Delaware District Court
Judge:Jennifer Choe-Groves
Case #: 1:24-cv-00650
Nature of Suit830 Property Rights - Patent
Cause35:271 Patent Infringement
Case Filed:May 31, 2024
Last checked: Thursday Nov 28, 2024 3:45 AM EST
Counter Claimant
FormFactor, Inc.
Represented By
Andrew Colin Mayo
Ashby & Geddes
contact info
Counter Defendant
Technoprobe S.p.A.
Represented By
Mark Sommers
contact info
Andrew Russell
Shaw Keller LLP
contact info
Kelly S. Horn
contact info
Emily DiBenedetto
Shaw Keller LLP
contact info
Milan F. Feliciello
contact info
Alexander E. Harding
contact info
Abhay A. Watwe
contact info
Houtan K. Esfahani
contact info
Defendant
FormFactor, Inc.
Represented By
John G. Day
Ashby & Geddes
contact info
Andrew Colin Mayo
Ashby & Geddes
contact info
Plaintiff
Technoprobe S.p.A.
Represented By
Mark Sommers
contact info
Andrew Russell
Shaw Keller LLP
contact info
Kelly S. Horn
contact info
Emily DiBenedetto
Shaw Keller LLP
contact info
Milan F. Feliciello
contact info
Alexander E. Harding
contact info
Abhay A. Watwe
contact info
Houtan K. Esfahani
contact info


Docket last updated: 62 minutes ago
Friday, April 25, 2025
37 37 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Fri 04/25 8:31 AM
ORDER: The Stipulated Order (D.I.36 ) is granted; and it is further ORDERED that the Parties shall file on or before May 14, 2025 a proposed scheduling order; and it is further ORDERED that the stay will be lifted upon the entry of an amended scheduling order.. Signed by Judge Jennifer Choe-Groves on 04/25/2025. (oam)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 24, 2025
36 36 motion Stipulation to EXTEND Time Thu 04/24 3:21 PM
STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for the submission of a proposed Scheduling Order to May 14, 2025 - filed by FormFactor, Inc.. (Mayo, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
35 35 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Wed 04/23 10:17 AM
Letter from Judge Jennifer Choe-Groves to the Parties, directing the Parties to provide to the Court on or before April 25, 2025 a proposed scheduling order to advance this case. The stay will be life when the Court issues an amended scheduling order. Signed by Judge Jennifer Choe-Groves on 04/23/2025. (jfm)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 24, 2025
34 34 misc Status Report Fri 01/24 3:39 PM
Joint STATUS REPORT by Technoprobe S.p.A.. (Russell, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 24, 2024
33 33 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Thu 10/24 9:40 AM
ORDER: The Stipulation to Stay (D.I.32 ) is granted; All deadlines in this case are stayed until April 30, 2025; The Parties shall file with the Court a Status report on the status of their settlement efforts on or before January 24, 2025; The parties shall file their Joint Proposed Scheduling Order on or before the earlier of May 14, 2025 or 14 days after the stay is lifted. Signed by Judge Jennifer Choe-Groves on 10/24/2024. (jfm)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 23, 2024
32 32 misc Stipulation-General (See Motion List for Stipulation to Extend Time) Wed 10/23 4:37 PM
STIPULATION to Stay All Deadlines by Technoprobe S.p.A.. (Russell, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 30, 2024
31 31 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Tue 10/01 8:32 AM
ORDER: The Stipulation to Pause Activities and Extend Deadlines (D.I.30 ) is granted, and it is further ORDERED that all deadlines in this case are stayed until October 31, 2024; and it is further ORDERED that the Parties shall file their Joint Proposed Scheduling Order on or before October 31, 2024. Signed by Judge Jennifer Choe-Groves on 9/30/2024. (jfm)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 27, 2024
30 30 motion Stipulation to EXTEND Time Fri 09/27 4:41 PM
STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME that No Further Litigation Activity will Occur in this Action before October 31, 2024 and to extend the time to file the Joint Proposed Scheduling Order to October 31, 2024 - filed by Technoprobe S.p.A.. (Russell, Andrew)
Related: [-]
29 29 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Terminate Motions 1 - Terminate Deadlines ~Util - Set Deadlines Fri 09/27 2:15 PM
ORDER: Upon consideration of the Parties' Stipulation to Extend Time (D.I.28 ) and all other papers and proceedings in this action, it is hereby ORDERED that the Parties' Stipulation to Extend Time (D.I.28 ) is granted, and it isfurther ORDERED that the Parties shall meet and confer and file a joint proposed Scheduling Order on or before October 4, 2024. Signed by Judge Jennifer Choe-Groves on 9/27/2024. (mpb)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 20, 2024
28 28 motion Stipulation to EXTEND Time Fri 09/20 4:18 PM
STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to File the Joint Proposed Scheduling Order to October 4, 2024 - filed by Technoprobe S.p.A.. (Russell, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 16, 2024
27 27 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines ~Util - Terminate Motions Mon 09/16 9:21 AM
ORDER: The Parties' Stipulated Order (D.I.26 ) is granted, and it is further ORDERED that the Parties shall meet and confer and file a joint proposed Scheduling Order on or before September 20, 2024. Signed by Judge Jennifer Choe-Groves on 9/16/2024. (jfm)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 13, 2024
26 26 motion Stipulation to EXTEND Time Fri 09/13 4:25 PM
STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for the submission of a proposed scheduling order to September 20, 2024 - filed by FormFactor, Inc.. (Mayo, Andrew)
Related: [-]
25 25 respm Brief - Reply Fri 09/13 3:12 PM
REPLY BRIEF re16 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim [Technoprobe S.P.A's Partial Motion to Dismiss Defendant FormFactor, Inc.'s Counterclaim of Non-Infringement] filed by Technoprobe S.p.A.. (Russell, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 12, 2024
24 24 1 pgs order Order Order Setting Briefing Schedule - open, ans, reply, surreply Thu 09/12 10:44 AM
ORDER: Plaintiff shall file its reply to Plaintiff's Partial Motion to Dismiss Defendant's Counterclaim of Non-Infringement (D.I.16 ) on or before September 13, 2024. Ordered by Judge Jennifer Choe-Groves on 09/12/2024. (vfm)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 10, 2024
23 23 motion Stipulation to EXTEND Time Tue 09/10 7:09 PM
STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Plaintiff to to file its reply brief in support of its Partial Motion to Dismiss, D.I. 16, to 9/13/2024 - filed by Technoprobe S.p.A.. (Russell, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 09, 2024
utility Add Attorneys - PHV only Mon 09/09 1:17 PM
Pro Hac Vice Attorney Mark Sommers for Technoprobe S.p.A. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (mws)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 04, 2024
22 22 respm Brief - Answering Brief in Opposition Wed 09/04 4:45 PM
ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re16 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim [Technoprobe S.P.A's Partial Motion to Dismiss Defendant FormFactor, Inc.'s Counterclaim of Non-Infringement] filed by FormFactor, Inc..Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 9/11/2024. (Day, John)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 03, 2024
21 21 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Tue 09/03 11:49 AM
ORDER: The Parties' Stipulation to Extend Time (D.I.20 ) is GRANTED. The Parties shall meet and confer and file a joint proposed Scheduling Order on or before September 16, 2024. Signed by Judge Jennifer Choe-Groves on 9/3/2024. (mpb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 29, 2024
20 20 motion Stipulation to EXTEND Time Thu 08/29 4:36 PM
STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Submit Proposed Scheduling Order to September 16, 2024 - filed by Technoprobe S.p.A.. (Russell, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 28, 2024
order SO ORDERED Wed 08/28 10:44 AM
SO ORDERED, re18 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Kelly S. Horn filed by Technoprobe S.p.A. Ordered by Judge Jennifer Choe-Groves on 08/28/2024. (oam)
Related: [-]
utility Add Attorneys - PHV only Wed 08/28 2:39 PM
Pro Hac Vice Attorney Kelly S. Horn for Technoprobe S.p.A. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (cdd)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 27, 2024
19 19 misc -District Court Pro Hac Vice Fee - 01 Attorney Credit Card Payment Tue 08/27 4:12 PM
Pro Hac Vice Fee - Credit Card Payment received for Kelly S. Horn. ( re18 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Kelly S. Horn )( Payment of $ 50, receipt number ADEDC-4485723).(DiBenedetto, Emily)
Related: [-]
18 18 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 08/27 4:09 PM
MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Kelly S. Horn - filed by Technoprobe S.p.A.. (DiBenedetto, Emily)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 21, 2024
17 17 respm Brief - Opening Brief in Support Wed 08/21 4:41 PM
OPENING BRIEF in Support re16 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim [Technoprobe S.P.A's Partial Motion to Dismiss Defendant FormFactor, Inc.'s Counterclaim of Non-Infringement] filed by Technoprobe S.p.A..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 9/4/2024.(Russell, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
16 16 motion Dismiss/Fail to State Claim Wed 08/21 4:39 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim [Technoprobe S.P.A's Partial Motion to Dismiss Defendant FormFactor, Inc.'s Counterclaim of Non-Infringement] - filed by Technoprobe S.p.A..(Russell, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
utility Add Attorneys - PHV only Wed 08/21 8:52 AM
Pro Hac Vice Attorney Abhay A. Watwe for Technoprobe S.p.A. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (mws)
Related: [-]
utility Add Attorneys - PHV only Wed 08/21 9:29 AM
Pro Hac Vice Attorney Alexander E. Harding for Technoprobe S.p.A. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (mws)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 20, 2024
15 15 order Oral Order ~Util - Terminate Motions Tue 08/20 12:33 PM
ORAL ORDER, granting13 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Mark Sommers, Houtan K. Esfahani, Abhay A. Watwe, Alexander E. Harding and Milan F. Feliciello - filed by Technoprobe S.p.A. Ordered by Judge Jennifer Choe-Groves on 8/20/2024. (jfm)
Related: [-]
14 14 misc -District Court Pro Hac Vice Fee - 05 Attorneys Credit Card Payment Tue 08/20 7:49 AM
