Colorado District Court
Judge:Charlotte N Sweeney
Referred: Scott T Varholak
Case #: 1:24-cv-01537
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Case Filed:May 30, 2024
Terminated:Nov 22, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Nov 26, 2024 1:16 AM MST
Defendant
Gates Enterprises, LLC
Represented By
Colin E. Moriarty
Underhill Law PC
contact info
Defendant
Underhill Law, P.C.
Represented By
Colin E. Moriarty
Underhill Law PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Maurice Collins West
Represented By
Yvonne L. Sell
Smith Jadin Johnson
contact info
Plaintiff
Rebecca West
Represented By
Yvonne L. Sell
Smith Jadin Johnson
contact info

GPO Nov 22 2024
MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Charlotte N. Sweeney: Oral Argument Hearing held on 11/22/2024. 8 Plaintiffs' Motion to Stay Arbitration is DENIED. 10 Motion to Dismiss is DENIED without prejudice pending arbitration. Court Reporter: Sarah Mitchell. (jdyne,)

Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Friday, November 22, 2024
22 22 utility Terminate Civil Case - PUBLIC Fri 11/22 11:42 AM
Civil Case Administratively Closed pursuant to the MINUTE ENTRY filed in this case on 11/22/24 at ECF No.21 . Text Only Entry (jdyne)
Related: [-]
21 21 minutes Oral Argument Hearing Order on Motion to Stay Order on Motion to Dismiss Fri 11/22 11:38 AM
MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Charlotte N. Sweeney: Oral Argument Hearing held on 11/22/2024.8 Plaintiffs' Motion to Stay Arbitration is DENIED.10 Motion to Dismiss is DENIED without prejudice pending arbitration. Court Reporter: Sarah Mitchell. (jdyne,)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 13, 2024
20 20 order Minute Order Wed 11/13 1:52 PM
MINUTE ORDER: Due to a conflict on the Court's calendar with a criminal jury trial, the one-hour Oral Argument set for 11/19/2024 is vacated and reset for 11/22/2024 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom A 702 before Judge Charlotte N. Sweeney. By Judge Charlotte N. Sweeney on 11/13/2024. Text Only Entry (cnsja, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 17, 2024
19 19 order Minute Order Thu 10/17 2:22 PM
MINUTE ORDER re:8 Motion to Stay Arbitration and10 Motion to Dismiss. A one-hour Oral Argument is set for 11/19/2024 at 1:00 PM in Courtroom A 702 before Judge Charlotte N. Sweeney. By Judge Charlotte N. Sweeney on 10/17/2024. Text Only Entry (cnsja, )
Related: [-]
Monday, August 05, 2024
18 18 minutes Status Conference Mon 08/05 11:51 AM
MINUTE ENTRY for Telephonic Status Conference held before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 8/5/2024. ORDERED: Given both sides are in agreement, the court GRANTS Defendants oral Motion to Stay. Parties shall contact Magistrate Judge Varholaks chambers within five (5) days of a ruling on the Motion to Dismiss and the Motion to Stay Arbitration. FTR: A402. (morti, )
Related: [-]
Monday, July 29, 2024
17 17 respm Reply to Response to Motion Mon 07/29 4:52 PM
REPLY to Response to10 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Defendants Gates Enterprises, LLC, Underhill Law, P.C.. (Moriarty, Colin)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 15, 2024
16 16 respm Response to Motion Mon 07/15 5:34 PM
RESPONSE to10 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Plaintiffs Maurice Collins West, Rebecca West. (Sell, Yvonne)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 12, 2024
15 15 order Minute Order Fri 07/12 1:00 PM
MINUTE ORDER This matter is before the Court pursuant to conversation between the parties and Chambers. The Status Conference set for 7/18/2024 is VACATED and RESET for 8/5/2024 11:15 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Telephonic appearances will be permitted, and may be made by calling 571-353-2301 at the scheduled time and utilizing Meeting ID: 252821415#. SO ORDERED, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 7/12/2024. Text Only Entry (stvlc4, )
Related: [-]
14 14 order Minute Order Fri 07/12 11:44 AM
