California Eastern District Court
Judge:Allison Claire
Case #: 2:24-cv-01563
Nature of Suit465 Immigration - Other Immigration Actions
Cause08:1329 Writ of Mandamus to Adjudicate Visa Petition
Case Filed:Jun 03, 2024
Terminated:Sep 25, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Nov 30, 2024 12:59 AM PST
Defendant
Antony Blinken
Represented By
Elliot C. Wong, GOVT
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info
Defendant
Matthew Palmer
Represented By
Elliot C. Wong, GOVT
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info
Plaintiff
Olivia Key
Represented By
Joshua Goldstein
Goldstein Immigration Lawyers
contact info

GPO Sep 25 2024
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 9/24/2024 GRANTING 8 Motion to Dismiss without prejudice and DISMISSING 1 Complaint without leave to amend. CASE CLOSED. (Becknal, R.)

Docket last updated: 04/29/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Wednesday, September 25, 2024
16 16 order Judgment Wed 09/25 3:41 PM
JUDGMENT dated *9/25/2024* pursuant to order signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 9/24/2024. (Becknal, R.)
Related: [-]
15 15 10 pgs order Order ~Util - Terminate Civil Case Order on Motion to Dismiss Wed 09/25 3:39 PM
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 9/24/2024 GRANTING8 Motion to Dismiss without prejudice and DISMISSING1 Complaint without leave to amend. CASE CLOSED. (Becknal, R.)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 23, 2024
14 14 misc Response Mon 09/23 8:26 AM
RESPONSE by Olivia Key to13 Notice - Other. (Goldstein, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 10, 2024
13 13 notice Notice (Other) Tue 09/10 3:07 PM
NOTICE of supplemental authority by All Defendants. (Wong, Elliot)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 29, 2024
12 12 order Minute Order ~Util - 1 Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Thu 08/29 12:29 PM
MINUTE ORDER (Text Only Entry) issued by Courtroom Deputy J. Anderson for Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 08/29/2024 re8 Motion to Dismiss. The hearing on the motion now calendared for Wednesday, September 18, 2024 is ordered submitted without appearance and without argument pursuant to Local Rule 230 (g). If the Court subsequently concludes that oral argument is necessary, a hearing will be set and the parties notified accordingly. (Anderson, J)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 23, 2024
11 11 respm Reply to Response to Motion Fri 08/23 6:01 PM
REPLY by Antony Blinken, Matthew Palmer to RESPONSE to8 Motion to Dismiss,. (Wong, Elliot)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 15, 2024
10 10 misc Response Thu 08/15 2:27 PM
MEMORANDUM of Points and Authorities by Olivia Key in OPPOSITION to8 Motion to Dismiss,. (Goldstein, Joshua) Modified on 8/15/2024 (Mena-Sanchez, L)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Thursday, August 01, 2024
9 9 order Consent Minute Order Thu 08/01 11:04 AM
CONSENT MINUTE ORDER (Text Only) signed by Chief Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 8/1/2024: All parties have consented to the jurisdiction of a United States Magistrate Judge for all further proceedings in this action, including trial and entry of judgment, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(1). Accordingly, this Court AUTHORIZES the action to proceed before the assigned United States Magistrate Judge for all further proceedings including trial and entry of judgment. All further papers filed in this action shall bear the case number 2:24-cv-1563 AC. (Benson, A.)
Related: [-]
8 8 motion Dismiss Thu 08/01 9:57 AM
MOTION to DISMISS by Antony Blinken, Matthew Palmer. Motion Hearing set for 9/18/2024 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 26 (AC) before Magistrate Judge Allison Claire. (Wong, Elliot)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Statement of Undisputed Material Facts,
Att: 2 Declaration of Matthew McNeil
7 7 misc Consent/Decline of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Thu 08/01 9:55 AM
CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Wong, Elliot)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 11, 2024
6 6 misc Consent/Decline of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Tue 06/11 7:42 AM
CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Goldstein, Joshua)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Summons Returned Executed as to USA Tue 06/11 7:34 AM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by Olivia Key. Antony Blinken served on 6/10/2024, answer due 8/9/2024; Matthew Palmer served on 6/10/2024, answer due 8/9/2024. (Goldstein, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 07, 2024
4 4 misc Designation of Counsel Fri 06/07 3:25 PM
DESIGNATION of COUNSEL FOR SERVICE. Added attorney Elliot C. Wong, GOVT for Antony Blinken,Elliot C. Wong, GOVT for Matthew Palmer (Wong, Elliot)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 03, 2024
3 3 misc Civil New Case Documents for Magistrate as Presider Mon 06/03 12:05 PM
CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Woodson, A)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Copyright Report,
Att: 2 VDRP
2 2 service Summons Mon 06/03 12:04 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Antony Blinken, Matthew Palmer* with answer to complaint due within *60* days. Attorney *Joshua Goldstein* *Goldstein Immigration Lawyers* *611 Wilshire Blvd, Ste 317* *Los Angeles, CA 90017*. (Woodson, A)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 06/03 8:40 AM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Olivia Key. Attorney Goldstein, Joshua added. (Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ACAEDC-11557276)(Goldstein, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet