Florida Middle District Court
Judge:Thomas P Barber
Referred: Sean P Flynn
Case #: 8:24-cv-01327
Nature of Suit150 Contract - Recovery of Overpayment & Enforcement of Judgment
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:May 30, 2024
Terminated:Jul 11, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Nov 26, 2024 3:27 AM EST
Defendant
Archer Western Contractors LLC
Represented By
Shane Fitzsimmons
Shutts & Bowen Llp - Jacksonville
contact info
Timothy D. Woodward
Shutts & Bowen, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Archer Western De Moya Joint Venture II
Represented By
Shane Fitzsimmons
Shutts & Bowen Llp - Jacksonville
contact info
Timothy D. Woodward
Shutts & Bowen, LLP
contact info
Defendant
The de Moya Group, Inc.
Represented By
Shane Fitzsimmons
Shutts & Bowen Llp - Jacksonville
contact info
Timothy D. Woodward
Shutts & Bowen, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America
Represented By
Shane Fitzsimmons
Shutts & Bowen Llp - Jacksonville
contact info
Timothy D. Woodward
Shutts & Bowen, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
W&W-AFCO Steel LLC
a foreign limited liability company 1730 W Reno
Oklahoma City, OK 73106
Represented By
Dylan P Wallace
Cohen Seglias Pallas Greenhall & Furman
contact info
Edward Seglias
contact info
Matthew R. Skaroff
Cohen Seglias Pallas Greenhall & Furman
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/15/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, July 11, 2024
18 18 order Order on Motion to Stay Thu 07/11 5:00 PM
ENDORSED ORDER: The joint motion to compel arbitration and stay proceedings (Doc. 11 ) is granted. The parties are directed to arbitrate this dispute. This case is stayed pending the completion of arbitration, and the parties are directed to notify the Court upon resolution of the arbitration proceedings. The Clerk is directed to terminate all pending motions and deadlines, and thereafter close this case. Signed by Judge Thomas P. Barber on 7/11/2024. (ANL)
Related: [-]
Sunday, July 07, 2024
17 17 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Sun 07/07 1:13 PM
SECOND NOTICE TO COUNSEL Edward Seglias Local Rule 2.01(c), Special Admission - File a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Co-counsel with filing rights may electronically file the motion on behalf of the lawyer seeking Special Admission or the motion may be filed in paper format; Pay the Special Admission Fee; (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (JK)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 03, 2024
16 16 6 pgs misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 07/03 4:19 PM
CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America. (Woodward, Timothy)
Related: [-]
15 15 6 pgs misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 07/03 4:18 PM
CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by The de Moya Group, Inc.. (Woodward, Timothy)
Related: [-]
14 14 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 07/03 4:17 PM
CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Archer Western Contractors LLC. (Woodward, Timothy)
Related: [-]
13 13 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 07/03 4:15 PM
CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Archer Western De Moya Joint Venture II. (Woodward, Timothy)
Related: [-]
12 12 notice Notice of appearance Wed 07/03 4:00 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy D. Woodward on behalf of Archer Western Contractors LLC, Archer Western De Moya Joint Venture II, The de Moya Group, Inc., Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America (Woodward, Timothy)
Related: [-]
11 11 39 pgs misc Stipulation Wed 07/03 3:56 PM
STIPULATION (Joint) for Stay Pending Arbitration and Request for Order Compelling Arbitration by Plaintiff and by Archer Western Contractors LLC, Archer Western De Moya Joint Venture II, The de Moya Group, Inc., Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America. (Woodward, Timothy)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 12, 2024
10 10 notice Notice of Lead Counsel Designation Wed 06/12 3:06 PM
NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Matthew R. Skaroff on behalf of W&W-AFCO Steel LLC. Lead Counsel: Matthew R. Skaroff. (Skaroff, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 31, 2024
9 9 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Fri 05/31 11:52 AM
NOTICE informing the parties that they may consent to the jurisdiction of a United States magistrate judge by filing Form AO 85 Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge using the event Consent to Jurisdiction of US Magistrate Judge . (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (SRC)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Fri 05/31 11:52 AM
NOTICE to Counsel of Local Rule 1.07(c), Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), and Local Rule 3.03. -Local Rule 1.07(c) requires lead counsel to file promptly a Notice of a Related Action identifying and describing any related action either pending or closed in the Middle District or elsewhere. -Local Rule 3.02(a)(2) requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. -Local Rule 3.03 requires each party to file a disclosure statement. Counsel must make their disclosures using the standard court form. The Disclosure Statement form can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (SRC)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Summons issued Fri 05/31 10:01 AM
SUMMONS issued as to Archer Western Contractors LLC, Archer Western De Moya Joint Venture II, The de Moya Group, Inc., Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America. (JK)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Fri 05/31 9:51 AM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL Edward Seglias Local Rule 2.01(c), Special Admission - File a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Co-counsel with filing rights may electronically file the motion on behalf of the lawyer seeking Special Admission or the motion may be filed in paper format; (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (JK)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Fri 05/31 8:28 AM
NOTICE to Counsel of Local Rule 2.02(a), which states, "The first paper filed on behalf of a party must designate only one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action." Counsel must file a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation identifying lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (AJS)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Fri 05/31 8:28 AM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL Dylan P Wallace of Local Rule 2.01(a), which requires membership or special admission in the Middle District bar to practice in the Middle District, except for the limited exceptions identified in the Rule. To apply for membership in the Middle District, visit www.flmd.uscourts.gov/for-lawyers. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (AJS)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Fri 05/31 8:27 AM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL Matthew R. Skaroff of Local Rule 2.01(b)(2)(B), which requires members of the Middle District bar to maintain with the clerk a current telephone number, mailing address, and email address. Update your contact information for the Middle District through PACER. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (AJS)
Related: [-]
2 2 utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Fri 05/31 8:25 AM
NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Thomas P. Barber and Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn. New case number: 8:24-cv-1327-TPB-SPF. (AJS)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 30, 2024
1 1 19 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 05/30 10:20 PM
COMPLAINT against ARCHER WESTERN CONTRACTORS LLC, ARCHER WESTERN de MOYA JOINT VENTURE II, THE de MOYA GROUP INC., TRAVELERS CASUALTY AND SURETY COMPANY OF AMERICA (Filing fee $405 receipt number AFLMDC-22147475) filed by W&W-AFCO STEEL LLC.(Skaroff, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 3 pgs Exhibit A to the Complaint,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 3 8 pgs Proposed Summons