Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Judge:Timothy J Savage
Case #: 2:24-cv-02393
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Negotiable Instrument
Case Filed:Jun 03, 2024
Terminated:Aug 13, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Nov 30, 2024 4:18 AM EST
Defendant
SPOUTING ROCK FINANCIAL PARTNERS LLC
95 West Lancaster Avenue Suite 250
Bryn Mawr, PA 19010
Defendant
SPOUTING ROCK GP LLC
925 West Lancaster Avenue Suite 250
Bryn Mawr, PA 19010
Defendant
SPOUTING ROCK HOLDINGS LLC
925 West Lancaster Avenue Suite 250
Bryn Mawr, PA 19010
Plaintiff
CHARLESTON DEVELOPMENT INVESTMENT LLC
490 Island Park Drive -
Daniel Island, SC 29492
Represented By
KEVIN M. TOTH
Toth Law LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, August 13, 2024
18 18 minutes Motion Hearing Tue 08/13 4:30 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before DISTRICT JUDGE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGEin Courtroom 9A. Hearing on Motion for Default Judgment. Court Reporter: Bobbie Shanfelder. (ahf)
Related: [-]
17 17 2 pgs order Judgment - Default Tue 08/13 4:14 PM
ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT (DOC. NO. 11) IS GRANTED. JUDGMENT IS ENTERED IN FAVOR OF PLAINTIFF AND AGAINST DEFENDANTS IN THE AMOUNT OF $2,023,713.22, CONSISTING OF THE PRINCIPAL AMOUNT OF $1,400,000.00, INTEREST AS OF AUGUST 13, 2024 IN THE AMOUNT OF $614,305.22, AND ATTORNEY'S FEES AND EXPENSES IN THE AMOUNT OF $9,408.00. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 8/13/2024. 8/13/2024 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(ahf)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 08, 2024
16 16 service Certificate of Service Thu 08/08 5:41 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by CHARLESTON DEVELOPMENT INVESTMENT LLC re12 Order to Show Cause,(TOTH, KEVIN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Ex. A - Affidavits of Service,
Att: 2 Exhibit Ex. B - July 16, 2024 Letter,
Att: 3 Exhibit Ex. C - USPS Records,
Att: 4 Exhibit Ex. D - August 6, 2024 Letter
Wednesday, July 17, 2024
15 15 service Affidavit of Service Wed 07/17 2:12 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service by DENNIS RICHMAN'S re: served ORDER FOR HEARING, ENTRY OF DEFAULT, AND MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT upon SPOUTING ROCK GP LLC by PERSONAL SERVICE UPON COMPANY OFFICER on 7/16/2024 (TOTH, KEVIN)
Related: [-]
14 14 service Affidavit of Service Wed 07/17 2:11 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service by DENNIS RICHMAN'S re: served ORDER FOR HEARING, ENTRY OF DEFAULT, AND MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT upon SPOUTING ROCK HOLDINGS LLC by PERSONAL SERVICE UPON COMPANY OFFICER on 7/16/2024 (TOTH, KEVIN)
Related: [-]
13 13 service Affidavit of Service Wed 07/17 2:09 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service by DENNIS RICHMAN'S re: served ORDER FOR HEARING, ENTRY OF DEFAULT, AND MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT upon SPOUTING ROCK FINANCIAL PARTNERS LLC by PERSONAL SERVICE UPON COMPANY OFFICER on 7/16/2024 (TOTH, KEVIN)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 12, 2024
12 12 1 pgs order Order to Show Cause Fri 07/12 10:49 AM
ORDER THAT A HEARING TO SHOW CAUSE WHY JUDGMENT SHOULD NOT BE ENTERED AND DAMAGES ASSESSED IS SCHEDULED FOR 8/13/2024 AT 11:00 AM IN COURTROOM 9A BEFORE DISTRICT JUDGE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT THE PLAINTIFF SHALL SERVE COPIES OF THE MOTION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT AND THIS ORDER UPON THE DEFENDANTS PERSONALLY AND BY CERTIFIED MAIL AS OUTLINED HEREIN BY 8/2/2024. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 7/12/2024. 7/12/2024 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(ahf)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 11, 2024
11 11 8 pgs motion Default Judgment Thu 07/11 4:25 PM
MOTION for Default Judgment against ALL DEFENDANTS filed by CHARLESTON DEVELOPMENT INVESTMENT LLC.AFFIDAVIT AND CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE.(TOTH, KEVIN)
Related: [-]
10 10 order Clerks Entry of Default Thu 07/11 10:38 AM
DEFAULT BY SPOUTING ROCK FINANCIAL PARTNERS LLC, SPOUTING ROCK GP LLC, SPOUTING ROCK HOLDINGS LLC FOR FAILURE TO PLEAD OR OTHERWISE DEFEND. (ahf)
Related: [-]
misc Default Entered Thu 07/11 10:39 AM
Default Entered. (ahf)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 02, 2024
9 9 misc Request for Default Tue 07/02 12:23 PM
Request for Default CHARLESTON DEVELOPMENT INVESTMENT LLC against SPOUTING ROCK FINANCIAL PARTNERS LLC, SPOUTING ROCK GP LLC, SPOUTING ROCK HOLDINGS LLC. (TOTH, KEVIN)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 12, 2024
8 8 service Affidavit of Service Wed 06/12 4:12 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service by DENNIS RICHMAN'S SERVICES re: served Complaint and Summons on Spouting Rock Financial Partners LLC upon ANDREW A. SMITH (OFFICER) by Personal service by handing copies of the documents on 6/10/24 (TOTH, KEVIN)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Affidavit of Service Wed 06/12 4:11 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service by DENNIS RICHMAN'S SERVICES re: served Complaint and Summons Spouting Rock GP LLC upon ANDREW A. SMITH (OFFICER) by Personal service by handing copies of the documents on 6/10/24 (TOTH, KEVIN)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Affidavit of Service Wed 06/12 4:10 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service by DENNIS RICHMAN'S SERVICES re: served SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT on Spouting Rock Holdings LLC upon ANDREW A. SMITH (OFFICER) by Personal service by handing copies of the documents on 6/10/24 (TOTH, KEVIN)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 06, 2024
5 5 notice Notice (Other) Thu 06/06 12:45 PM
NOTICE by CHARLESTON DEVELOPMENT INVESTMENT LLC re4 Order,, (TOTH, KEVIN)
Related: [-]
4 4 1 pgs order Order Thu 06/06 11:26 AM
ORDER THE PLAINTIFF HAVING FAILED TO ALLEGE THE MEMBERSHIP AND RESPECTIVE STATES OF CITIZENSHIP OF EACH MEMBER OF CHARLESTON DEVELOPMENT INVESTMENT LLC, SPOUTING ROCK FINANCIAL PARTNERS LLC, SPOUTING ROCK HOLDINGS LLC AND SPOUTING ROCK GP LLC, IT IS ORDERED THAT THE PLAINTIFF SHALL FILE A STATEMENT IDENTIFYING EACH MEMBER OF EACH LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY AND THE STATE OF CITIZENSHIP OF EACH MEMBER NO LATER THAN JUNE 14, 2024. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 6/6/2024. 6/6/2024 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sg)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 04, 2024
3 3 service Summons Issued Tue 06/04 8:58 AM
Summons Issued as to SPOUTING ROCK FINANCIAL PARTNERS LLC, SPOUTING ROCK GP LLC, SPOUTING ROCK HOLDINGS LLC. Forwarded To: Counsel on 6/4/24 (dt)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 03, 2024
2 2 notice Notice (Other) Mon 06/03 3:43 PM
NOTICE by CHARLESTON DEVELOPMENT INVESTMENT LLC (TOTH, KEVIN)
Related: [-]
1 1 7 pgs cmp Complaint (Attorney) Mon 06/03 3:13 PM
COMPLAINT against SPOUTING ROCK FINANCIAL PARTNERS LLC, SPOUTING ROCK GP LLC, SPOUTING ROCK HOLDINGS LLC ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number APAEDC-17510583.), filed by CHARLESTON DEVELOPMENT INVESTMENT LLC.(TOTH, KEVIN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 7 pgs Exhibit Ex. A - March 22 Note,
Att: 2 7 pgs Exhibit Ex. B - April 29 Note,
Att: 3 4 pgs Exhibit Ex. C - March 22 Guaranty,
Att: 4 4 pgs Exhibit Ex. D - April 29 Guaranty,
Att: 5 8 pgs Exhibit Ex. E - March 22 Pledge Agreement,
Att: 6 8 pgs Exhibit Ex. F - April 29 Pledge Agreement
misc Attorney Required Forms Mon 06/03 3:30 PM
Attorneys are required by local rule to complete and file both a Civil Cover Sheet and a Designation Form. PLAINTIFF's counsel is directed to file COMPLETED DESIGNATION FORM in this case using the Notice (Other) docket event located in the Notices category. The Yes/No questions have to be answered. (sbt)
Related: [-]