Maryland District Court
Judge:Stephanie A Gallagher
Case #: 1:24-cv-01593
Nature of Suit422 Bankruptcy - Appeal 28 USC 158
Cause11:101 Bankruptcy (Definitions)
Case Filed:May 30, 2024

Debtor
Provizor Federal, Inc.

,
Represented By
Aaron L. Casagrande
Ice Miller LLP
contact info
Kevin Gerald Hroblak
Ice Miller LLP
contact info
Last checked: Tuesday Nov 26, 2024 3:22 AM EST
Appellant
Loyal Source Government Services, LLC
12612 Challenger Parkway Suite 365
Orlando, FL 32826
Represented By
Jessica Duvall
Miles & Stockbridge PC
contact info
Robert P Charbonneau
Agentis PLLC
contact info
Jesse R. Cloyd
Agentis PLLC
contact info
Patricia B Jefferson
Miles And Stockbridge PC
contact info
Appellee
Kore Capital Corporation
Represented By
David Simson Musgrave
Gordon Feinblatt LLC
contact info
Lauren Lake
Gordon Feinblatt LLC
contact info
Amanda R Paige
Gordon Feinblatt LLC
contact info
Appellee
Provizor Federal, Inc.
Represented By
Aaron L. Casagrande
Ice Miller LLP
contact info
Kevin Gerald Hroblak
Ice Miller LLP
contact info
Indexed Party
Bankruptcy Court for the District of Maryland
Trustee
Morgan Fisher
Represented By
Richard Marc Goldberg
Shapiro Sher Guinot And Sandler
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, February 21, 2025
32 32 misc Status Report Fri 02/21 5:09 PM
STATUS REPORT Filed Jointly By The Parties by Loyal Source Government Services, LLC(Duvall, Jessica)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Exhibit
Friday, February 07, 2025
31 31 1 pgs order Order Fri 02/07 2:15 PM
ORDER directing the parties to provide, within 2 weeks of the date of this Order, a status update regarding the related proceedings in the U.S. Bankruptcy Court, No. 24-11528 and their applicability to the issues pending in this case. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 2/7/2025. (ols, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 12, 2024
30 30 appeal Appellants Reply Brief Thu 09/12 4:09 PM
Appellant's REPLY BRIEF by Loyal Source Government Services, LLC.(Jefferson, Patricia)
Related: [-]
29 29 respm Response in Support of Motion Thu 09/12 11:13 AM
RESPONSE in Support re4 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, to Strike Loyal Source Government Services, LLC's Notice of Appeal filed by Kore Capital Corporation.(Musgrave, David)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 29, 2024
28 28 4 pgs respm Memorandum Thu 08/29 3:10 PM
Memorandum re4 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, to Strike Loyal Source Government Services, LLC's Notice of Appeal filed by Kore Capital Corporation.(Musgrave, David)
Related: [-]
27 27 appeal Appellants Brief Thu 08/29 2:21 PM
Appellant's BRIEF by Loyal Source Government Services, LLC.(Jefferson, Patricia)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 15, 2024
26 26 2 pgs order Order Thu 08/15 3:45 PM
ORDER directing the parties to provide, within 2 weeks of the date of this Order, relevant authorities and briefing about why this case is or is not moot. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 8/15/2024. (ols, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 12, 2024
25 25 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 08/12 6:22 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Amanda R Paige on behalf of Kore Capital Corporation (Paige, Amanda)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 06, 2024
24 24 respm Reply to Response to Motion Tue 08/06 12:08 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re4 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, to Strike Loyal Source Government Services, LLC's Notice of Appeal filed by Kore Capital Corporation.(Musgrave, David)
Related: [-]
notice QC Notice - Miscellaneous Tue 08/06 10:57 AM
QC NOTICE:22 Response filed by Kore Capital Corporation was filed incorrectly. **Incorrect event used. Refile using the event "Reply to Response to Motion" and link to originating Motion. It has been noted as FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. (kk5s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 05, 2024
22 22 respm Response Mon 08/05 10:49 AM
RESPONSE re17 Response in Opposition to Motion filed by Kore Capital Corporation.(Musgrave, David)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 24, 2024
21 21 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Stay Thu 07/25 7:56 AM
ORDER granting16 Appellee's Motion to Stay Breifing. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 7/24/2024. (ols, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
19 19 misc Stipulation Wed 07/24 3:25 PM
STIPULATION re17 Response in Opposition to Motion Joint Stipulation Extending Kore Capital Corporation's Time to Respond to Loyal Source Government Services, LLC's Opposition to Motion to Dismiss or Strike Notice of Appeal by Kore Capital Corporation(Lake, Lauren)
Related: [-]
order Order Wed 07/24 4:42 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER APPROVING re19 Stipulation extending Kore Capital Corporation's Time to Respond to Loyal Source Government Services, LLC's Opposition to Motion to Dismiss or Strike Notice of Appeal. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 7/24/2024. (vals, Chambers)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 12, 2024
18 18 notice Notice (Other) Fri 07/12 7:40 PM
NOTICE by Loyal Source Government Services, LLC re16 MOTION to Stay Briefing Loyal Source's Joinder in Kore's Motion to Stay Briefing (Jefferson, Patricia)
Related: [-]
17 17 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Fri 07/12 7:15 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re4 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, to Strike Loyal Source Government Services, LLC's Notice of Appeal filed by Loyal Source Government Services, LLC.(Jefferson, Patricia)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 09, 2024
16 16 motion Stay Tue 07/09 3:52 PM
MOTION to Stay Briefing by Kore Capital Corporation(Musgrave, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order
Monday, July 01, 2024
15 15 corresp Miscellaneous Mon 07/01 11:28 AM
Correspondence from Clerk re: Briefs (ols, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 28, 2024
14 14 misc Transcript Mon 07/01 11:26 AM
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 4/2/2024, before Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher. Court Reporter/Transcriber Patricia G. Mitchell, Telephone number 410-962-3858. Total number of pages filed: 78. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained from the Court Reporter or through PACER. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/22/2024. (ols, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
13 13 appeal Designation of Record from Bankruptcy Court Mon 07/01 11:23 AM
APPELLEE'S DESIGNATION of Record on Appeal from U.S. Bankruptcy Court by Kore Capital Corporation re1 Bankruptcy Appeal Appellant Brief due by 7/29/2024. (ols, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 SAG-24-813: Loyal Source Government Services, LLCs (Loyal Source) Motion for Leave to Appeal Bankruptcy Order Granting Debtors Emergency Motion for Authority to Obtain Postpetition Financing and Other Relief,
Att: 2 SAG-24-813 ECF 1-1: Notice of Appeal,
Att: 3 SAG-24-813 ECF 1-2: Order Being Appealed,
Att: 4 SAG-24-813 ECF 1-3: BK Docket Sheet,
Att: 5 SAG-24-813 ECF 1-4: Transmittal Sheet,
Att: 6 SAG-24-813 ECF 24: Kores Opposition to Loyal Sources Motion for Leave to Appeal Bankruptcy Order Granting Debtors Emergency Motion for Authority to Obtain Postpetition Financing and Other Relief,
Att: 7 SAG-24-813 ECF 24-1: Proposed Order,
Att: 8 SAG-24-813 ECF 27: Provizor Federal, Inc.s (Provizor) Opposition to Motion of Loyal Source for Leave to Appeal Bankruptcy Order Granting Debtors Emergency Motion for Authority to Obtain Postpetition Financing and Other Relief,
Att: 9 SAG-24-813 ECF 29: Courts Order Denying Loyal Sources Motion for Leave to Appeal Bankruptcy Order Granting Debtors Emergency Motion for Authority to Obtain Postpetition Financing and Other Relief,
Att: 10 BK Docket Sheet,
Att: 11 Transmittal Sheet
12 12 misc Transcript Mon 07/01 11:13 AM
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 4/29/2024, before Judge David E. Rice. Total number of pages filed: 112. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained from the Court Reporter or through PACER. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/5/2024. (ols, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice of Requirement to Review Transcript
11 11 misc Transcript Mon 07/01 11:12 AM
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 4/15/2024, before Judge David E. Rice. Total number of pages filed: 27. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained from the Court Reporter or through PACER. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/22/2024. (ols, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice of Requirement to Review Transcript
10 10 appeal Designation of Record from Bankruptcy Court Mon 07/01 11:08 AM
APPELLANT'S DESIGNATION of Record on Appeal from U.S. Bankruptcy Court by Loyal Source Government Services, LLC re1 Bankruptcy Appeal Appellant Brief due by 7/29/2024.
