 29 Philadelphia, Fox 35 Orlando, Fox 5 Atlanta, Fox Business, Fox Corporation. Related [+]
Related: [-] ed, John
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
misc Deficiency Notice - No 7.1 Statement Filed Mon 06/03 12:57 PM
DEFICIENCY NOTICE issued by the Court to Plaintiff: Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 (b)(1), A party must: (1) file the disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. Counsel is requested to supplement the docket with an appropriate Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement. (oam)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 30, 2024
2 2 misc Magistrate Consent Forms Thu 05/30 3:37 PM
Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (oam)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Thu 05/30 3:36 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL and copies of documents from DE Superior Court, Case Number N24C-05-262 FJJ (Filing fee $405, receipt number ADEDC-4419096)- filed by Fox 35 Orlando, Fox 11 Los Angeles, Fox Corporation, Megan Henney, Fox 13 Tampa, Fox Business, Fox 29 Philadelphia, Fox 5 Atlanta.(oam)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 18 pgs Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Certificate of Service,
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet