Texas Southern District Court
Case #: 7:24-cr-00759
Case Filed:May 28, 2024
Last checked: Friday May 31, 2024 2:34 AM CDT
Defendant
Santos Sanchez-Sanchez (1)
Represented By
Darrell Lee Bryan
Federal Public Defender
contact info
Federal Public Defender - McAllen
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Financial Litigation
U S Attorney'S Office
contact info
Devin Victoria Walker
Us Attorney'S Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/31/2024 3:58 AM CDT
Sunday, May 12, 2024
Arrest of Santos Sanchez-Sanchez, filed. (cb7) [7:24-mj-00785]
Related: [-]
Monday, May 13, 2024
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Santos Sanchez-Sanchez (1), filed. (Hidalgo) Initial Appearance set for 5/14/2024 at 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Juan F Alanis (cb7) (ced7). [7:24-mj-00785]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 14, 2024
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Juan F Alanis. 8:1326 INITIAL APPEARANCE and PRELIMINARY EXAMINATION on Criminal Complaint as to Santos Sanchez-Sanchez held on 5/14/2024. (Deft informed of rights.) Defendant requests appointed counsel. Deft examined as to Financial Affidavit. Court grants. Deft, through counsel, waived Preliminary Examination and Detention Hearing. Court found Probable Cause. Deft held without bond. Due Process Protections Act admonishments provided to Counsel by Court. Appearances: Amanda Rose McColgan, AUSA; Juan Becerra, AFPD. (PTS: Susana Vargas) (ERO: Karen Lopez) (Interpreter: Maria E. Barrett and Nicholas Gibler/used) (DUSM: Angel Perez) Deft remanded to custody. (nc7) [7:24-mj-00785]
Related: [-]
US ATTORNEY'S NOTICE OF APPEARANCE. Devin Victoria Walker appearing for USA, filed. (Walker, Devin) [7:24-mj-00785]
Related: [-]
2 2 AO 257 Information Sheet as to Santos Sanchez-Sanchez, filed. (cb7) [7:24-mj-00785]
Related: [-]
3 3 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER for Santos Sanchez-Sanchez (Signed by Magistrate Judge Juan F Alanis) Parties notified. (nc7) [7:24-mj-00785]
Related: [-]
4 4 Order of Detention Pending Trial as to Santos Sanchez-Sanchez. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Juan F Alanis) Parties notified. (nc7) [7:24-mj-00785]
Related: [-]
5 5 BRADY ORDER on Rule 5(f) as to Santos Sanchez-Sanchez. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Juan F Alanis) Parties notified. (nc7) [7:24-mj-00785]
Related: [-]
6 6 Sealed Financial Affidavit CJA 23 by Santos Sanchez-Sanchez, filed. [7:24-mj-00785]
Related: [-]
Friday, May 17, 2024
7 7 Pretrial Services Report (Sealed) as to Santos Sanchez-Sanchez, filed. (jrs7) [7:24-mj-00785]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 28, 2024
8 8 INDICTMENT (The original indictment with the signature of the grand jury foreperson is on file under seal with the clerk) as to Santos Sanchez-Sanchez (1) count(s) 1, filed. (xa7)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Unredacted attachment
9 9 US Attys Criminal Docket Sheet as to Santos Sanchez-Sanchez, filed. (xa7) (Main Document 9 replaced on 5/30/2024) (vtb7).
Related: [-]