California Northern District Court
Judge:William H Orrick
Case #: 3:24-cv-03265
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
CauseCivil Miscellaneous Case
Case Filed:May 30, 2024
Terminated:Apr 07, 2025
Case in other court:San Mateo County Superior Court, 24-CIV-01370
Last checked: Tuesday Nov 26, 2024 12:20 AM PST
Creditor
Jelly Belly Candy Company
One Jelly Belly Lane
Fairfield, CA 94533
Represented By
Kurt A. Kappes
Greenberg Traurig LLP
contact info
Henry Andrew Stroud
Greenberg Traurig, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Mykola Ishchuk
Represented By
Peter Christopher Catalanotti
Wilson, Elser, Moskowitz, Edelman & Dicker LLP
contact info
Audrey S Tam
Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker LLP
contact info
Inna Nytochka
Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker LLP
contact info
Defendant
Farva Jafri
Represented By
Peter Christopher Catalanotti
Wilson, Elser, Moskowitz, Edelman & Dicker LLP
contact info
Inna Nytochka
Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker LLP
contact info
Defendant
Jafri Law Firm
Plaintiff
David Klein
Represented By
Carlos Jato
Law Office Of Carlos Jato
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Esmeralda Famutimi
Terminated: 11/04/2024
Represented By
Peter Christopher Catalanotti
Wilson, Elser, Moskowitz, Edelman & Dicker LLP
contact info
Inna Nytochka
Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/04/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Monday, April 07, 2025
71 71 4 pgs order Order Transferring Case - - Out of District Terminate Civil Case Mon 04/07 10:57 AM
ORDER TRANSFERRING ACTION TO THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE SOUTHERN DISTRICT OF NEW YORK. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 04/07/2025. (jmd, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
utility Remark Mon 04/07 12:44 PM
Case Transferred to the United States District Court Southern District of New York per entry71 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE (kam2, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 03, 2025
70 70 misc Letter Thu 04/03 10:53 AM
Letter from Carlos Jato . (Jato, Carlos)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 31, 2025
69 69 misc Response ( Non Motion ) Mon 03/31 2:47 PM
RESPONSE re68 Brief re Venue by Farva Jafri, Mykola Ishchuk. (Nytochka, Inna)
Related: [-]