California Central District Court
Judge:Kenly Kiya Kato
Referred: David T Bristow
Case #: 5:24-cv-01147
Nature of Suit820 Property Rights - Copyrights
Cause17:501 Copyright Infringement
Case Filed:May 31, 2024
Terminated:Feb 13, 2025
Last checked: Thursday Nov 28, 2024 12:20 AM PST
Defendant
Concrete Addicts Inc.
Plaintiff
Ricky Flores
Represented By
Craig B Sanders
Sanders Law Group
contact info
Jacqueline Mandel
Sanders Law Group
contact info


Docket last updated: 13 minutes ago
Thursday, February 13, 2025
23 23 misc Report of Determination of Copyright Action (CLOSE) (AO 121) Thu 02/13 10:24 AM
REPORT ON THE DETERMINATION OF AN ACTION Regarding a Copyright. (Closing) (aco)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Judgment
22 22 judgmentCV Judgment Thu 02/13 10:21 AM
JUDGMENT by Judge Kenly Kiya Kato. Pursuant to the Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment, IT IS HEREBY ADJUDGED that judgment is entered in favor of plaintiff Ricky Flores ("Plaintiff") against defendant Concrete Addicts Inc. ("Defendant"). Pursuant to this Judgment, Defendant is ORDERED to pay Plaintiff damages in the amount of $16,463.50 from the date of entry of judgment in this action. (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (aco)
Related: [-]
21 21 order Default Judgment Thu 02/13 10:16 AM
MINUTES (In Chambers) Order GRANTING Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment [Dkt. 18] by Judge Kenly Kiya Kato. For the reasons set forth above, Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment is GRANTED. The Court, therefore, ORDERS judgment be entered in favor of Plaintiff against Defendant in the amount of $16,463.50. (See document for further information).; granting18 MOTION for Default Judgment. (aco)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 06, 2025
20 20 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Thu 02/06 10:49 AM
(IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge Kenly Kiya Kato: The Court finds Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment [Dkt. 18] appropriate for resolution without oral argument. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 78; L.R. 7-15. Accordingly, the hearing set for February 13, 2025 is hereby VACATED and the matter is taken under submission. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (npo)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 09, 2025
19 19 textonly Generic Text Only Entry Thu 01/09 3:01 PM
NOTICE AND ORDER by Judge Kenly Kiya Kato: On January 7, 2025, the Court issued an Order to Show Cause ("OSC") why this action should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute because the Court had not received a Motion for Default Judgment. Dkt. 17. In light of the Motion for Default Judgment filed on January 8, 2025, dkt. 18, the January 7, 2025 OSC, dkt. 17, is hereby DISCHARGED. Plaintiff is warned that future failure to comply with Court orders will result in sanctions, which may include dismissal for failure to prosecute and/or comply with Court orders. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(b). IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (npo)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 08, 2025
18 18 motion Default Judgment Wed 01/08 11:16 AM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Default Judgment against Defendant Concrete Addicts Inc. filed by Plaintiff Ricky Flores. Motion set for hearing on 2/13/2025 at 09:30 AM before Judge Kenly Kiya Kato. (Mandel, Jacqueline)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Jacqueline Mandel, Esq. in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment,
Att: 2 Declaration of Ricky Flores in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment,
Att: 3 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment against Defendant Concrete Addicts Inc.,
Att: 4 Proposed Order Proposed Judgment on Motion for Default Judgment
Tuesday, January 07, 2025
17 17 2 pgs order Order to Show Cause Wed 01/08 9:50 AM
MINUTES (In Chambers) Order to Show Cause Why Action Should Not Be Dismissed for Failure to Prosecute by Judge Kenly Kiya Kato. Accordingly, the Court, on its own motion, orders plaintiff(s) to show cause in writing no later than seven days from the date of this Order why this action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution as to those defendant(s). (See document for further information). (aco)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 27, 2024
16 16 order Clerks Entry of Default (CV-37) - optional html form Wed 11/27 8:38 AM
DEFAULT BY CLERK F.R.Civ.P.55(a) as to Concrete Addicts Inc. (bm)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 21, 2024
15 15 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Thu 11/21 9:53 AM
CIVIL STANDING ORDER by Judge Kenly Kiya Kato. (npo)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 18, 2024
14 14 notice Notice of Reassignment (CV-87) of Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program Mon 11/18 5:54 PM
NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT of MJDAP case from Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym to Judge Kenly Kiya Kato for all further proceedings. Any discovery matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to U.S. Magistrate Judge David T. Bristow. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judges 5:24-cv-01147 KK(DTBx). (rn)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 05, 2024
13 13 motion Clerk to Enter Default Tue 11/05 9:49 AM
REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against Defendant Concrete Addicts Inc. filed by Plaintiff Ricky Flores. (Mandel, Jacqueline)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Jacqueline Mandel in Support of Plaintiff's Request for Entry of Default against Defendant,
Att: 2 Supplement Certificate of Service
Wednesday, October 09, 2024
12 12 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Wed 10/09 8:48 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Ricky Flores, upon Defendant Concrete Addicts Inc. served on 9/27/2024, answer due 10/18/2024. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon George Garrett, Deputy Clerk in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity and no service by mail was executed (Sanders, Craig)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 09, 2024
11 11 order Leave Mon 09/09 4:48 PM
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym: Granting10 MOTION, the Court GRANTS Plaintiff's Request as follows: (1) The California Secretary of State shall accept service on behalf of Concrete Addicts Inc. which has been doing business in the State of California but does not have a valid registered agent address on file. (2) Plaintiff shall serve the California Secretary of State with the Summons and Complaint of this instant matter within thirty (30) of the date of this order, and shall file proof of such service. (es)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 05, 2024
10 10 motion Leave Thu 09/05 12:18 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Serve the California Secretary of State (Unopposed) filed by Plaintiff Ricky Flores. (Mandel, Jacqueline)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Jacqueline Mandel in Support of Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Serve the California Secretary of State,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1 - Proof of Non Service,
Att: 3 Exhibit 2 - Screengrab of Website,
Att: 4 Exhibit 3 - Proof of Non Service,
Att: 5 Exhibit 4 - TLO Report for Concrete Addicts,
Att: 6 Exhibit 5 - TLO Report for Don Paul Landrum,
Att: 7 Proposed Order
Thursday, August 29, 2024
9 9 order Leave Fri 08/30 10:38 AM
MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym: Order Denying Motion for Service Through California Secretary of State Without Prejudice8 (SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS). (kca)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 06, 2024
8 8 motion Leave Tue 08/06 9:00 AM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Serve the California Secretary of State and for an Extension of time to Serve Defendant (Unopposed) filed by Plaintiff Ricky Flores. (Attorney Jacqueline Mandel added to party Ricky Flores(pty:pla)) (Mandel, Jacqueline)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Affidavit of Non-Service (1),
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - Screengrab of Website,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 - Affidavit of Non-Service (2),
Att: 4 Proposed Order
Monday, June 03, 2024
7 7 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Mon 06/03 11:53 AM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 as to Defendant Concrete Addicts Inc.. (sh)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Notice to Counsel (CV-20a) Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program - optional html form Mon 06/03 11:50 AM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. This case has been randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym. (sh)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 CV-11C
Friday, May 31, 2024
5 5 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Fri 05/31 8:34 AM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Ricky Flores, identifying SANDERS LAW GROUP, Craig Sanders, Concrete Addicts Inc.. (Sanders, Craig)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Report on Filing of Copyright Action (Initial Notification) (AO-121) Fri 05/31 8:33 AM
REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Ricky Flores. (Sanders, Craig)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Summons Request Fri 05/31 8:32 AM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by Plaintiff Ricky Flores. (Sanders, Craig)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Fri 05/31 8:31 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Ricky Flores. (Sanders, Craig)
Related: [-]
1 1 8 pgs cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Fri 05/31 8:30 AM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-37565000 - Fee: $405, filed by Plaintiff Ricky Flores. (Attorney Craig B Sanders added to party Ricky Flores(pty:pla))(Sanders, Craig)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Original Photograph,
Att: 2 Exhibit Infringing Use of Photograph