Texas Western District Court
Case #: 3:24-cr-00893
Case Filed:May 01, 2024
Last checked: Friday May 31, 2024 2:58 AM CDT
Defendant
Brenda Mabel Jimenez Murillo (1)
Represented By
Christina M. Norton
Federal Public Defender'S Office
contact info
Miguel A. Villalba
Attorney At Law
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Kyle Myers
U.S. Attorney'S Office
contact info
Patricia Josefina Acosta
Assistant U.S. Attorney
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/31/2024 4:44 AM CDT
Thursday, April 04, 2024
Arrest of Brenda Mabel Jimenez Murillo (cs) [3:24-mj-01437-MAT]
Related: [-]
Friday, April 05, 2024
ORAL ORDER OF TEMPORARY DETENTION: NO BOND SET as to Brenda Mabel Jimenez Murillo by Judge Miguel A. Torres. (cs) [3:24-mj-01437-MAT]
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT Signed by Judge Miguel A. Torres as to Brenda Mabel Jimenez Murillo. (cs) [3:24-mj-01437-MAT]
Related: [-]
2 2 MOTION to Detain Defendant without Bond by USA as to Brenda Mabel Jimenez Murillo. (cs) [3:24-mj-01437-MAT]
Related: [-]
3 3 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER as to Brenda Mabel Jimenez Murillo. Signed by Judge Miguel A. Torres. (cs) [3:24-mj-01437-MAT]
Related: [-]
4 4 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Miguel A. Torres: Initial Appearance as to Brenda Mabel Jimenez Murillo held on 4/5/2024 (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.), Spanish Language Interpreter NOT required as to Brenda Mabel Jimenez Murillo (Court Reporter ERO.) (cs) [3:24-mj-01437-MAT]
Related: [-]
5 5 ORDER SETTING PRELIMINARY / DETENTION HEARING as to Brenda Mabel Jimenez Murillo, ( Detention Hearing set for 4/10/2024 09:00 AM before Judge Miguel A. Torres, Preliminary Hearing set for 4/10/2024 09:00 AM before Judge Miguel A. Torres), Order Regarding Due Process Protections Act as to Brenda Mabel Jimenez Murillo. Signed by Judge Miguel A. Torres. (cs) [3:24-mj-01437-MAT]
Related: [-]
6 6 CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Brenda Mabel Jimenez Murillo (SEALED pursuant to E-Government Act of 2002). (cs) [3:24-mj-01437-MAT]
Related: [-]
Monday, April 08, 2024
7 7 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Kyle Myers appearing for USA. . Attorney Kyle Myers added to party USA(pty:pla) (Myers, Kyle) [3:24-mj-01437-MAT]
Related: [-]
8 8 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Christina M. Norton appearing for Brenda Mabel Jimenez Murillo . Attorney Christina M. Norton added to party Brenda Mabel Jimenez Murillo(pty:dft) (Norton, Christina) [3:24-mj-01437-MAT]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 09, 2024
9 9 MOTION to Withdraw and Substitute Attorney by Brenda Mabel Jimenez Murillo. (Norton, Christina) [3:24-mj-01437-MAT]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 10, 2024
Attorney Christina M. Norton terminated as to Brenda Mabel Jimenez Murillo. (cs) [3:24-mj-01437-MAT]
Related: [-]
10 10 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Miguel A. Torres: Miscellaneous Hearing as to Brenda Mabel Jimenez Murillo held on 4/10/2024 (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.) Court grants Defense Counsel's motion to withdraw and appoints CJA attorney Miguel A. Villalba. Preliminary and detention hearing reset. Order appointing and order resetting forthcoming, Spanish Language Interpreter NOT required as to Brenda Mabel Jimenez Murillo, Due Process Protections Act Warning given in Open Court as to Brenda Mabel Jimenez Murillo (Court Reporter ERO.) (cs) [3:24-mj-01437-MAT]
Related: [-]
11 11 ORDER GRANTING9 Motion to Substitute Attorney Miguel Villalva in place of Christina Norton as to Brenda Mabel Jimenez Murillo (1). Signed by Judge Miguel A. Torres. (cs) [3:24-mj-01437-MAT]
Related: [-]
12 12 ORDER RESETTING PRELIMINARY / DETENTION HEARING IN PERSON as to Brenda Mabel Jimenez Murillo, ( Detention Hearing reset for 4/12/2024 01:30 PM before Judge Miguel A. Torres, Preliminary Hearing reset for 4/12/2024 01:30 PM before Judge Miguel A. Torres,). Signed by Judge Miguel A. Torres. (cs) [3:24-mj-01437-MAT]
Related: [-]
Friday, April 12, 2024
13 13 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Miguel A. Torres: Preliminary Hearing as to Brenda Mabel Jimenez Murillo held on 4/12/2024 (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.), Detention Hearing as to Brenda Mabel Jimenez Murillo held on 4/12/2024 (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.) Court GRANTS Government's Motion to Detain, Spanish Language Interpreter NOT required as to Brenda Mabel Jimenez Murillo, Due Process Protections Act Warning given in Open Court as to Brenda Mabel Jimenez Murillo (Court Reporter ERO.) (cs) [3:24-mj-01437-MAT]
Related: [-]
14 14 Order Regarding Due Process Protections Act as to Brenda Mabel Jimenez Murillo. Signed by Judge Miguel A. Torres. (cs) [3:24-mj-01437-MAT]
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 18, 2024
15 15 ORDER GRANTING2 Motion to Detain Defendant without Bond. Detained without Bond as to Brenda Mabel Jimenez Murillo (1). Signed by Judge Miguel A. Torres. (cs) [3:24-mj-01437-MAT]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 01, 2024
If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Berton (bot1)
Related: [-]
16 16 INDICTMENT Related [+] with Notice of Forfeiture included as to Brenda Mabel Jimenez Murillo. Unredacted document sealed pursuant to E-Government Act of 2002 as to Brenda Mabel Jimenez Murillo (1) count(s) 1, 2. (bot2)
Related: [-] dacted Version
18 18 Personal Data Sheet (SEALED) as to Brenda Mabel Jimenez Murillo (bot2)
Related: [-]