Kansas District Court
Judge:Holly L Teeter
Referred: Angel D Mitchell
Case #: 2:24-cv-02228
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000 Job Discrimination (Sex)
Case Filed:May 30, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Nov 26, 2024 2:47 AM CST
Defendant
Fort Scott, Kansas Police Department
Animal Control Division 123 Main Street
Fort Scott, KS 66701
Defendant
Fort Scott, Kansas, City of
Plaintiff
Patricia Lynn Mowen
Represented By
Sarah Liesen
Edelman, Liesen & Myers, LLP
contact info
Alexander L. Edelman
Edelman, Liesen & Myers, LLP
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Plaintiff
Jessica Mowen
Terminated: 09/11/2024
208 W. Linwood Blvd.
Kansas City, MO 64111
Represented By
Sarah Liesen
Edelman, Liesen & Myers, LLP
contact info
Alexander L. Edelman
Edelman, Liesen & Myers, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Lynn Mowen
Terminated: 09/16/2024
Represented By
Sarah Liesen
Edelman, Liesen & Myers, LLP
contact info
Alexander L. Edelman
Edelman, Liesen & Myers, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
28 28 order Order on Motion to Set Aside Order on Motion for Default Judgment Wed 05/07 2:22 PM
ORDER. The parties have met and conferred and, via email, agree to the following. The Court grants the motion to set aside entry of default (Doc. 25). The Court denies the renewed motion for default judgment (Doc. 16). Plaintiff shall file an amended complaint on or before May 16, 2025. Defendants may answer, move, or otherwise respond in accordance with the Federal Rules or by May 27, 2025, whichever is later. Signed by District Judge Holly L. Teeter on 5/7/2025. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (md)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
27 27 notice Notice of Cancelled Hearing Wed 04/23 12:34 PM
NOTICE OF CANCELLED HEARING: The Motion Hearing set for May 15, 2025 at 10:30 a.m. is cancelled. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (md)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 18, 2025
26 26 7 pgs support Memorandum in Support of Motion Fri 04/18 1:18 PM
MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of25 MOTION to Set Aside10 Clerks Entry of Default by Defendants Fort Scott, Kansas Police Department, Fort Scott, Kansas, City of(Duvall, Jacqueline)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Declaration of Brad Matkin,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Declaration of Devin Tally,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit C - Declaration of Lisa Lewis,
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit D - Declaration of Tracy Dancer
25 25 motion Set Aside Fri 04/18 1:14 PM
MOTION to Set Aside10 Clerks Entry of Default by Defendants Fort Scott, Kansas Police Department, Fort Scott, Kansas, City of (Duvall, Jacqueline)
Related: [-]
24 24 misc Entry of Appearance Fri 04/18 1:11 PM
ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Jacqueline M. Duvall on behalf of Fort Scott, Kansas Police Department, Fort Scott, Kansas, City of (Duvall, Jacqueline)
Related: [-]
23 23 misc Entry of Appearance Fri 04/18 1:09 PM
ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Chris R. Pace on behalf of Fort Scott, Kansas Police Department, Fort Scott, Kansas, City of (Pace, Chris)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 31, 2025
22 22 service Certified Mail Receipt Returned Tue 04/01 9:57 AM
CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT returned re18 Order addressed to the Fort Scott, Kansas Police Department (mam)
Related: [-]
21 21 service Certified Mail Receipt Returned Tue 04/01 9:56 AM
CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT returned re18 Order addressed to Office of the City Clerk - Fort Scott. (mam)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 28, 2025
20 20 order Order ~Util - Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings ~Util - Terminate Motions Fri 03/28 3:57 PM
ORDER granting19 Plaintiff's Motion to Continue Hearing. Plaintiff seeks to continue the default-judgment hearing set for May 8, 2025, or for leave to appear virtually. Because appearing virtually is not conducive to an evidentiary hearing, the Court grants the request to continue the hearing. The hearing is rescheduled for May 15, 2025, at 10:30 a.m., in Kansas City Courtroom 463. Signed by District Judge Holly L. Teeter on 3/28/2025. Mailed to pro se party Defendants Fort Scott, Kansas, City of and Fort Scott, Kansas Police Department by regular and certified mail. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(md)
Related: [-]
utility Motions No Longer Referred Fri 03/28 9:02 AM
MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: 19 MOTION to Continue Hearing or Leave to Appear Virtually . The motion will be resolved by the District Judge.(alh)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 27, 2025
19 19 motion Continue Thu 03/27 6:48 PM
MOTION to Continue Hearing or Leave to Appear Virtually by Plaintiffs Jessica Mowen, Lynn Mowen, Patricia Lynn Mowen Related [+] (Liesen, Sarah)
Related: [-] ferred to Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell
Thursday, March 20, 2025
18 18 4 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Thu 03/20 10:43 AM
ORDER re16 Renewed Motion for Default Judgment Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 55(b)(2). Motion Hearing set for 5/8/2025 at 10:30 AM in KC Courtroom 463 (HLT). A failure to appear at the hearing or to otherwise take action to set aside entry of default will likely result in entry of default judgment and an assessment of damages against Defendants. Signed by District Judge Holly L. Teeter on 3/20/2025. Sent to Defendants Fort Scott, Kansas, City of and Fort Scott, Kansas Police Department (including Docs.16 -17 ) by regular and certified mail (tracking #s 7022 0410 0003 3816 3662 (City) and 7022 0410 0003 3816 3495 (Police Department)).(mam)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 13, 2025
17 17 12 pgs support Memorandum in Support of Motion Mon 01/13 4:42 PM
MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of16 MOTION for Default Judgment Renewed by Plaintiffs Lynn Mowen, Jessica Mowen, Patricia Lynn Mowen(Liesen, Sarah)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Plaintiff's Complaint,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Charge of Discrimination,
Att: 3 Exhibit C- Right to Sue,
Att: 4 Exhibit D - Patricia Mowen Affidavit,
Att: 5 Exhibit E - Declaration of Sarah Liesen,
Att: 6 Exhibit F - Offer Letter from Defendants,
Att: 7 Exhibit G - Plaintiff's Final Paycheck from Defendants,
Att: 8 Exhibit H - Unemployment Confirmation Letter,
Att: 9 Exhibit I - Plaintiff's First Paycheck from Community Health
16 16 motion Default Judgment Mon 01/13 4:23 PM
MOTION for Default Judgment Renewed by Plaintiffs Lynn Mowen, Jessica Mowen, Patricia Lynn Mowen(Liesen, Sarah)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Proofs of Service,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Affidavit in Support of Motion
Tuesday, December 24, 2024
15 15 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Tue 12/24 7:24 AM
ORDER granting14 Plaintiff's motion for an extension of time. Plaintiff asks for an additional 10 days to file a renewed motion for default judgment because of counsel's travel schedule, the holidays, and the press of other business. The Court finds good cause for the extension and grants Plaintiff until January 13, 2025 to file a renewed motion for default judgment. Signed by District Judge Holly L. Teeter on 12/24/24. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ct)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 23, 2024
14 14 motion Extension of Time Mon 12/23 3:17 PM
Unopposed MOTION for extension of time to File Renewed Motion for Default Judgment by Plaintiffs Lynn Mowen, Jessica Mowen, Patricia Lynn Mowen Related [+] (Liesen, Sarah)
Related: [-] ferred to Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell
utility Motions No Longer Referred Mon 12/23 4:02 PM
MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: 14 Unopposed MOTION for extension of time to File Renewed Motion for Default Judgment. The motion will be resolved by the District Judge.(alh)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 13, 2024
13 13 3 pgs order Order on Motion for Default Judgment Fri 12/13 10:02 AM
ORDER denying without prejudice11 Motion for Default Judgment. Any renewed motion for default judgment must be filed by January 3, 2025. Signed by District Judge Holly L. Teeter on 12/12/2024. (sz)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 11, 2024
12 12 4 pgs support Memorandum in Support of Motion Wed 12/11 6:29 PM
MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of11 MOTION for Default Judgment by Plaintiffs Lynn Mowen, Jessica Mowen, Patricia Lynn Mowen(Liesen, Sarah)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Proofs of Service,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Clerk's Entry of Default,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Plaintiff's Affidavit in Support of Motion for Default,
Att: 4 Exhibit D - Charge of Discrimination,
Att: 5 Exhibit E - Right to Sue,
Att: 6 Exhibit F - Complaint
11 11 motion Default Judgment Wed 12/11 6:25 PM
MOTION for Default Judgment by Plaintiffs Lynn Mowen, Jessica Mowen, Patricia Lynn Mowen (Liesen, Sarah)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 20, 2024
10 10 order Clerks Entry of Default Wed 11/20 12:59 PM