Pro Hac Vice Fee - Credit Card Payment received for Mark Sommers, Houtan K. Esfahani, Abhay A. Watwe, Alexander E. Harding, and Milan F. Feliciello. ( re13 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Mark Sommers, Houtan K. Esfahani, Abhay A. Watwe, Alexander E. Harding and Milan F. Feliciello )( Payment of $ 250, receipt number ADEDC-4479482).(DiBenedetto, Emily)
Related: [-]
utility Add Attorneys - PHV only Tue 08/20 3:15 PM
Pro Hac Vice Attorney Milan F. Feliciello for Technoprobe S.p.A. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. Associated Cases: 1:24-cv-00650-JCG, 1:23-cv-00842-JCG(mws)
Related: [-]
utility Add Attorneys - PHV only Tue 08/20 3:51 PM
Pro Hac Vice Attorney Houtan K. Esfahani for Technoprobe S.p.A. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (cdd)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 19, 2024
13 13 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 08/19 4:56 PM
MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Mark Sommers, Houtan K. Esfahani, Abhay A. Watwe, Alexander E. Harding and Milan F. Feliciello - filed by Technoprobe S.p.A.. (DiBenedetto, Emily)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 02, 2024
12 12 motion Stipulation to EXTEND Time Fri 08/02 1:04 PM
STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to move, answer, or otherwise respond to Defendant FormFactor, Inc.'s Counterclaims, D.I. 10 to August 21, 2024 - filed by Technoprobe S.p.A.. (Russell, Andrew)
Related: [-]
order SO ORDERED ~Util - Terminate Motions ~Util - Set Deadlines Fri 08/02 3:09 PM
SO ORDERED, re12 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to move, answer, or otherwise respond to Defendant FormFactor, Inc.'s Counterclaims, D.I. 10 to August 21, 2024 filed by Technoprobe S.p.A. Ordered by Judge Jennifer Choe-Groves on 8/2/2024. (mpb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 31, 2024
11 11 order Oral Order Thu 08/01 7:16 AM
ORAL ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that, not later than thirty (30) days from the date of this Order, the Parties shall meet and confer and file a joint proposed Scheduling Order in this action consistent with the applicable form Scheduling Order of Judge Connolly, which is posted at https://www.ded.uscourts.gov/ (See Chambers, Chief Judge Colm F. Connolly), along with a cover letter requesting the Court to enter the joint proposed Scheduling Order (if there are no disputes or other issues concerning scheduling that the Court needs to address) or to schedule the Scheduling Conference. If the Parties are unable to agree upon a proposed scheduling order, each Party shall file a proposed scheduling order by the deadline and contact my Case Manager, Steve Taronji, by telephone at (212) 264-1611 or via e-mail at steve_taronji@cit.uscourts.gov, to arrange a conference with the Court.(rlr)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 24, 2024
10 10 answer Answer to Complaint Counterclaim Wed 07/24 3:30 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against Technoprobe S.p.A. by FormFactor, Inc..(Mayo, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 20, 2024
9 9 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Terminate Motions Thu 06/20 4:51 PM
ORDER: Defendant shall file its response to Plaintiff's Complaint (D.I.1 ) on or before July 24, 2024. Signed by Judge Jennifer Choe-Groves on 6/20/2024. (apk)
Related: [-]
8 8 motion Stipulation to EXTEND Time Thu 06/20 11:26 AM
STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for defendant to answer, move or otherwise respond to the Complaint to July 24, 2024 - filed by FormFactor, Inc.. (Day, John)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 06, 2024
7 7 2 pgs order Order Thu 06/06 12:03 PM
STANDING ORDER REGARDING CASES IN THE U.S. DISTRICT COURT FOR THE DISTRICT OF DELAWARE. Signed by Judge Jennifer Choe-Groves on 6/6/2024. (apk)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 05, 2024
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 06/05 12:57 PM
Case Assigned to Judge Jennifer Choe-Groves of the United States Court of International Trade (due to related case). Please include the initials of the Judge (JCG) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 03, 2024
6 6 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 06/03 3:36 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Technoprobe S.p.A..FormFactor, Inc. served on 6/3/2024, answer due 6/24/2024. (Russell, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 31, 2024
5 5 service Summons Issued Mon 06/03 8:38 AM
Summons Issued as to FormFactor, Inc. on 5/31/2024. (mpb)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Disclosure Statement - Rule 7.1 Mon 06/03 8:37 AM
Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent T-Plus S.p.A. for Technoprobe S.p.A. filed by Technoprobe S.p.A.. (mpb)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Patent/Trademark Report to Commissioner of Patents Mon 06/03 8:36 AM
Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) US 11,921,133 B2. (mpb)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Magistrate Consent Forms Mon 06/03 8:35 AM
Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (mpb)
Related: [-]
1 1 29 pgs cmp Complaint Mon 06/03 8:34 AM
COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against FormFactor, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ADEDC-4420676.) - filed by Technoprobe S.p.A..(mpb)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Exhibit E,
Att: 6 Exhibit F,
Att: 7 Exhibit G,
Att: 8 Exhibit H,
Att: 9 Exhibit I,
Att: 10 Civil Cover Sheet