Colorado District Court
Case #: 1:24-cr-00142
Case Filed:May 03, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Jun 02, 2024 1:16 AM MDT
Defendant
Linberg Steven Root (1)
Represented By
Ryan E. Brungard
Duthie Savastano Brungard PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Lisa Franceware
U.S. Attorney'S Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 06/02/2024 1:46 AM MDT
Thursday, May 02, 2024
1 1 INDICTMENT as to Lindberg Steven Root (1) count(s) 1. (ccuen, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Criminal Information Sheet
2 2 Arrest Warrant Issued in case as to Lindberg Steven Root. (ccuen, )
Related: [-]
3 3 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge James M Candelaria as to Linberg Steven Root. This Court enters a standing order referring all motions filed by any party in this action (including all currently pending motions and all future motions) to the Magistrate Judge for a Recommendation pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(B). Within 14 days of the Magistrate Judge's entry of an oral or written Recommendation for the disposition of any motion, any party may file Objections to that Recommendation pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1). SO ORDERED by District Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 5/2/2024. Text Only Entry. (ccuen, )
Related: [-]
5 5 RESTRICTED DOCUMENT - Level 4: as to Lindberg Steven Root. (schap, )
Related: [-]
Friday, May 03, 2024
4 4 ORDER OF RECUSAL by Magistrate Judge James M Candelaria on 5/3/2024 as to Lindberg Steven Root. I recuse myself from further service in this matter. The Clerk of the Court shall cause this case to be reassigned to another Magistrate Judge in a referral role for all future referral matters. (ccuen, )
Related: [-]