Ohio Southern District Court
Judge:Douglas R Cole
Case #: 1:24-cv-00307
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Jun 01, 2024
Last checked: Thursday Nov 28, 2024 3:53 AM EST
Defendant
Chance Blankenship
Defendant
Pam Wagner
Defendant
City of Ironton, Ohio
Plaintiff
Elisha L. Griffith
Represented By
Tyler Christian Haslam
Haslam Law Firm LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Monday, May 12, 2025
16 16 respm Reply to Response to Motion Mon 05/12 5:49 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re12 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Defendants Chance Blankenship, City of Ironton, Ohio, Pam Wagner. (Frick, Dawn)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
15 15 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Tue 04/29 6:31 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re12 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Plaintiff Elisha L. Griffith. (Haslam, Tyler)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Ex. 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit Ex. 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit Ex. 3,
Att: 4 Exhibit Ex. 4,
Att: 5 Exhibit Ex. 5,
Att: 6 Exhibit Ex. 6,
Att: 7 Exhibit Ex. 7,
Att: 8 Exhibit Ex. 8,
Att: 9 Exhibit Ex. 9,
Att: 10 Exhibit Ex. 10,
Att: 11 Exhibit Ex. 11,
Att: 12 Exhibit Ex. 12
Tuesday, April 08, 2025
14 14 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 04/08 4:24 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Justin R. Marks for Defendants Chance Blankenship, City of Ironton, Ohio, Pam Wagner (Marks, Justin)
Related: [-]
13 13 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 04/08 4:20 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey Charles Turner for Defendants Chance Blankenship, City of Ironton, Ohio, Pam Wagner (Turner, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
12 12 motion Dismiss Tue 04/08 4:15 PM
MOTION to Dismiss by Defendants Chance Blankenship, City of Ironton, Ohio, Pam Wagner. (Frick, Dawn)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibits
11 11 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 04/08 3:25 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Dawn M Frick for Defendants Chance Blankenship, City of Ironton, Ohio, Pam Wagner (Frick, Dawn)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 26, 2025
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Wed 03/26 12:43 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Chance Blankenship answer due 4/8/2025; City of Ironton, Ohio answer due 4/8/2025; Pam Wagner answer due 4/8/2025. (mas)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 19, 2025
10 10 service Affidavit of Service Wed 03/19 8:39 AM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons & Complaint served on Mark Dickess on 03/18/2025, filed by Plaintiff Elisha L. Griffith. (Haslam, Tyler)
Related: [-]
9 9 service Affidavit of Service Wed 03/19 8:38 AM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons & Complaint served on Pam Wagner on 03/18/2025, filed by Plaintiff Elisha L. Griffith. (Haslam, Tyler)
Related: [-]
8 8 service Affidavit of Service Wed 03/19 8:35 AM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons & Complaint served on Chance Blankenship on 03/18/2025, filed by Plaintiff Elisha L. Griffith. (Haslam, Tyler)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 17, 2025
7 7 service Summons Issued Mon 03/17 2:54 PM
Summons Issued as to Chance Blankenship, City of Ironton, Ohio, Pam Wagner. (jmt)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Request for Issuance of Summons Mon 03/17 1:33 PM
REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. to City of Ironton (Haslam, Tyler)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Request for Issuance of Summons Mon 03/17 12:07 PM
REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. to Pam Wagner (Haslam, Tyler)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Request for Issuance of Summons Mon 03/17 12:06 PM
[Document 4] was inadvertently filed and has been restricted. The party has been notified to re-file the correct document. REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. to City of Ironton (Haslam, Tyler) Modified on docket text and security 3/17/2025 (jmt)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Request for Issuance of Summons Mon 03/17 12:05 PM
REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. to Chance Blankenship (Haslam, Tyler)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 18, 2025
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Tue 02/18 2:37 PM
NOTATION ORDER granting2 Plaintiff's Motion to Extend Time until 3/18/25 to Effect Service of Process. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Douglas R. Cole on 2/18/25. (sct)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 14, 2025
2 2 motion Extension of Time Fri 02/14 11:32 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time New date requested 3/14/2025. to Effectuate Service by Plaintiff Elisha L. Griffith. (Haslam, Tyler)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 03, 2024
misc Docket Annotation Mon 06/03 8:06 AM
If this case is referred, it will be to Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman. (zmc)
Related: [-]
Saturday, June 01, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint Sat 06/01 11:23 PM
COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405 paid - receipt number: AOHSDC-10001834), filed by Elisha L. Griffith. (Haslam, Tyler)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet