Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Judge:John M Younge
Case #: 2:24-cv-02395
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question: Employment Discrimination
Case Filed:Jun 03, 2024
Terminated:Jul 11, 2024
Case in other court:Superior Court of NJ, Law Div., Gloucester Co., BURL-L-000196-24
Last checked: Saturday Nov 30, 2024 4:19 AM EST
Defendant
WALMART, INC.
702 SW. 8TH STREET
BENTONVILLE, AR 72716
Represented By
JOHN L. LAMB
Buchanan Ingersoll & Rooney PC
contact info
Defendant
ABC CORPS. 1-15
Defendant
CHRISTOPHER DOE
Defendant
JANE DOES 1-15
Defendant
JOHN DOES 1-15
Plaintiff
JOYCE CARTER
Represented By
VALERIE SHORE
Law Offices Of Eric A. Shore, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Thursday, July 11, 2024
5 5 order Stipulation and Order Thu 07/11 10:32 AM
STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT: (1) WALMART'S MOTION IS DISMISS3 IS WITHDRAWN. (2) THIS MATTER IS TRANSFERRED TO THE U.S. DISTRICT COURT FOR THE DISTRICT OF NEW JERSEY, WHERE THE MATTER IS CURRENTLY LISTED AT 1:24-CV-6719. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE JOHN M. YOUNGE ON 7/10/24. 7/11/24 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc)
Related: [-]
misc Remark Thu 07/11 12:37 PM
Case transferred to U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey via CM/ECF system. (fdc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 27, 2024
4 4 misc Stipulation Thu 06/27 3:10 PM
STIPULATION AND AGREED ORDER TRANSFERING VENUE by WALMART, INC.. (LAMB, JOHN)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 05, 2024
3 3 motion Dismiss Wed 06/05 3:23 PM
MOTION to Dismiss filed by WALMART, INC..Certificate of Service.(LAMB, JOHN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
misc Attorney Required Forms Wed 06/05 9:29 AM
Attorneys are required by local rule to complete and file both a Civil Cover Sheet and a Designation Form. DEFENDANT's counsel is directed to file COMPLETED DESIGNATION FORM in this case using the Notice (Other) docket event located in the Notices category. Form is missing. (sbt)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 03, 2024
2 2 discov Disclosure Statement Form 7.1 Mon 06/03 5:10 PM
Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by WALMART, INC..(LAMB, JOHN)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal (Attorney) Mon 06/03 5:03 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by WALMART, INC. (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number APAEDC-17511208), filed by WALMART, INC..(LAMB, JOHN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet