Arizona District Court
Case #: 4:24-mj-07486
Case Filed:May 28, 2024
Last checked: Friday May 31, 2024 12:53 AM MST
Defendant
Jose Tzir-Maquin (1)
Represented By
Charles Anslem Thomas
Law Offices Of Charles A Thomas PLC
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Joseph G Rieu
Us Attorneys Office - Tucson, Az
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/31/2024 2:37 AM MST
Friday, May 24, 2024
Arrest of Jose Tzir-Maquin on 5/24/2024. (BHA)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 28, 2024
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Jose Tzir-Maquin. (BHA)
Related: [-]