MINUTE ORDER This matter is before the Court upon review of the docket. Pursuant to Dkt No 5, a Joint Proposed Scheduling Order was due to the Court on or before 7/11/2024. No such filing has been received. The Scheduling Conference set for 7/18/2024 09:30 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak is CONVERTED to a Status Conference, set for the same date/time. The parties shall be prepared to discuss whether a Scheduling Conference should be reset, or if one/both parties intend to seek a stay in this matter until the resolution of the pending motions. SO ORDERED, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 7/12/2024. Text Only Entry (stvlc4, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 09, 2024
13 13 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 07/09 12:52 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Moriarty, Colin)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 08, 2024
12 12 respm Reply to Response to Motion Mon 07/08 5:44 PM
REPLY to Response to8 MOTION to Stay Arbitration filed by Plaintiffs Maurice Collins West, Rebecca West. (Sell, Yvonne)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 24, 2024
11 11 respm Response to Motion Mon 06/24 6:10 PM
RESPONSE to8 MOTION to Stay Arbitration filed by Defendants Gates Enterprises, LLC, Underhill Law, P.C.. (Moriarty, Colin)
Related: [-]
10 10 motion Dismiss Mon 06/24 6:07 PM
MOTION to Dismiss by Defendants Gates Enterprises, LLC, Underhill Law, P.C..(Moriarty, Colin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Motion to Dismiss - E-mail from Mr. Johnson, Dec. 19, 2023,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 to Motion to Dismiss - Letter from Underhill, Dec. 20, 2023-,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit 3 to Motion to Dismiss - E-mail Chain, Jan. 1, 2023 -
9 9 notice Notice of Case Association Mon 06/24 6:00 PM
NOTICE OF CASE ASSOCIATION by Colin E. Moriarty on behalf of All Defendants (Moriarty, Colin)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 17, 2024
8 8 motion Stay Mon 06/17 4:43 PM
MOTION to Stay Arbitration by Plaintiffs Maurice Collins West, Rebecca West.(Sell, Yvonne)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Wednesday, June 05, 2024
7 7 service Affidavit/Return of Service - Executed - Complaint Wed 06/05 3:40 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Maurice Collins West, Rebecca West. Gates Enterprises, LLC served on 6/5/2024, answer due 6/26/2024. (Archuleta, Nathanael)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 04, 2024
6 6 service Affidavit/Return of Service - Executed - Complaint Tue 06/04 2:17 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Maurice Collins West, Rebecca West. Underhill Law, P.C. served on 6/4/2024, answer due 6/25/2024. (Sell, Yvonne)
Related: [-]
5 5 2 pgs order Order Tue 06/04 10:06 AM
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 6/4/2024. Joint Proposed Scheduling Order due 7/11/2024 . Scheduling Conference set for 7/18/2024 09:30 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. (schap, )
Related: [-]
Friday, May 31, 2024
4 4 order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Fri 05/31 12:51 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak for non-dispositive matters . Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of Local Civ. R. 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, (4) pursuant to Local Civ. R. 16.6 and at the discretion of the Magistrate Judge, convene such early neutral evaluation and/or settlement conferences and direct related procedures as may facilitate resolution of this case without the necessity of a motion or prior authorization of the undersigned. By Judge Charlotte N. Sweeney on 5/31/24. Text Only Entry (jdyne)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Summons Issued Fri 05/31 8:37 AM
SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (agarc, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons,
Att: 2 Magistrate Judge Consent Form
Thursday, May 30, 2024
2 2 misc Case Assigned to Judge Fri 05/31 8:36 AM
Case assigned to Judge Charlotte N. Sweeney and drawn to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Text Only Entry. (agarc, )
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 05/30 5:02 PM
COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against Gates Enterprises, LLC, Underhill Law, P.C. (Filing fee $ 405,Receipt Number ACODC-9710820)Attorney Yvonne L. Sell added to party Maurice Collins West(pty:pla), Attorney Yvonne L. Sell added to party Rebecca West(pty:pla), filed by Maurice Collins West, Rebecca West.(Sell, Yvonne)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 5 Summons to Gates Enterprises, LLC,
Att: 6 Summons to Underhill Law, P.C.