Member Case
Lead case is: 6:24-bk-60025

Texas Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Christopher M Lopez
Case #: 6:24-bk-60026
Case Filed:May 31, 2024

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$500,001 to $1 million
Est. Liabilities $1,000,001 to $10 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Grace Funeral Home, Inc.
2401 Houston Hwy
Victoria, TX 77901-5736
Represented By
William P Haddock
Pendergraft & Simon
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
US Trustee
Office of the US Trustee 515 Rusk Ave Ste 3516
Houston, TX 77002


Docket last updated: 1 minutes ago
Monday, October 21, 2024
14 14 misc Operating Report - Debtor-in-Possession Monthly Mon 10/21 11:22 PM
Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period ending 9/30/2024, $208855 disbursed (Filed By Grace Funeral Home, Inc. ). (Haddock, William)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 23, 2024
13 13 misc Operating Report - Debtor-in-Possession Monthly Mon 09/23 11:49 AM
Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period ending 8/31/2024, $185254 disbursed (Filed By Grace Funeral Home, Inc. ). (Haddock, William)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 20, 2024
12 12 claims Withdrawal of Claim Fri 09/20 11:36 AM
Withdrawal of Claim: 10 (Brown, Silvia)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 20, 2024
11 11 misc Operating Report - Debtor-in-Possession Monthly Tue 08/20 10:00 PM
Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period ending 7/31/2024, $232043 disbursed (Filed By Grace Funeral Home, Inc. ). (Haddock, William)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 22, 2024
10 10 misc Operating Report - Debtor-in-Possession Monthly Mon 07/22 11:11 PM
Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period ending 6/30/2024, $202068 disbursed (Filed By Grace Funeral Home, Inc. ). (Haddock, William)
Related: [-]
9 9 1 pgs notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Mon 07/22 3:52 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Nathaniel Peter Holzer Filed by on behalf of NewFirst National Bank (Holzer, Nathaniel)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 11, 2024
8 8 misc Schedule A/B Thu 07/11 10:09 PM
Amended Schedule A/B: Property Non-Individual , Amended Schedule D Non-Individual- Creditors Having Claims Secured by Property (Filed By Grace Funeral Home, Inc. ). (Haddock, William)
Related: [-]
crditcrd none Thu 07/11 10:16 PM
Receipt of Schedule D - Creditors Holding Secured Claims([LINK 24-60026 ) [misc,schd] ( 34.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A25419047. Fee amount $ 34.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 14, 2024
7 7 16 pgs misc Statement of Financial Affairs Fri 06/14 9:15 PM
Statement of Financial Affairs for Non-Individual (Filed By Grace Funeral Home, Inc. ). (Haddock, William)
Related: [-]
6 6 26 pgs misc Schedule A/B Fri 06/14 9:13 PM
Schedule A/B: Property Non-Individual , Schedule D Non-Individual- Creditors Having Claims Secured by Property , Schedule E/F: Creditors Who Have Unsecured Claims Non-Individual , Schedule G Non-Individual- Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases , Schedule H Non-Individual- Codebtors (Filed By Grace Funeral Home, Inc. ). (Haddock, William)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 05, 2024
5 5 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Wed 06/05 11:38 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 27. Notice Date 06/05/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 3 Order for Joint Administration
Tuesday, June 04, 2024
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Tue 06/04 1:34 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Cliff A Wade Filed by on behalf of SL Funding 5, LLC (Wade, Cliff)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 03, 2024
3 3 order Joint Administration Mon 06/03 4:33 PM
Order for Joint Administration under 24-60025 Signed on 6/3/2024 (rgs4)
Related: [-]
utility Remark (PUBLIC ENTRY) Mon 06/03 4:33 PM
An order directing joint administration of this case has been entered by the Court in accordance with FED. R. BANKR. P. 1015(b). The docket in Case No. 24-60025 should be consulted for all matters affecting this case. All future pleadings shall be filed in and all subsequent docket entries shall be made in the Lead Case. Interested parties are directed to the order directing joint administration for further information. (rgs4)
Related: [-]
Sunday, June 02, 2024
2 2 notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Sun 06/02 3:58 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Seth Herschel Kretzer Filed by on behalf of Seth Kretzer (Kretzer, Seth)
Related: [-]
Saturday, June 01, 2024
crditcrd none Sat 06/01 6:39 AM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK 24-60026 ) [misc,volp11] (1738.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number B25328807. Fee amount $1738.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 31, 2024
1 1 7 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) [system event] Fri 05/31 9:36 PM
Chapter 11 Subchapter V Voluntary Petition Non-Individual Fee Amount $1738 Filed by Grace Funeral Home, Inc.. (Haddock, William)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 List of Creditors Who Have the 20 Largest Unsecured Claims and Are Not Insiders
misc Creditor Mailing List Loaded Fri 05/31 9:38 PM
Creditor Mailing List Uploaded by Attorney. (Filed By Grace Funeral Home, Inc. ). (Haddock, William)
Related: [-]