Nebraska District Court
Judge:Joseph F Bataillon
Case #: 4:24-cv-03105
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question
Case Filed:Jun 03, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Nov 30, 2024 3:14 AM CST
Defendant
Capital Humane Society
Defendant
Officer Finelli #84
Defendant
Officer Steen #93
Defendant
Officer bomderger #86
Defendant
Rick Tast
Plaintiff
Kenneth W. Clark
LINCOLN REGIONAL CENTER Address Updated 11/5/24 801 West Prospector
Lincoln, NE 68509

GPO Jun 18 2024
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that leave to proceed in forma pauperis is granted, and the Complaint shall be filed without payment of fees. Plaintiff is advised that the next step in his case will be for the Court to conduct an initial review of his claims to determine whether summary dismissal is appropriate under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2). The Court will conduct this initial review in its normal course of business. Ordered by Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(LRM)
GPO Jul 02 2024
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER The Clerk of the Court is directed to update the Court's records in the above-captioned cases to reflect that Plaintiff's mailing address is 2426 S. 8th Street, Lincoln, NE 68502-3407. Plaintiff is advised that the Court will use the above address for serving notice of all future Court filings on Plaintiff. Ordered by Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (LRM)
GPO Mar 31 2025
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER The Motion to Appoint Counsel, Filing No. 6, is denied without prejudice. The Motion to Court Contempt, Filing No. 16, the Motion to Review Claims, Filing No. 17, and the Motion of Due Process Protection, Filing No. 19, which this Court construes as motions for issuance of summons and service of process, are denied without prejudice as premature. The Motion for Return of Property, Filing No. 12, Motion to Return of Property, Filing No. 13, and Motion to Claims, Filing No. 14, are granted to the extent they shall be considered as supplementing the Complaint. Alternatively, the Motion for Return of Property, Filing No. 12, Motion to Return of Property, Filing No. 13, and Motion to Claims, Filing No. 14, are granted to the extent Plaintiff sought leave to amend his Complaint. Plaintiff shall have until 30 days from the date of this Memorandum and Order to file an amended complaint that clearly states a claim upon which relief may be granted against each Defendant in accordance with this Memorandum and Order. If Plaintiff fails to file an amended complaint within the time allotted for compliance, this Court shall perform its initial review of the Complaint and Supplements. The Clerk's Office is directed to send to Plaintiff a copy of the civil complaint form. The Clerk's Office is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this case using the following text: April 30, 2025: Check for amended complaint. Ordered by Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (Copy mailed to pro se party with form) (LRM)

Docket last updated: 71 minutes ago
Monday, March 31, 2025
20 20 5 pgs order Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Mon 03/31 4:42 PM
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER The Motion to Appoint Counsel, Filing No.6 , is denied without prejudice. The Motion to Court Contempt, Filing No.16 , the Motion to Review Claims, Filing No.17 , and the Motion of Due Process Protection, Filing No.19 , which this Court construes as motions for issuance of summons and service of process, are denied without prejudice as premature. The Motion for Return of Property, Filing No.12 , Motion to Return of Property, Filing No.13 , and Motion to Claims, Filing No.14 , are granted to the extent they shall be considered as supplementing the Complaint. Alternatively, the Motion for Return of Property, Filing No.12 , Motion to Return of Property, Filing No.13 , and Motion to Claims, Filing No.14 , are granted to the extent Plaintiff sought leave to amend his Complaint. Plaintiff shall have until 30 days from the date of this Memorandum and Order to file an amended complaint that clearly states a claim upon which relief may be granted against each Defendant in accordance with this Memorandum and Order. If Plaintiff fails to file an amended complaint within the time allotted for compliance, this Court shall perform its initial review of the Complaint and Supplements. The Clerk's Office is directed to send to Plaintiff a copy of the civil complaint form. The Clerk's Office is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this case using the following text: April 30, 2025 : Check for amended complaint. Ordered by Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (Copy mailed to pro se party with form) (LRM)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 03, 2025
19 19 motion Miscellaneous Relief Wed 03/05 10:01 AM
