Arizona District Court
Judge:Douglas L Rayes
Case #: 2:24-cv-01289
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:May 29, 2024
Terminated:Apr 24, 2025
Last checked: Monday Nov 25, 2024 1:18 AM MST
Defendant
Premium Coach Group LLC
Defendant
Chad Stevens
Defendant
Unknown Stevens
Plaintiff
Fling Enterprise Prevost LLC
Represented By
Amy Wilkins Hoffman
Hoffman Legal LLC
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Plaintiff
Leslie Fling
Terminated: 06/12/2024
Represented By
Amy Wilkins Hoffman
Hoffman Legal LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Michael Fling
Terminated: 06/12/2024
Represented By
Amy Wilkins Hoffman
Hoffman Legal LLC
contact info

GPO Apr 24 2025
ORDER granting 24 Motion for Default Judgment with respect to Count I (breach of contract) only. The Clerk is directed to enter default judgment in favor of Plaintiff on Count I of the SAC in the amount of $285,000, plus $534 in costs, and to terminate this case. Signed by Senior Judge Douglas L Rayes on 4/24/25. (DXD)

Docket last updated: 05/15/2025 11:59 PM MST
Thursday, April 24, 2025
28 28 order Clerks Judgment Thu 04/24 4:02 PM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT - Pursuant to Rule 55(b)(1) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and upon instruction by the Court, default judgment is hereby entered in favor of Plaintiff on Count I of the Second Amended Complaint in the amount of $285,000.00, plus $534.00 in costs. (DXD)
Related: [-]
27 27 4 pgs order Order on Motion for Default Judgment Thu 04/24 3:59 PM
ORDER granting24 Motion for Default Judgment with respect to Count I (breach of contract) only. The Clerk is directed to enter default judgment in favor of Plaintiff on Count I of the SAC in the amount of $285,000, plus $534 in costs, and to terminate this case. Signed by Senior Judge Douglas L Rayes on 4/24/25. (DXD)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 10, 2025
minute_ord Minute Order ~Util - Add and Terminate Parties Mon 03/10 11:00 AM
MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to19 Order regarding filing a Motion to Continue and no motion having been filed, Defendant Chad Stevens is terminated. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (DXD)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 09, 2024
25 25 notice Notice of Change of Address/Email/Firm Name (Attorney) Mon 12/09 3:33 PM
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY'S CHANGE OF ADDRESS/EMAIL/FIRM NAME by Amy Wilkins Hoffman. (Hoffman, Amy)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 24, 2024
24 24 motion Default Judgment Thu 10/24 4:06 PM
First MOTION for Default Judgment as to Premium Coach Group by Fling Enterprise Prevost LLC.(Hoffman, Amy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Exhibit,
Att: 3 Exhibit,
Att: 4 Proposed Order
Thursday, October 10, 2024
23 23 misc Report - Status Thu 10/10 9:25 AM
STATUS REPORT by Fling Enterprise Prevost LLC. (Hoffman, Amy)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 08, 2024
22 22 order Clerks Entry of Default Tue 10/08 8:52 AM
Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Premium Coach Group LLC. (REK)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 07, 2024
21 21 misc Application for Entry of Default Mon 10/07 12:16 PM
APPLICATION for Entry of Default against Premium Coach Group, LLC by Plaintiff Fling Enterprise Prevost LLC.(Hoffman, Amy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit,
Att: 2 Forms
Thursday, October 03, 2024
20 20 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Thu 10/03 10:11 AM
ORDER: Counsel for Plaintiff shall file a status report within 7 days of the date of this Order concerning the status of its case against this Defendant. FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall terminate Defendant Premium Coach Group LLC without further order of the Court, if Plaintiff fails to file either a status report or an application for entry of default within the timeframe specified herein. Signed by Senior Judge Douglas L Rayes on 10/2/24. (EJA)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 21, 2024
19 19 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines ~Util - Set/Clear Flags Wed 08/21 10:34 AM
ORDER - This matter is STAYED for 180 days as to Defendant Chad Stevens only. The Clerk shall dismiss Defendant Chad Stevens without prejudice on 2/18/25 unless, prior thereto, a motion to continue the stay is filed or the Court is advised that the bankruptcy stay has been lifted. This case will continue on the active calendar as to the remaining defendants. Signed by Senior Judge Douglas L Rayes on 8/20/24. (DXD)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 20, 2024
18 18 notice Notice (Other) Tue 08/20 2:44 PM
NOTICE re: Notice of Bankruptcy by Fling Enterprise Prevost LLC . (Hoffman, Amy)
Related: [-]
17 17 cmp Amended Complaint Tue 08/20 2:42 PM
Second AMENDED COMPLAINT against Premium Coach Group LLC, Chad Stevens, Unknown Stevens filed by Fling Enterprise Prevost LLC.(Hoffman, Amy)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 06, 2024
16 16 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Set Aside Default Tue 08/06 2:18 PM
ORDER granting15 Motion to Set Aside Default. The Clerk's entry of default (Doc.14 ) is hereby set aside. Plaintiff shall file its second amended complaint within 14 days of the date of this order. Signed by Senior Judge Douglas L Rayes on 8/6/24. (DXD)
Related: [-]
15 15 motion Set Aside Default Tue 08/06 9:05 AM
First MOTION to Set Aside Default by Leslie Fling, Michael Fling, Fling Enterprise Prevost LLC.(Hoffman, Amy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, July 29, 2024
14 14 order Clerks Entry of Default Mon 07/29 9:37 AM
Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Defendants Premium Coach Group LLC, Chad Stevens. (DXD)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 26, 2024
13 13 misc Application for Entry of Default Fri 07/26 9:50 AM
APPLICATION for Entry of Default by Plaintiff Fling Enterprise Prevost LLC against Chad Stevens and Premium Coach Group LLC.(Hoffman, Amy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit Declaration in Support of Entry of Default,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
Wednesday, July 03, 2024
12 12 service Service Executed Wed 07/03 9:23 AM
SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Leslie Fling, Michael Fling, Fling Enterprise Prevost LLC: Proof of Service re: First Amended Complaint, Order, Summons in a Civil Action upon Chad Stevens on 07 02-2024 (Hoffman, Amy)
Related: [-]
11 11 service Service Executed Wed 07/03 9:21 AM
SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Leslie Fling, Michael Fling, Fling Enterprise Prevost LLC: Proof of Service re: First Amended Complaint, Order, Summons upon Premium Coach Group, LLC on 07 02-2024 (Hoffman, Amy)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 12, 2024
10 10 cmp Amended Complaint Wed 06/12 10:05 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Michael Fling.(Hoffman, Amy)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice of Filing - Amended Pleading (LRCiv 15.1(b)) Wed 06/12 10:02 AM
NOTICE of Filing Amended Pleading pursuant to LRCiv 15.1(b) by Michael Fling .(Hoffman, Amy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
Wednesday, June 05, 2024
8 8 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Wed 06/05 2:28 PM
ORDER granting7 Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff shall have until June 12, 2024 in which to file the first amended complaint. Ordered by Judge Douglas L Rayes.(RMV)(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)
Related: [-]
7 7 motion Extension of Time Wed 06/05 1:47 PM
First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Amended Complaint by Michael Fling.(Hoffman, Amy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, May 31, 2024
6 6 2 pgs order Order to Show Cause ~Util - Set Deadlines Fri 05/31 8:11 AM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - By 6/6/2024, Plaintiffs shall either (1) amend the Complaint to sufficiently allege subject-matter jurisdiction or (2) show cause in writing why this case should not be dismissed for lack of subject-matter jurisdiction. The Clerk shall dismiss this case in its entirety if Plaintiffs fail to comply. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 5/30/24. (DXD)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 30, 2024
5 5 2 pgs order Order re Rule 12(b) Motions Thu 05/30 3:36 PM
ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(1)-(3) & (6)-(7), 12(c), 12(e), or 12(f) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file a notice of service. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 5/30/24. (DXD)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Summons Issued Thu 05/30 1:24 PM
Summons Issued as to Premium Coach Group LLC, Chad Stevens, Unknown Stevens.(REK)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons,
Att: 2 Summons
Wednesday, May 29, 2024
3 3 misc New Case Opened Thu 05/30 1:20 PM
Filing fee paid, receipt number AAZDC-23093712. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Douglas L Rayes. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV 24-01289 PHX-DLR. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (REK)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Summons Submitted Thu 05/30 1:18 PM
SUMMONS Submitted by Leslie Fling, Michael Fling. (submitted by Amy Hoffman)(REK)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons,
Att: 2 Summons
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 05/30 1:16 PM
COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $405.00, receipt number AAZDC-23093712 filed by Michael Fling, Leslie Fling. (submitted by Amy Hoffman)(REK)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet