Indiana Northern District Court
Judge:Cristal C Brisco
Referred: Michael G Gotsch, Sr
Case #: 3:24-cv-00452
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
Cause15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Case Filed:May 31, 2024
Terminated:Aug 12, 2024
Last checked: Thursday Nov 28, 2024 3:34 AM EST
Defendant
Hunter Warfield, Inc.
Represented By
Jennifer J Kalas
Hinshaw & Culbertson Llp - Sch/in
contact info
Plaintiff
Amanda Warren
Represented By
John T Steinkamp
John Steinkamp & Associates LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Monday, August 12, 2024
10 10 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case ~Util - Terminate Motions Mon 08/12 10:01 AM
ORDER: Pursuant to9 Joint Stipulated Motion to Dismiss with Prejudice and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii), this case is DISMISSED with prejudice, each party bearing its own costs and attorney's fees. The Clerk is DIRECTED to close this case. Signed by Judge Cristal C Brisco on 8/12/2024. (lns)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 09, 2024
9 9 motion Stipulation to Dismiss Fri 08/09 5:24 PM
STIPULATION to Dismiss with Prejudice by Plaintiff Amanda Warren. (Steinkamp, John)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 30, 2024
8 8 order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Tue 07/30 2:28 PM
ORDER: Pursuant to the7 Notice of Settlement filed by Amanda Warren. The parties are ordered to submit the dismissal papers by 9/30/2024. Text-only order by Judge Cristal C Brisco on 7/30/2024. (rmc)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 29, 2024
7 7 notice Notice of Settlement Mon 07/29 10:56 AM
NOTICE of Settlement by Amanda Warren (Steinkamp, John)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 27, 2024
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Thu 06/27 10:33 AM
Set Deadline per DE6 Agreed Notice. Dft Hunter Warfield, Inc. answer due 7/24/2024. (mrm)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 26, 2024
6 6 notice Agreed Notice to Extend Time to File Answer Wed 06/26 1:54 PM
AGREED NOTICE to extend time to file answer filed by Hunter Warfield, Inc. ; answer due by 7/24/2024. (Kalas, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 06/26 1:52 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer J Kalas on behalf of Hunter Warfield, Inc. (Kalas, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 17, 2024
4 4 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 06/17 1:40 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Amanda Warren. Hunter Warfield, Inc. served on 6/5/2024, answer due 6/26/2024.(Steinkamp, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1- Affidavit of Service
Monday, June 03, 2024
3 3 service Summons Issued Mon 06/03 9:40 AM
Summons Issued as to Hunter Warfield, Inc. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (kmt)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges Mon 06/03 9:40 AM
**NEW CASE** Judge Cristal C Brisco and Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr added. (kmt)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 31, 2024
2 2 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 05/31 12:01 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by John T Steinkamp on behalf of Amanda Warren (Steinkamp, John)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 05/31 12:00 PM
COMPLAINT for Damages against Hunter Warfield, Inc.( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AINNDC-5589304.), filed by Amanda Warren.(Steinkamp, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1- Debt Collector License Information,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2- The March 19, 2024 Facsimile sent to Defendant,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3- Plaintiff's Affidavit,
Att: 4 Exhibit A- Relevant pages of Plaintiff's May 20, 2024 Experian credit report,
Att: 5 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 6 Proposed Summons