MOTION of Due Process Protection filed on behalf of Plaintiff Kenneth W. Clark.(MKR)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 10, 2025
18 18 oth_doc Supplement Mon 02/10 12:53 PM
SUPPLEMENT filed on behalf of Plaintiff Kenneth W. Clark.(MKR)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 16, 2024
17 17 motion Miscellaneous Relief Mon 12/16 12:23 PM
MOTION to Review Claims on behalf of Plaintiff Kenneth W Clark. (LKO)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 06, 2024
16 16 motion Miscellaneous Relief Fri 12/06 11:44 AM
MOTION to court contempt 25-2121 on behalf of Plaintiff Kenneth W Clark.(LRM)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 02, 2024
15 15 oth_doc Supplement Mon 12/02 4:03 PM
SUPPLEMENT on behalf of Plaintiff Kenneth W Clark. (LRM)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 25, 2024
14 14 motion Miscellaneous Relief Mon 11/25 11:49 AM
MOTION to Claims on behalf of Plaintiff Kenneth W Clark.(LRM)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 04, 2024
13 13 motion Miscellaneous Relief Mon 11/04 1:52 PM
MOTION to Return Property filed by pro se Plaintiff Kenneth W. Clark. (KLF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 24, 2024
12 12 motion Miscellaneous Relief Thu 10/24 9:52 AM
MOTION for Return of Property on behalf of Plaintiff Kenneth W. Clark. (MKR)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 18, 2024
11 11 oth_doc Supplement Thu 09/19 10:56 AM
SUPPLEMENT on behalf of Plaintiff Kenneth W. Clark.(LRM)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 16, 2024
10 10 oth_doc Letter Mon 09/16 4:01 PM
LETTER on behalf of Plaintiff Kenneth W. Clark. (LRM)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 02, 2024
9 9 4 pgs order Memorandum and Order Tue 07/02 10:57 AM
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER The Clerk of the Court is directed to update the Court's records in the above-captioned cases to reflect that Plaintiff's mailing address is 2426 S. 8th Street, Lincoln, NE 68502-3407. Plaintiff is advised that the Court will use the above address for serving notice of all future Court filings on Plaintiff. Ordered by Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (LRM)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 01, 2024
8 8 oth_evt Returned Mail Mon 07/01 1:30 PM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable addressed to Kenneth Clark at 4700 West F Street, Lincoln, NE 68522 regarding Memorandum and Order7 . Mail not resent; no forwarding address. (LRM)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 18, 2024
7 7 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Tue 06/18 12:07 PM
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that leave to proceed in forma pauperis is granted, and the Complaint shall be filed without payment of fees. Plaintiff is advised that the next step in his case will be for the Court to conduct an initial review of his claims to determine whether summary dismissal is appropriate under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2). The Court will conduct this initial review in its normal course of business. Ordered by Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(LRM)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 13, 2024
6 6 motion Appoint Counsel Thu 06/13 2:49 PM
MOTION to Appoint Counsel on behalf of Plaintiff Kenneth W. Clark.(LKO)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 07, 2024
5 5 oth_evt Returned Mail Fri 06/07 2:02 PM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable addressed to Kenneth Clark at 4700 West F Street, Lincoln, NE 68522 regarding Order4 , Notice by Clerk (Pro Se Case)3 . Mail resent to address provided by post office on the returned envelope, 2426 S 8th St Lincoln, NE 68502-3407. (LRM)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 03, 2024
4 4 3 pgs order Order - Pro Se GO 2022-04 Mon 06/03 4:38 PM
GENERAL ORDER NO. 2022-04: This general order provides for the management and assignment of cases filed by a plaintiff or petitioner without counsel. This general order also includes the definition of the pro se docket, responsibilities of the pro se law clerks and scheduling and discovery requirements in pro se cases. Ordered by Chief Judge Robert F. Rossiter, Jr.. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(LKO)
Related: [-]
3 3 oth_evt Notice by Clerk (Pro Se Case) Mon 06/03 4:38 PM
NOTICE by Clerk acknowledging receipt of complaint filed by a pro se party. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (LKO)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Mon 06/03 4:37 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis on behalf of Plaintiff Kenneth W. Clark. (LKO)
Related: [-]
1 1 26 pgs cmp Complaint - Pro Se Mon 06/03 4:36 PM
COMPLAINT against Capital Humane Society, Officer Finelli #84, Officer Steen #93, Officer bomderger #86, and Rick Tast filed on behalf of pro se plaintiff Kenneth W. Clark. (LKO)
Related: [-]