Texas Western District Court
Judge:David Counts
Case #: 6:24-cv-00299
Nature of Suit830 Property Rights - Patent
Cause35:100 Patent Infringement
Case Filed:May 30, 2024
Terminated:Oct 15, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Nov 26, 2024 2:51 AM CST
Defendant
Verizon Services Corp.
Represented By
Deron R Dacus
The Dacus Firm, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Cellco Partnership
Represented By
Deron R Dacus
The Dacus Firm, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Verizon Business Network Services, Inc.
Represented By
Deron R Dacus
The Dacus Firm, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Verizon Communications, Inc.
Represented By
Deron R Dacus
The Dacus Firm, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
VOIP-PAL.COM, INC.
Represented By
Lewis E. Hudnell, III
Hudnell Law Group P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 85 minutes ago
Tuesday, October 15, 2024
15 15 misc Report on Patent/Trademark (AO-120) Tue 10/15 4:17 PM
Report on Patent/Trademark sent to U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (r013)
Related: [-]
14 14 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Terminate Civil Case Tue 10/15 3:59 PM
ORDER re13 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by VOIP-PAL.COM, INC. The Court therefore ORDERS the Clerk of Court CLOSE this action. Signed by Judge David Counts. (zv)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 11, 2024
13 13 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Fri 10/11 9:04 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by VOIP-PAL.COM, INC. (Hudnell, Lewis)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 16, 2024
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Mon 09/16 1:29 PM
Text Order GRANTING11 Defendants' Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to Answer, Plead, or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. It is ORDERED Defendants Verizon Communications, Inc., Cellco Partnership dba Verizon Wireless, Verizon Services Corp., and Verizon Business Network Services, Inc. be given up to and including October 17, 2024, to answer, plead, or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. It is so ORDERED. Entered by Judge David Counts. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (db)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Answer Deadline Mon 09/16 1:54 PM
Reset Deadlines: Cellco Partnership, Verizon Business Network Services, Inc., Verizon Communications, Inc., and Verizon Services Corp. answer due 10/17/2024. (zv)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 13, 2024
12 12 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Fri 09/13 6:49 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Deron R Dacus on behalf of Cellco Partnership, Verizon Business Network Services, Inc., Verizon Communications, Inc., Verizon Services Corp.. Attorney Deron R Dacus added to party Cellco Partnership(pty:dft), Attorney Deron R Dacus added to party Verizon Business Network Services, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Deron R Dacus added to party Verizon Communications, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Deron R Dacus added to party Verizon Services Corp.(pty:dft) (Dacus, Deron)
Related: [-]
11 11 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Fri 09/13 5:11 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint, by Cellco Partnership, Verizon Business Network Services, Inc., Verizon Communications, Inc., Verizon Services Corp..(Dacus, Deron)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, September 06, 2024
10 10 service Summons Returned Executed Fri 09/06 12:10 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by VOIP-PAL.COM, INC.. Verizon Communications, Inc. served on 8/27/2024, answer due 9/17/2024. (Hudnell, Lewis)
Related: [-]
9 9 service Summons Returned Executed Fri 09/06 12:08 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by VOIP-PAL.COM, INC.. Cellco Partnership served on 8/27/2024, answer due 9/17/2024. (Hudnell, Lewis)
Related: [-]
8 8 service Summons Returned Executed Fri 09/06 12:07 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by VOIP-PAL.COM, INC.. Verizon Business Network Services, Inc. served on 8/27/2024, answer due 9/17/2024. (Hudnell, Lewis)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Summons Returned Executed Fri 09/06 12:06 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by VOIP-PAL.COM, INC.. Verizon Services Corp. served on 8/27/2024, answer due 9/17/2024. (Hudnell, Lewis)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 21, 2024
6 6 service Summons Issued Thu 08/22 9:36 AM
Summons Issued as to Cellco Partnership, Verizon Business Network Services, Inc., Verizon Communications, Inc., Verizon Services Corp. (External documents) (zv)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Request for Issuance of Summons Wed 08/21 5:21 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by VOIP-PAL.COM, INC.. (Hudnell, Lewis)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 31, 2024
4 4 1 pgs notice Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120) Fri 05/31 5:55 PM
Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Hudnell, Lewis) (Main Document 4 replaced on 6/3/2024) (zv). Modified on 6/3/2024 due to AO 120 not flatten (zv).
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Remark Fri 05/31 12:15 PM
Per the attached Standing Order, please file an AO-120 form using the event "Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form" at case opening.(lad)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 30, 2024
2 2 misc JS44 (Civil Cover Sheet) Submitted Thu 05/30 5:20 PM
JS44 (Civil Cover Sheet) submitted by VOIP-PAL.COM, INC.. (Hudnell, Lewis) (Main Document 2 replaced on 5/31/2024) (lad).
Related: [-]
1 1 41 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 05/30 5:19 PM
COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ATXWDC-18825355). No Summons requested at this time, filed by VOIP-PAL.COM, INC..(Hudnell, Lewis)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 to Complaint,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 to Complaint,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 to Complaint,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4 to Complaint,
Att: 5 Exhibit 5 to Complaint
misc Remark (No Doc#) Mon 06/03 11:08 AM
All parties please flatten all fillable pdf's before e-filing. Please remember to comply with the standing orders located at https://www.txwd.uscourts.gov/judges-information/standing-orders/. (zv)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Mon 06/03 11:11 AM
Case assigned to Judge David Counts. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (zv)
Related: [-]