California Central District Court
Judge:John F Walter
Referred: Karen E Scott
Case #: 8:24-cv-01194
Nature of Suit820 Property Rights - Copyrights
Cause17:504 Copyright Infringement
Case Filed:Jun 03, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Nov 30, 2024 1:11 AM PST
Counter Claimant
DC Practice Growth
Represented By
Jessica Eves Mathews
Leverage Legal Group LLC
contact info
Tyra Hughley Smith
Hughley Smith Law, PC
contact info
Counter Claimant
Ryan Rieder
Represented By
Jessica Eves Mathews
Leverage Legal Group LLC
contact info
Tyra Hughley Smith
Hughley Smith Law, PC
contact info
Counter Defendant
Level Up, LLC
Represented By
Joseph S Cianfrani
Friedland Cianfrani LLP
contact info
David Gee Kim
Friedland Cianfrani LLP
contact info
Michael K Friedland
Friedland Cianfrani LLP
contact info
Defendant
DC Practice Growth
Represented By
Jessica Eves Mathews
Leverage Legal Group LLC
contact info
Tyra Hughley Smith
Hughley Smith Law, PC
contact info
Defendant
Ryan Rieder
Represented By
Jessica Eves Mathews
Leverage Legal Group LLC
contact info
Tyra Hughley Smith
Hughley Smith Law, PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Level Up, LLC
Represented By
Joseph S Cianfrani
Friedland Cianfrani LLP
contact info
David Gee Kim
Friedland Cianfrani LLP
contact info
Michael K Friedland
Friedland Cianfrani LLP
contact info
ThirdParty Defendant
Brad Glowaki, CA
ThirdParty Plaintiff
DC Practice Growth
Represented By
Jessica Eves Mathews
Leverage Legal Group LLC
contact info
Tyra Hughley Smith
Hughley Smith Law, PC
contact info
ThirdParty Plaintiff
Ryan Rieder
Represented By
Jessica Eves Mathews
Leverage Legal Group LLC
contact info
Tyra Hughley Smith
Hughley Smith Law, PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 84 minutes ago
Thursday, May 01, 2025
75 75 order Dismiss Case Fri 05/02 11:45 AM
MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT UNDER FRCP 12(b)(1), FRCP 12(b)(6), AND FRCP 12(c) [filed 4/14/2025; Docket No.61 ]; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SANCTIONS by Judge John F. Walter. Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint Under FRCP 12(b)(1), FRCP 12(b)(6), and FRCP 12(c) is DENIED. Lead counsel are ordered to show cause in writing by May 6, 2025, why the Court should not impose sanctions in the amount of $1,500.00 against each of them. (iv)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 28, 2025
74 74 respm Reply (Motion related) Mon 04/28 2:01 PM
REPLY In support NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case 61 filed by Third Party Plaintiffs DC Practice Growth, Ryan Rieder, Defendants DC Practice Growth, Ryan Rieder, Counter Claimants DC Practice Growth, Ryan Rieder.(Hughley Smith, Tyra)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit J
73 73 order Protective Order Mon 04/28 10:51 AM
PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott re Joint REQUEST for Protective Order.71 [See document for details.] (san)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 25, 2025
72 72 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Fri 04/25 4:08 PM
ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION TO REVISE CASE SCHEDULE68 by Judge John F. Walter. Final Pretrial Conference: July 25, 2025 at 8:00 a.m. Hearing on Motions in Limine: August 1, 2025 at 8:00 a.m. Trial: August 12, 2025 at 8:30 a.m. (iv)
Related: [-]
71 71 motion Protective Order Fri 04/25 4:00 PM
Joint REQUEST for Protective Order filed by Plaintiff Level Up, LLC.(Townes, Nicole)
Related: [-]
70 70 attyseal Sealed Document Fri 04/25 3:54 PM
SEALED DOCUMENT EXHIBIT 2 TO THE DECLARATION OF NICOLE R. TOWNES IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO DISMISS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT UNDER FRCP 12(b)(1), FRCP 12(b)(6), AND FRCP 12(c) re Declaration (Motion related)69 , Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal67 filed by Plaintiff Level Up, LLC.(Townes, Nicole)
Related: [-]
69 69 respm Declaration (Motion related) Fri 04/25 3:45 PM
DECLARATION of Nicole R. Townes IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case 61 filed by Plaintiff Level Up, LLC.(Townes, Nicole)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2
68 68 stip Reschedule Fri 04/25 12:06 PM
Joint STIPULATION to Reschedule UPCOMING CASE SCHEDULE filed by Defendants DC Practice Growth, Ryan Rieder.(Mathews, Jessica)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 24, 2025
67 67 order Leave to File Document Under Seal Thu 04/24 12:55 PM
ORDER TO SEAL EXHIBIT 2 IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO DISMISS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT UNDER FRCP 12(b)(1), FRCP 12(b)(6), AND FRCP 12(c)66 by Judge John F. Walter. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. (iv)
Related: [-]