Texas Western District Court
Judge:Kathleen Cardone
Case #: 3:24-cv-00184
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question: Fair Labor Standards
Case Filed:May 30, 2024
Terminated:Mar 28, 2025
Last checked: Tuesday Nov 26, 2024 2:51 AM CST
Defendant
El Paso Community College District
Represented By
Tomas Eduardo Porras-Acosta
Scotthulse, P.C.
contact info
Rosemary M. Marin
Scotthulse P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Jesus Ortiz
Represented By
Raymond D. Martinez
Martinez & Martinez Law Firm PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Friday, March 28, 2025
23 23 2 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Fri 03/28 5:08 PM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE--Accordingly, the parties Joint Motion to Approve Settlement, ECF No. 22, is DENIED as moot. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants Motion to Dismiss, ECF No. 17, is DENIED as moot.. Signed by Judge Kathleen Cardone. (mv)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 27, 2025
22 22 motion Settlement Thu 03/27 9:56 AM
Joint MOTION for Settlement Approval by El Paso Community College District.(Marin, Rosemary)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, March 14, 2025
21 21 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Fri 03/14 11:32 AM
ORDER DENYING20 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Kathleen Cardone. (ep1)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 12, 2025
20 20 motion Dismiss Wed 03/12 1:29 PM
Joint MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice by El Paso Community College District.(Marin, Rosemary)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, February 27, 2025
19 19 2 pgs order Order Thu 02/27 12:05 PM
ORDER-- The Court ORDERS that, by no later than March 20, 2025, the parties shall either (1) file a motion to approve their settlement and attach to that motion the final settlement for the Courts review, or (2) file a motion to dismiss the case that states why the settlement does not require judicial approval.. Signed by Judge Kathleen Cardone. (mv)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 26, 2025
18 18 notice Notice of Settlement Wed 02/26 2:38 PM
NOTICE of Settlement by El Paso Community College District (Marin, Rosemary)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 21, 2025
17 17 motion Dismiss Fri 02/21 7:50 PM
MOTION to Dismiss by El Paso Community College District.(Marin, Rosemary)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, January 30, 2025
16 16 service Certificate of Service Thu 01/30 6:11 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Jesus Ortiz Plaintiff's Discovery Responses (Martinez, Raymond)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 06, 2025
15 15 7 pgs order Order on Motion to Enforce Settlement Tue 01/07 11:54 AM
ORDER DENYING12 Motion to Enforce Settlement Signed by Judge Kathleen Cardone. (mv)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 26, 2024
14 14 respm Response to Motion Thu 12/26 12:44 PM
RESPONSE to Motion, filed by Jesus Ortiz, re12 MOTION to Enforce Settlement Agreement filed by Defendant El Paso Community College District(Martinez, Raymond)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Exhibit,
Att: 3 Exhibit,
Att: 4 Proposed Order
Thursday, December 12, 2024
13 13 notice Notice Thu 12/12 6:58 PM
NOTICE Joint Notice of Mediator Selection by Jesus Ortiz (Martinez, Raymond)
Related: [-]
12 12 motion Enforce Settlement Thu 12/12 11:15 AM
MOTION to Enforce Settlement Agreement by El Paso Community College District.(Marin, Rosemary)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibits,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
Friday, November 08, 2024
11 11 misc Stipulation Fri 11/08 6:16 PM
STIPULATION of Defendant's Discovery Responses by El Paso Community College District. (Marin, Rosemary)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 13, 2024
10 10 7 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Tue 08/13 12:12 PM
TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER, ( Jury Selection set for 7/25/2025 08:30AM before Judge Kathleen Cardone,, Jury Trial set for 7/25/2025 08:30 AM before Judge Kathleen Cardone,, Pretrial Conference set for 7/17/2025 02:00 PM before Judge Kathleen Cardone,). Signed by Judge Kathleen Cardone. (mv)
Related: [-]
9 9 order Scheduling Order Tue 08/13 12:10 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: ADR Report Deadline due by 3/12/2025, Plaintiff's Amended Pleadings due by 11/12/2024, Defendant's Amended Pleadings due by 12/12/24, Discovery due by 2/12/2024, Plaintiff's Joinder of Parties due by 9/30/2024, Defendant's Joinder of Parties due by 10/21/24, Motions due by 3/12/2025,. Signed by Judge Kathleen Cardone. (mv)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 09, 2024
8 8 misc Rule 26(f) Discovery Report/Case Management Plan Fri 08/09 10:36 AM
Rule 26(f) Discovery Report/Case Management Plan by El Paso Community College District. (Marin, Rosemary)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 24, 2024
7 7 service Certificate of Service Wed 07/24 6:41 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Jesus Ortiz Plaintiff's Certificate of Service for Initial Discovery Requests (Martinez, Raymond)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Certificate of Service Wed 07/24 1:33 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Jesus Ortiz Plaintiff Discovery Responses (Martinez, Raymond)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 24, 2024
5 5 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 06/24 12:26 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, . Attorney Rosemary M. Marin added to party El Paso Community College District(pty:dft) by El Paso Community College District.(Marin, Rosemary)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 04, 2024
4 4 service Summons Returned Executed as to USA Tue 06/04 3:30 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jesus Ortiz. El Paso Community College District served on 6/4/2024, answer due 8/5/2024. (Martinez, Raymond)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 03, 2024
3 3 service Summons Issued Mon 06/03 12:09 PM
Summons Issued as to El Paso Community College District. (mv)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Request for Issuance of Summons Mon 06/03 11:37 AM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Jesus Ortiz. Request for Issuance of Summons to EPCC (Martinez, Raymond)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 31, 2024
misc To be Referred to EP Mag Judge Mon 06/03 11:10 AM
If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Castaneda (mv)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Mon 06/03 11:13 AM
Case assigned to Judge Kathleen Cardone. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (mv)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 30, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 05/30 5:23 PM
COMPLAINT Plaintiff's Original Complaint and Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ATXWDC-18825402). No Summons requested at this time, filed by Jesus Ortiz.(Martinez, Raymond)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet