Texas Southern District Court
Case #: 7:24-cr-00600
Case Filed:May 01, 2024
Last checked: Friday May 31, 2024 3:07 AM CDT
Defendant
Daniel Morales-Luna (1)
Represented By
Juan Sonny Palacios, Jr
Jspalacios PLLC
contact info
Robert Wells, Jr
Robert Wells, Jr.
contact info
Material Witness
Fidel Lopez-Garcia
Material Witness
Rigoberto Lopez-Garcia
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Financial Litigation
U S Attorney'S Office
contact info
Jose Alberto Garcia
U.S. Attorney'S Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/31/2024 4:50 AM CDT
Thursday, April 04, 2024
Arrest of Daniel Morales-Luna, filed. (yi7) [7:24-mj-00554]
Related: [-]
Friday, April 05, 2024
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Daniel Morales-Luna (1), filed. (Hidalgo) Initial Appearance set for 4/8/2024 at 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Juan F Alanis (xa7) [7:24-mj-00554]
Related: [-]
2 2 Affidavit for Material Witness(es) Rigoberto Lopez-Garcia, Fidel Lopez-Garcia as to Daniel Morales-Luna. Initial Appearance for Material Witness set for 4/8/2024 at 09:01 AM before Magistrate Judge Juan F Alanis, filed. (xa7) [7:24-mj-00554]
Related: [-]
Monday, April 08, 2024
REMARK as to Daniel Morales-Luna: MATERIAL WITNESS CASE ASSIGNED TO DISTRICT JUDGE DREW B. TIPTON, filed. (nc7) [7:24-mj-00554]
Related: [-]
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Juan F Alanis. INITIAL APPEARANCE on Criminal Complaint as to Daniel Morales-Luna held on 4/8/2024. (Deft informed of rights.) Defendant requests appointed counsel. Deft examined as to Financial Affidavit. Court grants. Government moves for temporary detention and continuance to prepare for detention hearing. Court grants. Preliminary Examination & Detention Hearing set for 4/10/2024 at 03:00PM before Magistrate Judge Juan F. Alanis. Due Process Protections Act admonishments provided to Counsel by Court. Appearances: Avery Benitez, AUSA; Robert Wells, APTD. (PTS: Daisy Montemayor) (ERO: Karen Lopez) (Interpreter: Woody Lewis and Maria E. Barrett/used) (DUSM: John Briere) Deft remanded to custody. (nc7) [7:24-mj-00554]
Related: [-]
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Juan F Alanis: INITIAL APPEARANCE AND DETENTION HEARING OF MATERIAL WITNESS(ES) Rigoberto Lopez-Garcia, Fidel Lopez-Garcia as to Daniel Morales-Luna held on 4/8/2024. (Material Witness(es) informed of rights.) Court will be appointing counsel to represent them as material witness(es). Motion to take deposition of material witness(es) to be filed immediately. Government recommending detention. Material Witnesses, through counsel, waived detention hearing. Material Witnesses held without bond since they have no legal status to be in the United States. Material Witness Hearing set for 4/10/2024 at 03:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Juan F Alanis. Material Witnesses remanded to custody of the U.S. Marshals. Appearances: Avery Benitez, AUSA; Victoria Guerra, APTD (ERO: Karen Lopez) (Interpreter: Maria E. Barrett and Woody Lewis/used) (USMS: John Briere), filed. (nc7) [7:24-mj-00554]
Related: [-]
3 3 AO 257 Information Sheet as to Daniel Morales-Luna, filed. (yi7) [7:24-mj-00554]
Related: [-]
4 4 ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL for Defendant Daniel Morales-Luna. Robert Wells appointed. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Juan F Alanis) Parties notified. (nc7) [7:24-mj-00554]
Related: [-]
5 5 Order of Temporary Detention Pending Hearing as to Daniel Morales-Luna. Preliminary Examination & Detention Hearing set for 4/10/2024 at 03:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Juan F Alanis. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Juan F Alanis) Parties notified. (nc7) [7:24-mj-00554]
Related: [-]
6 6 BRADY ORDER on Rule 5(f) as to Daniel Morales-Luna. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Juan F Alanis) Parties notified. (nc7) [7:24-mj-00554]
Related: [-]
7 7 ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL for Material Witness(es): Rigoberto Lopez-Garcia. Victoria Guerra appointed. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Juan F Alanis) Parties notified. (nc7) [7:24-mj-00554]
Related: [-]
8 8 ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL for Material Witness(es): Fidel Lopez-Garcia. Victoria Guerra appointed. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Juan F Alanis) Parties notified. (nc7) [7:24-mj-00554]
Related: [-]
9 9 ORDER COMMITTING MATERIAL WITNESS(ES) Rigoberto Lopez-Garcia to the custody of the United States Marshal. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Juan F Alanis) Parties notified. (nc7) [7:24-mj-00554]
Related: [-]
10 10 ORDER COMMITTING MATERIAL WITNESS(ES) Fidel Lopez-Garcia to the custody of the United States Marshal. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Juan F Alanis) Parties notified. (nc7) [7:24-mj-00554]
Related: [-]
11 11 Sealed Financial Affidavit CJA 23 by Daniel Morales-Luna, filed. [7:24-mj-00554]
Related: [-]
12 12 Unopposed MOTION to Take Deposition of Both Material Witnesses by Fidel Lopez-Garcia as to Daniel Morales-Luna, filed. (Guerra, Victoria) [7:24-mj-00554]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, April 09, 2024
US ATTORNEY'S NOTICE OF APPEARANCE. Jose Alberto Garcia appearing for USA, filed. (Garcia, Jose) [7:24-mj-00554]
Related: [-]
13 13 ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL for Defendant Daniel Morales-Luna. Juan Palacios appointed. Representation by attorney Robert Wells, Jr terminated. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Juan F Alanis) Parties notified. (nc7) [7:24-mj-00554]
Related: [-]
14 14 Pretrial Services Report (Sealed) as to Daniel Morales-Luna. NOTICE: Document available to applicable parties only. Authorized users enter CM/ECF Filer login and password first for authentication. Be sure to SAVE the document locally at the time of viewing , filed. (jda7) [7:24-mj-00554]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 10, 2024
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Juan F Alanis: PRELIMINARY EXAMINATION AND DETENTION HEARING as to Daniel Morales-Luna held on 4/10/2024. Deft, through counsel, waived Preliminary Examination and Detention Hearing. Court found Probable Cause. Court took judicial notice of Pre-Trial Report and entered findings. Deft held without bond. Deft remanded to custody of U.S. Marshal. Appearances: Jose Garcia, AUSA; Juan Sonny Palacios, APTD. (PTS: Ana Melara) (ERO: Stephanie Garcia) (Interpreter: Woody Lewis/used) (DUSM: Letty Torres), filed. (nc7) [7:24-mj-00554]
Related: [-]
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Juan F Alanis: MATERIAL WITNESS HEARING in case as to Daniel Morales-Luna held on 4/10/2024. Court addressed counsel as to the depositions of the material witnesses. Parties had no objections to the depositions of material witnesses. Court set Deposition deadline no later than 05/30/2024, order forthcoming. Deft remanded to custody of U.S. Marshal. Appearances: Jose Garcia, AUSA; Juan Sonny Palacios, APTD. (PTS: Ana Melara) (ERO: Stephanie Garcia) (Interpreter: Woody Lewis/used) (DUSM: Letty Torres), filed. (nc7) [7:24-mj-00554]
Related: [-]
15 15 ORDER TO DEPOSE MATERIAL WITNESS(ES): Rigoberto Lopez-Garcia, Fidel Lopez-Garcia on 05/30/2024 as to Daniel Morales-Luna (Signed by Magistrate Judge Juan F Alanis) Parties notified. (nc7) [7:24-mj-00554]
Related: [-]
16 16 ORDER OF DETENTION PENDING TRIAL as to Daniel Morales-Luna ( Signed by Magistrate Judge Juan F Alanis) Parties notified. (ced7) [7:24-mj-00554]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 01, 2024
17 17 INDICTMENT (The original indictment with the signature of the grand jury foreperson is on file under seal with the clerk) as to Daniel Morales-Luna (1) count(s) 1-3, filed. (cb7)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Unredacted attachment
18 18 US Attys Criminal Docket Sheet as to Daniel Morales-Luna, filed. (cb7)
Related: [-]