Georgia Northern District Court
Judge:J P Boulee
Referred: Linda T Walker
Case #: 1:24-cv-02331
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
Cause15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Case Filed:May 29, 2024
Last checked: Monday Nov 25, 2024 3:38 AM EST
Defendant
Eagle Eye Recovery, Inc.
Represented By
John Colquitt Rogers
contact info
Defendant
Global Lending Services, LLC
Represented By
Matthew T. Covell
Holland & Knight Llp -Atl
contact info
Plaintiff
Loreal Taylor-Burns
Represented By
Misty Oaks Paxton
The Oaks Firm
contact info
Yitzchak Zelman
Marcus & Zelman, Llc -Nj
contact info


Docket last updated: 75 minutes ago
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
34 34 notice Notice (Other) Tue 04/29 3:03 PM
NOTICE by Eagle Eye Recovery, Inc. Notice of Intent to Serve Subpoena on Global Lending Services, LLC(Chapman, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit ("1" - Subpoena to Global Lending Services)
Thursday, April 24, 2025
33 33 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Thu 04/24 8:59 PM
ORDER granting32 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Discovery ends on 6/23/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda T. Walker on 4/24/2025. (bgt)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
32 32 motion Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Wed 04/23 8:15 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery with Brief In Support by Eagle Eye Recovery, Inc..(Chapman, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order (Proposed Order on Motion)
Thursday, April 17, 2025
misc Return of Application for Admission PHV Thu 04/17 8:42 AM
RETURN of31 APPLICATION for Admission of CRISTINA MENENDEZ Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 100, receipt number AGANDC-14228284) to attorney for correction. Reason for return: Applicant must be a member in good standing of the bar of any United States court or of the highest court of any State. See LR 83.1(B)(1). (mh)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
31 31 motion Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice Wed 04/16 6:18 PM
APPLICATION for Admission of CRISTINA MENENDEZ Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 100, receipt number AGANDC-14228284).by Loreal Taylor-Burns. (Paxton, Misty)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 11, 2025
30 30 discov Certificate of Service Fri 04/11 4:24 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Responses to Plaintiff's Interrogatories by Eagle Eye Recovery, Inc..(Chapman, Michael)
Related: [-]
29 29 discov Certificate of Service Fri 04/11 4:24 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Responses to Plaintiff's Requests for Production of Documents by Eagle Eye Recovery, Inc..(Chapman, Michael)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
28 28 order Protective Order Tue 04/01 4:36 PM
STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda T. Walker on 4/1/2025. (gww)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 31, 2025
27 27 notice Notice to Take Deposition Mon 03/31 7:11 PM
NOTICE to Take Deposition of Plaintiff, Loreal Taylor-Burns filed by Eagle Eye Recovery, Inc. (Chapman, Michael)
Related: [-]
26 26 misc Stipulation Mon 03/31 10:09 AM
STIPULATION Stipulated Protective Order by Eagle Eye Recovery, Inc.. (Chapman, Michael)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 07, 2025
25 25 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Mon 03/10 8:29 AM
ORDER granting24 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Discovery ends on 4/24/2025. Motions due by 5/26/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda T. Walker on 3/7/2025. (gww)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 04, 2025
24 24 motion Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Tue 03/04 7:24 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Jointly Submitted By The Parties by Loreal Taylor-Burns.(Zelman, Yitzchak)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, February 05, 2025
23 23 discov Certificate of Service Wed 02/05 2:00 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE First Interrogatories, Requests for Production, and Requests for Admission to Plaintiff by Eagle Eye Recovery, Inc..(Chapman, Michael)
Related: [-]
22 22 discov Initial Disclosures Wed 02/05 1:35 PM
Initial Disclosures by Eagle Eye Recovery, Inc..(Chapman, Michael)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 12, 2024
misc Clerks Entry of Dismissal Thu 12/12 2:14 PM
Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING21 Stipulation of Dismissal as to Global Lending Services, LLC pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(A)(ii). (gww)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 11, 2024
21 21 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Wed 12/11 3:47 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal As To Defendant Global Lending Services, Only, Without Prejudice by Loreal Taylor-Burns. (Zelman, Yitzchak)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 03, 2024
20 20 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 12/03 10:15 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Michael K. Chapman on behalf of Eagle Eye Recovery, Inc. (Chapman, Michael)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 23, 2024
19 19 order Guidelines for Discovery and Motion Practice Scheduling Order Mon 08/26 9:02 AM
Guidelines for Discovery and Motion Practice, SCHEDULING ORDER: re:18 Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan (Discovery ends on 3/10/2025, Motions due by 4/9/2025). Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda T. Walker on 8/23/2024. (gww)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 21, 2024
18 18 misc Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan Wed 08/21 1:41 PM
JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by Loreal Taylor-Burns. (Zelman, Yitzchak)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 25, 2024
17 17 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 07/25 11:48 AM
Defendant's ANSWER to1 COMPLAINT by Global Lending Services, LLC.(Covell, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 17, 2024
16 16 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Thu 07/18 9:57 AM
ORDER granting15 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The Court extends Defendant Eagle Eye Recovery, Inc.'s answer deadline nunc pro tunc to July 7, 2024, and accepts Defendant Eagle Eye Recovery, Inc.'s July 7 answer (Dkt. No. 13) as timely filed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda T. Walker on 7/17/2024. (gww)
Related: [-]
misc Clerk's Notation for LOA/CIP Wed 07/17 5:00 PM
Clerk's Notation re14 Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosure Statement: Read and approved by District Judge J. P. Boulee. (jkl)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 15, 2024
15 15 motion Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint Mon 07/15 11:34 AM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint, with Brief In Support by Eagle Eye Recovery, Inc..(Rogers, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Monday, July 08, 2024
misc Clerk's Notation for LOA/CIP Mon 07/08 1:25 PM
Clerk's Notation re9 Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosure Statement: Read and approved by District Judge J. P. Boulee. (jkl)
Related: [-]
Sunday, July 07, 2024
14 14 misc Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosure Statement Sun 07/07 4:44 PM
Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Eagle Eye Recovery, Inc.. (Rogers, John)
Related: [-]
13 13 answer Answer to Complaint Sun 07/07 4:41 PM
ANSWER to1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand by Eagle Eye Recovery, Inc.. Discovery ends on 12/4/2024.(Rogers, John)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 01, 2024
12 12 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Tue 07/02 9:02 AM
ORDER GRANTING7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re1 Complaint. Eagle Eye Recovery, Inc. Answer due 7/5/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda T. Walker on 7/1/2024. (nmb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 25, 2024
11 11 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Tue 06/25 2:57 PM
ORDER GRANTING10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Global Lending Services, LLC Answer due 7/25/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda T. Walker on 6/25/2024. (nmb)
Related: [-]
10 10 motion Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint Tue 06/25 1:50 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Global Lending Services, LLC.(Covell, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order
9 9 misc Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 06/25 1:41 PM
Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Global Lending Services, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Assured Investment Management, LLC for Global Lending Services, LLC. (Covell, Matthew)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 06/25 1:22 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew T. Covell on behalf of Global Lending Services, LLC (Covell, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 21, 2024
7 7 motion Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint Fri 06/21 1:55 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint, with Brief In Support by Eagle Eye Recovery, Inc..(Rogers, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Friday, June 07, 2024
6 6 service Return of Service Executed Fri 06/07 10:20 AM
Return of Service Executed by Loreal Taylor-Burns. Eagle Eye Recovery, Inc. served on 6/4/2024, answer due 6/25/2024. (Zelman, Yitzchak)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 04, 2024
5 5 service Return of Service Executed Tue 06/04 2:27 PM
Return of Service Executed by Loreal Taylor-Burns. Global Lending Services, LLC served on 6/4/2024, answer due 6/25/2024. (Zelman, Yitzchak)
Related: [-]
misc Approval of Application for Admission PHV Tue 06/04 11:16 AM
APPROVAL by Clerks Office re:4 APPLICATION for Admission of Yitzchak Zelman Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 100, receipt number AGANDC-13478507). Attorney Yitzchak Zelman added appearing on behalf of Loreal Taylor-Burns. E-filing access may be requested after an order granting the application is entered. (cpp)
Related: [-]
order Order on Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice Tue 06/04 11:23 AM
ORDER granting4 Application for Admission of Yitzchak Zelman Pro Hac Vice. So ordered by Judge J. P. Boulee on June 4, 2024. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(jkl)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 03, 2024
4 4 motion Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice Mon 06/03 9:09 PM
APPLICATION for Admission of Yitzchak Zelman Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 100, receipt number AGANDC-13478507).by Loreal Taylor-Burns. (Paxton, Misty)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 31, 2024
3 3 misc Letter re:83.1 Fri 05/31 8:20 AM
Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to Yitzchak Zelman. Clerk to follow-up by 6/10/2024. (cpp)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 29, 2024
2 2 service Electronic Summons Issued Thu 05/30 3:50 PM
Electronic Summons Issued as to Eagle Eye Recovery, Inc., Global Lending Services, LLC.(bmr)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons Global Lending Services
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 05/30 3:48 PM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Loreal Taylor-Burns. (Filing fee $405, receipt number AGANDC-13465545)(bmr)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet