Georgia Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Jeffery W Cavender
Case #: 1:24-bk-55794
Case Filed:Jun 03, 2024
Dismissed:Jul 15, 2024
Terminated:Aug 28, 2024

Debtor
BBCT Investments & Holdings LLC
3972 Egypt Rd
Snellville, GA 30039-6404
Represented By
BBCT Investments & Holdings LLC
contact info

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 10 minutes ago
Wednesday, September 18, 2024
13 13 misc Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Letter Re: Outstanding Filing Fee Thu 09/19 12:58 AM
Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Letter to Debtor Regarding Outstanding Filing Fee Notice Date 09/18/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Sunday, September 15, 2024
12 12 misc Letter to Debtor re: Unpaid Filing Fees Sun 09/15 6:45 AM
Letter to Debtor Regarding Unpaid Filing Fees (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 28, 2024
misc 06-Close Bankruptcy Case - Dismissed Wed 08/28 9:45 AM
Case Closed (cws)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 17, 2024
11 11 misc Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order on Motion to Dismiss Case (403) Thu 07/18 12:57 AM
Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order on Motion to Dismiss Case Notice Date 07/17/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 15, 2024
10 10 order Dismiss Case, Motion to Mon 07/15 10:40 AM
Order GRANTING United States Trustee's Motion to Dismiss Case. Related [+] Service by BNC. Entered on 7/15/2024. (jlc)
Related: [-] 5
Thursday, June 06, 2024
9 9 misc Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order Regarding Unpaid Filing Fees Fri 06/07 12:59 AM
Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order Regarding Unpaid Filing Fees Notice Date 06/06/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
8 8 misc Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order on Deadlines to Correct New Case Deficiency - Non-Individual Fri 06/07 12:59 AM
Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order on Deadlines to Correct New Case Deficiency - Non-Individual. Notice Date 06/06/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Meeting of Creditors Fri 06/07 12:59 AM
Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Notice of Meeting of Creditors Notice Date 06/06/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 05, 2024
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 06/05 9:21 AM
Notice of Appearance Filed by Lindsay P. S. Kolba on behalf of United States Trustee. (Kolba, Lindsay)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 04, 2024
5 5 motion 05-Motion to Dismiss Case (FOR OTHER) Tue 06/04 8:30 PM
Motion to Dismiss Case filed by Adriano Omar Iqbal on behalf of United States Trustee. Hearing to be held on 7/11/2024 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 1203, Atlanta. (Iqbal, Adriano)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc 03-Meeting of Creditors (Chapter 11) Tue 06/04 12:54 PM
Notice of Chapter 11 Bankruptcy Case and Meeting of Creditors. 341 Meeting to be held on 7/12/2024 at 09:00 AM via Telephone conference. To attend, Dial 888-902-9750 and enter participation code 9635734. (11 Atl) (jlc)
Related: [-]
3 3 1 pgs order Order Regarding Unpaid Case Filing Fees Tue 06/04 12:53 PM
Order Regarding Unpaid Filing Fee in the Amount of $ 1738.00 . Service by BNC. Entered on 6/4/2024. Related [+] (jlc)
Related: [-] 1
2 2 1 pgs order Order Setting Deadlines for Debtor to Correct Filing Deficiencies (Non-Individual) Tue 06/04 12:50 PM
Order Setting Deadlines for Debtor to Correct Filing Deficiencies (Non-Individual). Service by BNC. Statement of Financial Affairs due 6/17/2024. Schedule(s)A/B, D-H due by 6/17/2024. Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury due by 6/17/2024. Summary of Assets and Liabilities due 6/17/2024. Corporate Resolution due 6/17/2024. List of Equity Security Holders due 6/17/2024. 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors due 6/17/2024. Tax Return Date: 6/10/2024. Balance Sheet Date: 6/10/2024. Statement of Operations Due 6/10/2024. Cash Flow Statement due 6/10/2024 (jlc)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 03, 2024
1 1 7 pgs misc Initial Docs01: Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Mon 06/03 9:29 AM
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) for Non-Individual Filed by BBCT Investments & Holdings LLC . Chapter 11 Plan (Small Business) due by 12/2/2024., Disclosure Statement due by 12/2/2024. (rfs) Additional attachment(s) added on 6/3/2024 (hd)
Related: [-]