Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Judge:Catherine Henry
Case #: 2:24-cv-02376
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Jun 02, 2024
Last checked: Friday Nov 29, 2024 4:58 AM EST
Defendant
BUCKS COUNTY CORRECTIONAL FACILITY
1730 S. Easton Road
Doylestown, PA 18901
Represented By
JORDAN B. ROSENBERG
Segal Mccambridge Singer Mahoney
contact info
Dara Burns
Bucks County
contact info
Defendant
BUCKS COUNTY OF PENNSYLVANIA
55 East Street
Doylestown, PA 18901
Represented By
JORDAN B. ROSENBERG
Segal Mccambridge Singer Mahoney
contact info
Dara Burns
Bucks County
contact info
Defendant
CORRECTIONAL OFFICER JOHN DOES (1-10)
Plaintiff
CLINTON WALKER
2602 Ridge Avenue
Philadelphia, PA 19121
Represented By
RODERICK L. FOXWORTH, JR.
Foxworth Law Group
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
DEPUTY WARDEN DAVID GALIONE
Terminated: 09/05/2024
Warden or Acting Warden, in his individual and official capacity 1730 S. Easton Road
Doylestown, PA 18901
Represented By
Dara Burns
Bucks County
contact info
Defendant
CARL METELLUS
Terminated: 09/05/2024
Warden or Deputy Warden, in his individual and official capacity 1730 S. Easton Road
Doylestown, PA 18901
Represented By
Dara Burns
Bucks County
contact info


Docket last updated: 34 minutes ago
Monday, May 19, 2025
25 25 minutes Status Conference Mon 05/19 3:12 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE PAMELA A. CARLOS. A Pretrial Status Conference was held via Telephone on May 19, 2025, Not on the Record. (DT)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 17, 2025
24 24 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Thu 04/17 2:13 PM
ORDER OF 4/17/25 THAT A TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE WILL BE HELD ON MONDAY, MAY 19, 2025 (INSTEAD OF TUESDAY, APRIL 22, 2025) AT 2:30PM BEFORE MAGISTRATE JUDGE: PAMELA A. CARLOS. ETC. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: PAMELA A. CARLOS ON 4/17/25. 4/17/25 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(dt)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 14, 2025
23 23 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Mon 04/14 12:45 PM
ORDER, ( STATUS CONFERENCE SET FOR 4/22/2025 02:30 PM IN Telephone Conference BEFORE MAGISTRATE JUDGE PAMELA A. CARLOS.). SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE PAMELA A. CARLOS ON 3/24/25. 4/14/25 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(er)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 31, 2025
22 22 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Mon 03/31 3:40 PM
ORDER THAT THE E-MAIL BE CONSTRUED AS A MOTION AND THE MOTION WAS GRANTED. THE CONFERENCE PREVIOUSLY SCHEDULED TO BE HELD IN PERSON ON MARCH 17, 2025, WAS RESCHEDULED TO A VIDEO CONFERENCE. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE CATHERINE HENRY ON 3/31/25.3/31/25 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(er)
Related: [-]
21 21 motion Miscellaneous Relief Mon 03/31 3:39 PM
MOTION RESCHEDULE TO VIDEO CONFERENCE..(er)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 25, 2025
20 20 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 03/25 12:14 PM
ANSWER to Complaint together with Affirmative Defenses by BUCKS COUNTY CORRECTIONAL FACILITY, BUCKS COUNTY OF PENNSYLVANIA.(ROSENBERG, JORDAN)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 19, 2025
19 19 order Scheduling Order ~Util - Set Deadlines ~Util - Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Wed 03/19 2:20 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER OF 3/18/25 THAT ALL FACT DISCOVERY SHALL BE COMPLETED BY SEPTEMBER 17, 2025. ETC. MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND OTHER DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS, SHALL BE FILED BY OCTOBER 18, 2025. RESPONSES TO ANYMOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMETN SHALL BE FILED BY NOVEMBER 18, 2025. REPLY BRIEFS IN SUPPORT OF SUMMARY JUDGMENT SHALL BE FILED BY DECEMBER 2, 2025. THIS MATTER IS REFERRED TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE: PAMELA A. CARLOS FOR THE PURPOSES OF A SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. THE PARTIES SHALL SUBMIT A STATUS REPORT TO CHAMBERS BY AUGUST 18, 2025. SIGNED BY JUDGE: CATHERINE HENRY ON 3/18/25. 3/19/25 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (DT)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 18, 2025
18 18 1 pgs order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge-Settlement ~Util - Set Deadlines ~Util - Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Tue 03/18 3:50 PM
Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge MAGISTRATE JUDGE PAMELA A. CARLOS, ( DISCOVERY DUE BY 9/17/2025., MOTIONS DUE BY 10/18/2025., MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT DUE BY 10/18/2025., Status Report due by 8/18/2025.), ( RESPONSES DUE BY 11/18/2025., REPLIES DUE BY 12/2/2025.) SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE CATHERINE HENRY ON 3/18/25. 3/18/25 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(er)
Related: [-]
17 17 minutes Pretrial Conference - Initial Tue 03/18 12:06 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before DISTRICT JUDGE CATHERINE HENRY: Video Pretrial Conference held on 3/17/25. Court Reporter: None. (er)
Related: [-]
16 16 1 pgs order Order Tue 03/18 9:49 AM
ORDER THAT THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE ASSIGNED TO THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED CASE IS MAGISTRATE PAMELA A. CARLOS. IF THE DISTRICT JUDGE DEEMS REFERRAL APPROPRIATE, A SEPARATE REFERRAL ORDER, SPECIFYING THE REASON FOR REFERRAL, WILL BE ISSUED BY THE DISTRICT COURT JUDGE. SIGNED BY GEORGE V WYLESOL, CLERK OF COURT ON 3/18/25. 3/18/25 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (mbh)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 10, 2025
15 15 discov Discovery Plan Mon 03/10 2:29 PM
Discovery Plan by BUCKS COUNTY CORRECTIONAL FACILITY, BUCKS COUNTY OF PENNSYLVANIA.(ROSENBERG, JORDAN)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 06, 2025
14 14 notice Notice of Hearing Thu 03/06 1:25 PM
Amended NOTICE Hearing: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SET FOR 3/17/2025 at 03:30 PM Via Video Conference BEFORE DISTRICT JUDGE CATHERINE HENRY.(sfl)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 26f Report
Wednesday, March 05, 2025
13 13 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Wed 03/05 9:37 AM
ORDER OF 3/5/25 THAT DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS (DOC. 3) IS DENIED. DEFENDANTS SHALL FILE AN ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT WITIN TWENTY DAYS. ORAL ARGUMENT ON THE MOTION TO DISMISS THAT WAS PREVIOUSLY SCHEDULE DFOR MARCH 17, 2025 IS CANCELLED. THE INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE WHILL BE HELD AS PREVIOUSLY SCHEDULED. ETC. SIGNED BY JUDGE: CATHERINE HENRY ON 3/5/25. 3/5/25 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (DT)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 04, 2025
12 12 notice Notice of Hearing on Motion Tue 02/04 4:15 PM
NOTICE of Hearing on Motion3 MOTION to Dismiss : MOTION HEARING SET FOR 3/17/2025 11:00 AM IN Holmes 4th Floor BEFORE DISTRICT JUDGE CATHERINE HENRY.(sfl)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Notice of Hearing Tue 02/04 4:10 PM
NOTICE of Hearing: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SET FOR 3/17/2025 11:00 AM IN Holmes 4th Floor BEFORE DISTRICT JUDGE CATHERINE HENRY.(sfl)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 26f Report
Friday, January 10, 2025
10 10 1 pgs order Order Reassigning Case Fri 01/10 7:26 AM
ORDER THAT THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED FROM DISTRICT JUDGE NITZA I QUINONES ALEJANDRO TO DISTRICT JUDGE CATHERINE HENRY FOR ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS. SIGNED BY GEORGE V WYLESOL, CLERK OF COURT ON 1/9/25. 1/10/25 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(JL)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 16, 2024
9 9 notice Notice (Other) Wed 10/16 1:12 PM
NOTICE by BUCKS COUNTY CORRECTIONAL FACILITY, BUCKS COUNTY OF PENNSYLVANIA of Substitution of Counsel (ROSENBERG, JORDAN)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 16, 2024
8 8 respm Response to Motion Response in Opposition to Motion Mon 09/16 2:17 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re3 MOTION to Dismiss , RESPONSE in Opposition filed by CLINTON WALKER.(FOXWORTH, RODERICK)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Monday, September 09, 2024
7 7 misc Letter Mon 09/09 3:10 PM
Letter dated September 9 2024 by CLINTON WALKER. (FOXWORTH, RODERICK)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Letter Mon 09/09 2:43 PM
Letter dated September 9 2024 by CLINTON WALKER. (FOXWORTH, RODERICK)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 05, 2024
5 5 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings ~Util - Add and Terminate Parties Thu 09/05 11:07 AM
STIPULATION AND ORDER OF 8/30/24 THAT THE PARTIES HEREBY AGREE AND STIPULATE TO DISMISS DAVID GALIONE AND CARL METELLUS, IN THEIR INDIVIDUAL AND OFFICE CAPACITIES, FROM THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED MATTER. THE PARTIES FURTHER AGREE AND STIPULATE THAT THE PLAINTIFF SHALL HAVE UNTIL SEPTEMBER 6, 2024, TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANT BUCKS COUNTY'S MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO FRCP 12(B)(6). SIGNED BY JUDGE: NITZA I. QUINONES ALEJANDRO ON 8/30/24. 9/5/24 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (DT)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 03, 2024
4 4 misc Stipulation Tue 09/03 11:12 PM
STIPULATION re3 MOTION to Dismiss by CLINTON WALKER. (FOXWORTH, RODERICK)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 15, 2024
3 3 motion Dismiss Thu 08/15 1:02 PM
MOTION to Dismiss filed by BUCKS COUNTY CORRECTIONAL FACILITY, BUCKS COUNTY OF PENNSYLVANIA, DAVID GALIONE, CARL METELLUS.Memorandum, Certificate of Service.(Burns, Dara)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service Cert. of Service,
Att: 2 Memorandum Memorandum of Law,
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order
Monday, June 03, 2024
2 2 service Summons Issued Mon 06/03 11:47 AM
Summons Issued as to BUCKS COUNTY CORRECTIONAL FACILITY, BUCKS COUNTY OF PENNSYLVANIA, DAVID GALIONE, CARL METELLUS. Forwarded To: E-MAILED TO PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL on 6/3/24 (JL)
Related: [-]
Sunday, June 02, 2024
1 1 9 pgs cmp Complaint (Attorney) Sun 06/02 10:11 PM
COMPLAINT against BUCKS COUNTY CORRECTIONAL FACILITY, BUCKS COUNTY OF PENNSYLVANIA, Correctional Officers (1-10), DAVID GALIONE, CARL METELLUS ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number APAEDC-17508105.), filed by CLINTON WALKER.(FOXWORTH, RODERICK)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Designation Form