South Carolina District Court
Judge:David C Norton
Referred: Thomas E Rogers, III
Case #: 4:24-cv-03259
Nature of Suit555 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Prison Condition
Cause42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights, State Filers
Case Filed:May 30, 2024

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 05/23/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, May 20, 2025
34 34 misc Document Mailed Tue 05/20 3:43 PM
***DOCUMENT MAILED:33 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION w/NEF placed in U.S. Mail from Florence Clerks Office to Eric Wright, #348455, Lieber Correctional Institution, PO Box 205, Ridgeville, SC, 29472 (dsto, )
Related: [-]
33 33 motion Report and Recommendation Tue 05/20 3:41 PM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION recommending that Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment (ECF No. 22 ) be granted and this case be dismissed in its entirety. Objections to R&R due by 6/3/2025. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas E Rogers, III on 05/20/2025.(dsto, )
Related: [-]
Friday, February 28, 2025
29 29 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Fri 02/28 11:38 AM
RESPONSE in Opposition re22 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Response filed by Eric Wright.Reply to Response to Motion due by 3/7/2025. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6.(dsto, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Supporting Documents,
Att: 2 Envelope
Wednesday, January 29, 2025
28 28 notice Notice of Request for Protection from Court Appearance Wed 01/29 1:45 PM
NOTICE of Request for Protection from Court Appearance by Michael T Smith for 2/13-17, 4/17-30, 8/6-12 (Smith, Michael)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 08, 2025
27 27 misc Document Mailed Wed 01/08 9:39 AM
***DOCUMENT MAILED: 26 TEXT Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply, placed in U.S. Mail from Florence Clerks Office to Eric Wright, #348455, Lieber Correctional Institution, PO Box 205, Ridgeville, SC, 29472 (dsto, )
Related: [-]
26 26 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Wed 01/08 9:38 AM
TEXT ORDER granting 25 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to 22 Motion for Summary Judgment. Response is now due March 14, 2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas E Rogers, III on 01/08/2025.(dsto, )
Related: [-]
Monday, January 06, 2025
25 25 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Mon 01/06 2:58 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to22 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Eric Wright. Response to Motion due by 1/21/2025. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.No proposed order.Motions referred to Thomas E Rogers, III.(dsto, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Friday, December 13, 2024
24 24 misc Document Mailed Fri 12/13 10:54 AM
***DOCUMENT MAILED:23 Roseboro Order w/NEF placed in U.S. Mail from Florence Clerks Office to Eric Wright, #348455, Lieber Correctional Institution, PO Box 205, Ridgeville, SC, 29472 (dsto, )
Related: [-]
23 23 order Roseboro Order Fri 12/13 10:52 AM
ROSEBORO ORDER directing clerk to forward summary judgment explanation to the opposing party and directing that party to respond in 31 days. Response to Motion due by 1/13/2025. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas E Rogers, III on 12/13/2024. (dsto, )
Related: [-]
Monday, December 09, 2024
22 22 motion Summary Judgment Mon 12/09 4:40 PM
MOTION for Summary Judgment by E. Brown, G. Peabody. Response to Motion due by 12/23/2024. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.No proposed order.Motions referred to Thomas E Rogers, III.(Smith, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memo in Support,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1 - Inmate Search Detail Report,
Att: 3 Exhibit 2 - Video Footage,
Att: 4 Exhibit 3 - Incident Report,
Att: 5 Exhibit 4 - Medical Records,
Att: 6 Certificate of Service
Friday, October 18, 2024
20 20 notice Notice of Change of Address Fri 10/18 11:39 AM
NOTICE of Change of Address by Eric Wright.(dsto, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Tuesday, September 03, 2024
19 19 service Summons Returned Executed - Complaint Served Tue 09/03 2:47 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed. E. Brown served on 7/31/2024; G. Peabody served on 7/31/2024. (dsto, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 28, 2024
