Tennessee Middle District Court
Judge:Waverly D Crenshaw, Jr
Referred: Barbara D Holmes
Case #: 3:24-cv-00674
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act
Case Filed:Jun 03, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Nov 30, 2024 3:18 AM CST
Defendant
Columbia Debt Recovery LLC
Represented By
Robert Dunbar Norton
Copeland, Stair, Valz & Lovell Llp (chattanooga Office)
contact info
Defendant
Parc at Murfreesboro Poe LLC
Represented By
Elaina S. Al-Nimri
Bass, Berry & Sims (nashville Office)
contact info
Defendant
American Landmark Management LLC
Represented By
Elaina S. Al-Nimri
Bass, Berry & Sims (nashville Office)
contact info
Defendant
Pegasus Residential LLC
Represented By
J. Cole Dowsley, Jr.
Taylor English Duma, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Derek Gendron
PO Box 24
La Vergne, TN 37086
Plaintiff
Lynn Gendron
PO Box 24
La Vergne, TN 37086

GPO Jan 06 2025
regular mail.) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(ch)REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: By Order entered June 9, 2024 (Docket Entry No. 5), this pro se civil case was referred to the Magistrate Judge for pretrial proceedings. Pending before the Court is the motion to dismiss (Docket Entry No. 23) of Defendant Pegasus Residential, LLC. The motion is opposed by Plaintiffs. For the reasons set out below, the undersigned respectfully recommends that the motion be GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes on 1/6/2025. (xc: Pro se party by
GPO Feb 03 2025
ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS: Before the Court is the Magistrate Judge's Report and Recommendation ("R&R") (Doc. No. 39) recommending that the Court grant Defendant Pegasus Residential, LLC's (Pegasus Residential) 23 motion to dismiss, and dismiss Pegasus Residential from this lawsuit. Accordingly, the R&R (Doc. No. 39) is APPROVED AND ADOPTED. Pegasus Residential is dismissed from this action. Signed by District Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 02/03/2025. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail.) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(ad)

Docket last updated: 05/04/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Monday, April 28, 2025
58 58 3 pgs order Order Setting Case for Trial Mon 04/28 1:07 PM
ORDER SETTING CASE FOR TRIAL: Jury Trial set for 3/24/2026 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5D before District Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw Jr. Pretrial Conference set for 3/16/2026 at 02:00 PM before District Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw Jr. Exhibit List due by 3/9/2026. Witness List due by 3/9/2026. Joint Proposed Pretrial Order due by 3/9/2026. Signed by District Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 04/28/2025. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (ad)
Related: [-]