Original Case: 2:22-cv-14424

Eleventh Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:24-prici-10536
Typeprivate civil / federal question
Nature of Suit290 Real Property - All Other Real Property
Case Filed:Feb 21, 2024
Terminated:May 28, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Jun 04, 2024 6:47 AM EDT
Defendant - Appellee
RENNTECH, INC.
Represented By
Valerie Anne Costello
Fox McCluskey Bush Robison, PLLC
contact info
Michael John McCluskey
Fox McCluskey Bush Robison, PLLC
contact info
Eric Marc Levine
Atlas Solomon, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
INNOVATIVE VEHICLE SOLUTIONS WEST, LLC
Represented By
Kelsey Hazzard
Lindsay & Allen, PLLC
contact info
Thomas Steven Ward
Heise Suarez Melville, PA
contact info
Patricia A. Melville
Heise Suarez Melville, PA
contact info
Todd Bruce Allen
Lindsay & Allen, PLLC
contact info
Luis Eduardo Suarez
Heise Suarez Melville, PA
contact info


Docket last updated: 06/04/2024 6:47 AM EDT
Wednesday, February 21, 2024
CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Innovative Vehicle Solutions West, LLC on 02/16/2024. Fee Status: Fee Paid. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 03/18/2024 as to Appellant Innovative Vehicle Solutions West, LLC. Awaiting Appellee's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 03/26/2024 as to Appellee Renntech, Inc.
Related: [-]
Att: 1 3 pgs CIVIL - Notice of Docketing
Att: 2 2 pgs Civil Appeal Docketed - Notice of Appeal
Att: 3 1 pgs USDC Judgment, DE # 102
Att: 4 1 pgs USDC Judgment, DE # 101
Att: 5 5 pgs USDC Order, DE # 100
Att: 6 3 pgs USDC Order, DE # 99
Att: 7 1 pgs USDC Judgment, DE # 86
Att: 8 8 pgs USDC Order, DE # 85