18 18 misc Document Mailed Wed 08/28 5:11 PM
***DOCUMENT MAILED:17 Scheduling Order w/NEF placed in U.S. Mail from Florence Clerks Office to Eric Wright, #348455, McCormick Correctional Institution, 386 Redemption Way, McCormick, SC, 29899 (dsto, )
Related: [-]
17 17 order Scheduling Order Wed 08/28 5:10 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER:Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 9/27/2024, Discovery due by 10/28/2024, Motions due by 12/9/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas E Rogers, III on 08/28/2024. (dsto, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 20, 2024
16 16 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 08/20 11:11 AM
ANSWER to1 Complaint by E. Brown, G. Peabody.(Smith, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Monday, July 01, 2024
15 15 service Summons Issued Mon 07/01 9:33 AM
Summons Issued as to E. Brown, G. Peabody. Service due by 9/30/2024. (dsto, )
Related: [-]
14 14 misc Document Mailed Mon 07/01 9:23 AM
***DOCUMENT MAILED:13 Order 1983 w/NEF placed in U.S. Mail from Florence Clerks Office to Eric Wright, #348455, McCormick Correctional Institution, 386 Redemption Way, McCormick, SC, 29899 (dsto, )
Related: [-]
13 13 2 pgs order Order 1983 - Service - Inmate Mon 07/01 9:21 AM
ORDER authorizing service of process. Plaintiff is also directed to notify the clerk in writing of any change of address. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas E Rogers, III on 07/01/2024. (dsto, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 05, 2024
10 10 misc Document Mailed Wed 06/05 9:56 AM
***DOCUMENT MAILED:9 Proper Form Order w/NEF, pages 1-2 of ECF #1 Complaint and blank USM-285, placed in U.S. Mail from Florence Clerks Office to Eric Wright, #348455, McCormick Correctional Institution, 386 Redemption Way, McCormick, SC, 29899 (dsto, )
Related: [-]
9 9 order Proper Form Order Wed 06/05 9:51 AM
PROPER FORM ORDER: Case to be brought into proper form by 6/26/2024. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas E Rogers, III on 06/05/2024. (dsto, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 30, 2024
7 7 misc Document Mailed Thu 05/30 4:39 PM
***DOCUMENT MAILED: 6 TEXT Order, placed in U.S. Mail from Florence Clerks Office to Eric Wright, #348455, McCormick Correctional Institution, 386 Redemption Way, McCormick, SC, 29899 (dsto, )
Related: [-]
6 6 order Order Thu 05/30 4:36 PM
TEXT ORDER: Plaintiff has submitted a filing which can be construed as a Motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. See 28 U.S.C. § 1915. A review of the motion reveals that Plaintiff should be relieved of the obligation to prepay the full filing fee. Plaintiff's motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis is granted, subject to the court's right to require a payment if Plaintiff's financial condition changes, and to tax fees and costs against Plaintiff at the conclusion of this case if the court finds the case to be without merit. See Flint v. Haynes, 651 F.2d 970, 972-74 (4th Cir. 1981). (ECF No. 2 ). By filing this case, Plaintiff has incurred a debt to the United States of America in the amount of $350. See 28 U.S.C. § 1914. 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a) and (b) provides a prisoner is required to pay the full amount of the filing fee as funds are available. The Clerk is directed to accept payments up to the amount of $350 in this action. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas E Rogers, III on 05/30/2024. (dsto, )
Related: [-]
3 3 misc True Division for Trial Thu 05/30 3:41 PM
TRUE DIVISION FOR TRIAL: Anderson/Greenwood. (dsto, )
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Thu 05/30 3:40 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Related [+] by Eric Wright. Response to Motion due by 6/13/2024. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.No proposed order.Motions referred to Thomas E Rogers, III.(dsto, )
Related: [-] stricted Access
Att: 1 Financial Certificate,
Att: 2 Envelope
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 05/30 3:38 PM
COMPLAINT against E. Brown, G. Peabody, filed by Eric Wright. Service due by 8/28/2024.(dsto, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Supporting Documents,
Att: 2 Envelope