Related: [-]
Att: 1 BK ECF 1: Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition,
Att: 2 BK ECF 10: Emergency Motion For Interim and Final Orders (I) Authorizing the Debtor to Obtain Postpetition Financing; (II) Granting Security Interests and Superpriority Administrative Expense Status; (III) Granting Adequate Protection; (IV) Modifying Automatic Stay; (V) Authorizing Use of Cash Collateral; (VI) Scheduling a Final Hearing and (VII) Granting Related Relief,
Att: 3 BK ECF 10-1: Exhibit A,
Att: 4 BK ECF 20: Emergency Motion For Interim and Final Orders (I) Authorizing the Debtor to Obtain Postpetition Financing; (II) Granting Security Interests and Superpriority Administrative Expense Status; (III) Granting Adequate Protection; (IV) Modifying Automatic Stay; (V) Authorizing Use of Cash Collateral; (VI) Scheduling a Final Hearing and (VII) Granting Related Relief,
Att: 5 BK ECF 20-1: Exhibit A,
Att: 6 BK ECF 20-1: Exhibit B,
Att: 7 BK ECF 20-1: Exhibit C,
Att: 8 BK ECF 20-1: Exhibit D,
Att: 9 BK ECF 20-1: Exhibit E,
Att: 10 BK ECF 20-1: Exhibit F,
Att: 11 BK ECF 20-1: Exhibit G,
Att: 12 BK ECF 27: Interim Consent Order (I) Authorizing the Debtor to Obtain Postpetition Financing; (II) Authorizing Debtor to Use Cash Collateral; (III) Granting Liens and Providing Superpriority Administrative Expense Status; (IV) Granting Adequate Protection; (V) Modifying Automatic Stay; (VI) Scheduling a Second Hearing, and (VII) Granting Related Relief,
Att: 13 BK ECF 59: Motion for Relief from Stay and Notice of Motion Re: District Court Litigation. Fee Amount $199. Notice Served on 3/8/2024, Filed by Loyal Source Government Services, LLC,
Att: 14 BK ECF 59-1: Exhibit A,
Att: 15 BK ECF 59-1: Exhibit B,
Att: 16 BK ECF 59-1: Exhibit C,
Att: 17 BK ECF 59-1: Exhibit D,
Att: 18 BK ECF 59-1: Exhibit E,
Att: 19 BK ECF 59-1: Notice of Motion,
Att: 20 BK ECF 60: Supplemental Objection to Cash Collateral [Doc No.10] and Request For Turnover and Release of Non-Estate Funds Filed,
Att: 21 BK ECF 62: Response on behalf of Provizor Federal, Inc.,
Att: 22 BK ECF 64: Memorandum in Support of Debtor's Emergency Motion for Interim and Final Order on behalf of Kore Capital Corporation,
Att: 23 BK ECF 68: Second Interim Order (I) Authorizing the Debtor to Obtain Postpetition Financing (II) Granting Security Interests and Superpriority Administrative Expense Status; (III) Granting Adequate Protection; (IV) Modifying Automatic Stay; (V) Authorizing Use of Cash Collateral; and (VI Granting Related Relief,
Att: 24 BK ECF 78: Order Denying Oral Motion of Loyal Source Government Services, LLC for Stay Pending Appeal of Second Interim Order (I) Authorizing the Debtor to Obtain Postpettition Financing (II) Granting Security Interests and Superpriority Administrative Expense Status; (III) Granting Adequate Protection : (IV) Modifying Automatic Stay; (V) Authorizing Use of Cash Collateral; and (VI) Granting Related Relief (Docket No. 68),
Att: 25 BK ECF 103: Transcript of Hearing held on 3/12/2024,
Att: 26 BK ECF 103-1: Notice of Requirement to Review Transcript,
Att: 27 BK ECF 128: Loyal Sources Emergency Motion For Clarification of Second Interim Order,
Att: 28 BK ECF 128-1: Proposed Order,
Att: 29 BK ECF 129: Loyal Sources Emergency Motion to Shorten Time To Respond To Emergency Motion For Clarification Of the Second Interim Order,
Att: 30 BK ECF 129-1: Proposed Order,
Att: 31 BK ECF 144: Order Denying Emergency Motion to Shorten Response Period to Loyal Source Government Service, LLCs Emergency Motion for Clarification of the Second Interim Order,
Att: 32 BK ECF 197: Loyal Sources Renewed Objection to Cash Collateral Motion,
Att: 33 BK ECF 218: Proceeding Memo,
Att: 34 BK ECF 218-1: KORE Capital's Exhibit List,
Att: 35 BK ECF 218-2: LCMH, LLC's Exhibit List,
Att: 36 BK ECF 218-3: Loyal Source's Exhibit List,
Att: 37 BK ECF 220: Order Denying Further Extension of Postpetition Financing and Use of Cash Collateral,
Att: 38 BK ECF 246: Order (I) Authorizing the Trustee to Obtain Post-Conversion Financing (II) Granting Security Interests and Superpriority Administrative Expense Status; (III) Granting Adequate Protection; (IV) Modifying Automatic Stay; (V) Authorizing Use of Cash Collateral; (VI) Granting Related Relief,
Att: 39 BK ECF 277: Order Authorizing Operating of Debtors Business for Interim Period Through August 7, 2024, and Extending TIP Financing During Interim Period,
Att: 40 BK Docket Sheet,
Att: 41 Transmittal Sheet)(ols, Deputy Clerk
appeal Transmission of Bankruptcy Appeal Record Wed 07/03 9:04 AM
Transmission of Bankruptcy Appeal Record re1 Bankruptcy Appeal (kns, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 27, 2024
order Order Thu 06/27 10:18 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER APPROVING re8 Stipulation. Deadline for reply to Second Motion for Leave to Appeal3 and Opposition to Motion to Dismiss4 is extended to July 12, 2024. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 6/27/2024. (vals, Chambers)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 26, 2024
8 8 misc Stipulation Wed 06/26 5:00 PM
STIPULATION re3 Response in Opposition to Motion,4 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, to Strike Loyal Source Government Services, LLC's Notice of Appeal Extending Time to Respond by Loyal Source Government Services, LLC(Jefferson, Patricia)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 20, 2024
7 7 notice Notice (Other) Thu 06/20 12:58 PM
NOTICE by Loyal Source Government Services, LLC of Unavailability for Robert P. Charbonneau for the Period of June 28, 2024 through and including July 8, 2024 (Charbonneau, Robert)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 14, 2024
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 06/14 4:37 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jesse R. Cloyd on behalf of Loyal Source Government Services, LLC (Cloyd, Jesse)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 06/14 4:36 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Robert P Charbonneau on behalf of Loyal Source Government Services, LLC (Charbonneau, Robert)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 12, 2024
4 4 motion Dismiss Wed 06/12 4:08 PM
MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, to Strike Loyal Source Government Services, LLC's Notice of Appeal by Kore Capital Corporation(Musgrave, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order
3 3 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Wed 06/12 3:55 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re2 MOTION for Leave to Appeal Bankruptcy Court Order Granting Debtors' Emergency Motion for Authority to Obtain Postpetition Financing and Other Relief filed by Kore Capital Corporation.(Musgrave, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Ex. 1 - Transcript from Motions Hearing on April 2, 2024,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order
Thursday, May 30, 2024
2 2 motion Leave to Appeal Mon 06/03 12:46 PM
SECOND MOTION for Leave to Appeal Bankruptcy Court Order Granting Debtor's Emergency Motion for Authority to Obtain Post Petition Financing and Other Relief by Loyal Source Government Services, LLC.(kns, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Docket Sheet,
Att: 2 Transmittal Sheet
1 1 appeal Bankruptcy Appeal Mon 06/03 12:43 PM
Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT (Baltimore). Bankruptcy Court case number 24-11528 filed by Loyal Source Government Services, LLC.(kns, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Order Being Appealed,
Att: 2 Docket Sheet,
Att: 3 Transmittal Sheet