Oklahoma Western District Court
Judge:Patrick R Wyrick
Referred: Amanda Maxfield Green
Case #: 5:24-cv-00561
Nature of Suit530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General
Cause28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Case Filed:Jun 03, 2024
Terminated:Oct 01, 2024

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 05/12/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Tuesday, October 01, 2024
7 7 2 pgs order Order Adopting Report and Recommendation Tue 10/01 2:58 PM
ORDER ADOPTING6 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION and dismissing the Petition with prejudice (as more fully set out in order). Signed by Judge Patrick R Wyrick on 10/1/2024. (ks)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 02, 2024
6 6 motion Report and Recommendation ~Util - Add and Terminate Judges Fri 08/02 4:02 PM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. The undersigned recommends that the Petition for a Writ of Habeas Corpus Under 28 U.S.C. § 2254 (Doc. 1) be DISMISSED with prejudice at time-barred. Objections to R&R due by 8/23/2024. This Report and Recommendation terminates the referral of this matter to the undersigned. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amanda Maxfield Green on 8/2/2024. (rb)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 01, 2024
5 5 misc Receipt Mon 07/01 4:51 PM
Receipt for Money Received from Roy Hudson in the amount of $5, receipt number 500007586 regarding1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Receipt mailed to Roy Hudson #138632 HELENA-JCCC 216 N. Murray St. Helena, OK 73741-9606 (rp)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 17, 2024
4 4 2 pgs order Order Mon 06/17 1:16 PM
ORDER to Cure Deficiencies. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amanda Maxfield Green on 6/17/2024. (rb)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 03, 2024
3 3 1 pgs order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Mon 06/03 2:59 PM
ENTER ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Amanda Maxfield Green. Signed by the direction of Judge Patrick R Wyrick on 06/03/2024. (kb)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Previous Cases Mon 06/03 2:54 PM
NO PREVIOUS Cases (kb)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus Mon 06/03 2:49 PM
PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Roy Hudson.(kb)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope