New Mexico District Court
Case #: 1:24-cr-00709
Case Filed:May 29, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Jun 01, 2024 1:57 AM MDT
Defendant
Timothy Malek (1)
Represented By
Daniel Benjamin Snyder
Federal Public Defender - District Of New Mexico
contact info
Interested Party
US Probation and Pretrial Services
Represented By
Mindy Pirkovic
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
David B. Hirsch
Doj-Usao
contact info


Docket last updated: 06/01/2024 3:48 AM MDT
Wednesday, May 01, 2024
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Timothy Malek (1). (kd) [1:24-mj-00636-LF]
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 02, 2024
Arrest of Timothy Malek (kd) [1:24-mj-00636-LF]
Related: [-]
Case unsealed as to Timothy Malek (kd) [1:24-mj-00636-LF]
Related: [-]
3 3 NOTICE OF HEARING as to Timothy Malek: Initial Appearance set for 5/3/2024 at 09:30 AM in Albuquerque - 320 Rio Grande Courtroom before Magistrate Judge B. Paul Briones. (kd) [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] [1:24-mj-00636-LF]
Related: [-]
Friday, May 03, 2024
U.S. Probation and Pretrial Services added as interested party.(Pirkovic, Mindy) [1:24-mj-00636-LF]
Related: [-]
4 4 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER Daniel Benjamin Snyder for Timothy Malek by Magistrate Judge B. Paul Briones (cl) [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] [1:24-mj-00636-LF]
Related: [-]
6 6 Clerk's Minutes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge B. Paul Briones: Initial Appearance as to Timothy Malek held on 5/3/2024. Preliminary/Detention Hearing set for 5/7/2024 at 09:30 AM in Albuquerque - 320 Rio Grande Courtroom before Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing. Related [+] (nm) [1:24-mj-00636-LF]
Related: [-] cording Info: Rio Grande
7 7 Pursuant to the Due Process Protections Act, the Court confirms the United States' obligation to produce all exculpatory evidence to the defendant pursuant to Brady v. Maryland, 373 U.S. 83 (1963) and its progeny, and orders it to do so. Failing to do so in a timely manner may result in consequences, including but not limited to, exclusion of evidence, adverse jury instructions, dismissal of charges, contempt proceedings, or sanctions by Magistrate Judge B. Paul Briones (nm) [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] [1:24-mj-00636-LF]
Related: [-]
8 8 ORAL ORDER of Temporary Detention as to Timothy Malek by Magistrate Judge B. Paul Briones (nm) [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] [1:24-mj-00636-LF]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 07, 2024
10 10 WAIVER of Preliminary Hearing by Timothy Malek (nm) [1:24-mj-00636-LF]
Related: [-]
11 11 Clerk's Minutes before Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing: Preliminary Hearing as to Timothy Malek held; Detention Hearing continued until 5/9/2024 at 09:30 AM in Albuquerque - 320 Rio Grande Courtroom Related [+] (kd) [1:24-mj-00636-LF]
Related: [-] cording Info: Liberty-Rio Grande
Thursday, May 09, 2024
13 13 Clerk's Minutes before Magistrate Judge Karen B. Molzen: Detention Hearing as to Timothy Malek held Related [+] (kd) [1:24-mj-00636-LF]
Related: [-] cording Info: Liberty-Rio Grande
14 14 ORDER OF DETENTION as to Timothy Malek by Magistrate Judge Karen B. Molzen (kd) [1:24-mj-00636-LF]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 29, 2024
16 16 REDACTED INDICTMENT as to Timothy Malek. (nm)
Related: [-]