CLERKS ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Fort Scott, Kansas and Fort Scott, Kansas, Police Department. Signed by deputy clerk on 11/20/2024. (md)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 12, 2024
9 9 misc Certificate of Service Tue 11/12 4:53 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Motion for Entry of Default, Affidavit in Support of Motion for Default, and Proposed Entry of Default by Patricia Lynn Mowen re8 Application for Clerks Entry of Default. (Liesen, Sarah)
Related: [-]
8 8 misc Application for Clerks Entry of Default Tue 11/12 4:50 PM
APPLICATION FOR CLERKS ENTRY OF DEFAULT by Patricia Lynn Mowen.(Liesen, Sarah)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit,
Att: 2 Exhibit A
Sunday, September 22, 2024
7 7 service Return of Service of Summons EXECUTED Sun 09/22 6:51 PM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service by Patricia Lynn Mowen upon Fort Scott, Kansas, City of served on 9/17/2024, answer due 10/8/2024 (Liesen, Sarah)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Return of Service of Summons EXECUTED Sun 09/22 6:49 PM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service by Patricia Lynn Mowen upon Fort Scott, Kansas Police Department served on 9/17/2024, answer due 10/8/2024 (Liesen, Sarah)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 16, 2024
5 5 order Order Mon 09/16 11:57 AM
ORDER NUNC PRO TUNC correcting substituted-plaintiff's name. The court's September 11, 2024 order (ECF 4 ) is modified to read: ORDER granting3 motion to substitute party following the named plaintiff's death. Patricia Lynn Mowen , as the administrator of the estate of Jessica Mowen, is substituted as plaintiff. The court notes that the default time for service set by Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(m) has passed. The court orders plaintiff to effectuate service by September 25, 2024, or to show cause by that date why the court should not dismiss the case for failure to prosecute. Signed by Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell on 9/16/2024. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(alh)
Related: [-]
service Summons Issued Mon 09/16 4:30 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to Fort Scott, Kansas Police Department, Fort Scott, Kansas, City of. (issued to Attorney for service) Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge Form provided to counsel for service with complaint. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (nac)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 11, 2024
4 4 order Order on Motion to Substitute Party Wed 09/11 2:40 PM
ORDER granting3 motion to substitute party following the named plaintiff's death. Lynn Mowen, as the administrator of the estate of Jessica Mowen, is substituted as plaintiff. The court notes that the default time for service set by Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(m) has passed. The court orders plaintiff to effectuate service by September 25, 2024 , or to show cause by that date why the court should not dismiss the case for failure to prosecute. Signed by Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell on 9/11/2024. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (alh)
Related: [-]
order ~Util - Add and Terminate Parties Fri 09/13 2:28 PM
Parties: Lynn Mowen added and Jessica Mowen terminated per 4 Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell on 09/11/2024. (kmc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 10, 2024
3 3 motion Substitute Party Tue 09/10 3:00 PM
MOTION to Substitute Party by Plaintiff Jessica Mowen Related [+] (Edelman, Alexander)
Related: [-] ferred to Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell
Friday, May 31, 2024
notice Notice of Judge Assignment Fri 05/31 10:49 AM
NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Holly L. Teeter and Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE AVAILABILITY: A United States magistrate judge is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action if all parties voluntarily consent. Information & consent forms are available at http://www.uscourts.gov/forms/civil-forms/notice-consent-and-reference-civil-action-magistrate-judge (jsh)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 30, 2024
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Thu 05/30 8:04 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Jessica Mowen. (Liesen, Sarah)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (attorney) Thu 05/30 8:02 PM
COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $405, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-6359652.), filed by Jessica Mowen.(Liesen, Sarah)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B