Original Case: 1:01-cv-09056

Second Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:14-cv-04394
Typecivil / private
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Case Filed:Nov 21, 2014
Terminated:Mar 08, 2016
Last checked: Thursday Mar 10, 2016 7:47 AM EST
Defendant
Wamex Holdings, Inc.
Defendant
Laura DeTrano, as the Administrator of the Estate of Roger M. DeTrano
Defendant
Orientstar Finance, Ltd.
Defendant
Oriental New Investments, Ltd.
Defendant
VJV Inc.
Defendant
Exchange Bank & Trust, Inc.
Defendant
Bruce M. Millstein
Defendant
David Weiss
Defendant
Roger H. Chlowitz
Defendant
Scott Cameron
Defendant
Heartland Capital
Defendant
Eugene C. Geiger
Defendant
Alfred Peeper
Defendant
Charles R. Eisenstein
Defendant
Russell A. Chimenti, Jr.
Defendant
Mitchell H. Cushing
Defendant
Roger M. Detrano
Defendant
Trevor Koenig
Defendant
Renaissance Gallery, Inc.
Defendant
Zimenn Importing and Exporting, Inc.
Defendant
Fairmont Consulting Group
Defendant
Provident Partners, Ltd.
Defendant
Commonwealth Associates, Inc.
Defendant
Galton Scott &Golett Inc.
Defendant
Dottenhoff Financial Ltd.
Defendant
Berkshire Capital Partners, Inc.
Defendant - Appellant
Edward A. Durante, AKA Ed Simmons
Represented By
JaneAnne Murray
Murray Law LLC
contact info
Richard D. Willstatter
Green & Willstatter
contact info
Intervenor
United States Attorney
Represented By
Andrew J. Ceresney
Debevoise & Plimpton LLP
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
U.S. Securities and Exchange Commission
Represented By
Christopher Paik
United States Securities and Exchange Commission
contact info
Tracey Hardin
United States Securities and Exchange Commission
contact info


Docket last updated: 08/24/2022 4:33 PM EDT
Friday, November 21, 2014
1 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Edward A. Durante, FILED. [1379539] 14-4394 [Entered: 11/26/2014 11:18 AM]
Related: [-]
2 2 DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 09/25/2014, RECEIVED.[1379553] 14-4394 [Entered: 11/26/2014 11:22 AM]
Related: [-]