Florida Southern District Court
Case #: 0:24-mj-06256
Case Filed:May 29, 2024
Last checked: Friday May 31, 2024 3:29 AM EDT
Defendant
Emmanuel Valenzuela Ruiz (1)
Represented By
Noticing FPD-FTL
contact info
Wesley Daniel Wallace
Federal Public Defenders Office
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Francesse Lucius Cheron
Doj-Usao
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/31/2024 4:59 AM EDT
Tuesday, May 28, 2024
Arrest of Emmanuel Valenzuela Ruiz (at)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 29, 2024
Set Hearing as to Emmanuel Valenzuela Ruiz: Initial Appearance - Rule 5(c)(3)/40 set for 5/29/2024 11:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before FTL Duty Magistrate Judge. (at)
Related: [-]
1 1 Magistrate Judge Removal of Complaint And Arrest WArrant from DISTRICT OF RHODE ISLAND Case number in the other District 1:19-MJ-26-LDA as to Emmanuel Valenzuela Ruiz (1). (at)
Related: [-]
2 2 ORAL MOTION to Unseal Case by USA as to Emmanuel Valenzuela Ruiz. (at)
Related: [-]
3 3 ORDER granting 2 Motion to Unseal Case as to Emmanuel Valenzuela Ruiz (1). (Signed by Magistrate Judge Jared M. Strauss on 5/29/2024). (See attached document for full details). (at)
Related: [-]
4 4 ORAL MOTION To Unseal Complaint by USA as to Emmanuel Valenzuela Ruiz. (Duplicate Entry) (rbe) Modified on 5/29/2024 (rbe).
Related: [-]
5 5 ORDER granting 4 Government's Motion To Unseal Complaint as to Emmanuel Valenzuela Ruiz (1). Signed by Magistrate Judge Jared M. Strauss on 5/29/2024. (Duplicate Entry) (rbe) Modified on 5/29/2024 (rbe).
Related: [-]
6 6 Minute Order for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jared M. Strauss: Initial Appearance in Rule 5(c)(3)/Rule 40 Proceedings as to Emmanuel Valenzuela Ruiz held on 5/29/2024. Detention Hearing set for 6/6/2024 10:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before FTL Duty Magistrate Judge. Spanish Interpreter present. Attorney added: Noticing FPD-FTL for Emmanuel Valenzuela Ruiz (Digital 11:34:43-11:56:39) Signed by Magistrate Judge Jared M. Strauss on 5/29/2024. (rbe)
Related: [-]
7 7 WAIVER of Rule 5(c)(3)/Rule 40 Hearing as to Emmanuel Valenzuela Ruiz. (rbe)
Related: [-]
8 8 ORAL MOTION for Pretrial Detention Hearing by USA as to Emmanuel Valenzuela Ruiz. (rbe)
Related: [-]
9 9 ORDER granting 8 Government's Motion for Pretrial Detention Hearing as to Emmanuel Valenzuela Ruiz (1). Signed by Magistrate Judge Jared M. Strauss on 5/29/2024. See DE 6 for full details. (rbe)
Related: [-]
10 10 Notice of Assignment of Assistant Federal Public Defender as to Emmanuel Valenzuela Ruiz. Attorney Wesley Daniel Wallace added. Attorney Noticing FPD-FTL terminated.. Attorney Wesley Daniel Wallace added to party Emmanuel Valenzuela Ruiz(pty:dft). (Wallace, Wesley)
Related: [-]
11 11 Invocation of Right to Silence and Counsel by Emmanuel Valenzuela Ruiz (Wallace, Wesley)
Related: [-]