Original Case: 1:19-cv-02170

Seventh Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:24-cv-01934
Typecivil / private
Nature of Suit315 Torts - Personal Injury - Airplane Product Liability
Case Filed:May 29, 2024
Terminated:Sep 11, 2024
Last checked: Thursday Sep 12, 2024 5:20 AM CDT
Appellant
ANG JIN
Represented By
Ang Jin
LISHUITANG TCM CLINIC
contact info
Appellee
JIAN ZHEN LI
Represented By
Zhidong Wang
Z. WANG & ASSOCIATES, P.C.
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
BOEING COMPANY
Represented By
Dan K. Webb
WINSTON & STRAWN LLP
contact info
Christopher B. Essig
WINSTON & STRAWN LLP
contact info
Julia Johnson
WINSTON & STRAWN LLP
contact info
Linda T. Coberly
WINSTON & STRAWN LLP
contact info
Samuel M. Zuidema
WINSTON & STRAWN LLP
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
ROSEMOUNT AEROSPACE, INC.
Represented By
Shane B. Nichols
FITZPATRICK, HUNT & PAGANO, LLP
contact info
Nicholas C. Bart
FITZPATRICK, HUNT & PAGANO, LLP
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
ROCKWELL COLLINS, INC.
Represented By
Shane B. Nichols
FITZPATRICK, HUNT & PAGANO, LLP
contact info
Nicholas C. Bart
FITZPATRICK, HUNT & PAGANO, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
CHEN ZHAO, as personal representatives of the ESTATE OF YETAO JIN
Represented By
Zhidong Wang
Z. WANG & ASSOCIATES, P.C.
contact info
Robert A. Clifford
CLIFFORD LAW OFFICES, P.C.
contact info
Yvette C. Loizon
CLIFFORD LAW OFFICES, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 09/12/2024 5:19 AM CDT
Wednesday, May 29, 2024
1 1 Private civil case docketed. Fee due. Docketing Statement due for Appellant Ang Jin by 06/04/2024. Transcript information sheet due by 06/12/2024. Fee or IFP forms due on 06/12/2024 for Appellant Ang Jin. [1] [7385541] 24-1934 (MAN) [Entered: 05/30/2024 03:50 PM]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 267 pgs Civil Case
Att: 2 2 pgs Attorney / Party Notice of Docketing
Att: 3 2 pgs Fee Notice
Att: 4 1 pgs Notice to District Court