Maryland District Court
Judge:Richard D Bennett
Case #: 1:24-cv-01606
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause28:1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights
Case Filed:Jun 04, 2024
Terminated:Jun 10, 2024
Case in other court:Circuit Court for Caroline County, C-05-CV-24-000129
Last checked: Sunday Dec 01, 2024 3:33 AM EST
Defendant
Commissioner Peter Brelia
113 South Main Street
Greensboro, MD 21639
Represented By
Raymond R Mulera
Local Government Insurance Trust
contact info
Defendant
Commissioner Bob Harrison
113 South Main Street
Greensboro, MD 21639
Represented By
Raymond R Mulera
Local Government Insurance Trust
contact info
Defendant
Commissioner Joe Noon
Represented By
Raymond R Mulera
Local Government Insurance Trust
contact info
Defendant
Commissioner Christina Robinson
Represented By
Raymond R Mulera
Local Government Insurance Trust
contact info
Defendant
Mayor David Spencer
113 South Main Street
Greensboro, MD 21639
Represented By
Raymond R Mulera
Local Government Insurance Trust
contact info
Defendant
Town of Greensboro, MD
Represented By
Raymond R Mulera
Local Government Insurance Trust
contact info
Plaintiff
Christopher F Mason
206 W Sunset Ave
Greensboro, MD 21639


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Monday, June 10, 2024
13 13 1 pgs order Order Mon 06/10 10:35 AM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Dismissing this case with prejudice and directing Clerk to close the file. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 6/10/2024. (c/m 6/10/2024)(kk5s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
12 12 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Mon 06/10 8:21 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Town of Greensboro, MD(Mulera, Raymond)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Wednesday, June 05, 2024
11 11 corresp Miscellaneous Wed 06/05 8:18 AM
Correspondence re: Standing Order 2021-13 (Mulera, Raymond)
Related: [-]
10 10 misc Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement Wed 06/05 8:03 AM
Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Town of Greensboro, MD (Mulera, Raymond)
Related: [-]
9 9 misc Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement Wed 06/05 8:02 AM
Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Peter Brelia (Mulera, Raymond)
Related: [-]
8 8 misc Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement Wed 06/05 8:01 AM
Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Bob Harrison (Mulera, Raymond)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement Wed 06/05 8:00 AM
Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Joe Noon (Mulera, Raymond)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement Wed 06/05 7:59 AM
Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Christina Robinson (Mulera, Raymond)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement Wed 06/05 7:58 AM
Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by David Spencer (Mulera, Raymond)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 04, 2024
4 4 corresp Miscellaneous Tue 06/04 3:05 PM
Correspondence from Clerk: Removal Notification Letter (c/m P 6/4/2024- ar6s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Amended Standing Order 2021-13 Concerning Removal Actions Tue 06/04 2:48 PM
Clerk's Notice of Standing Order concerning removal actions filed in this Court, which can be downloaded[LINK:here] . (ar6s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
2 2 cmp Complaint Tue 06/04 2:40 PM
STATE COURT COMPLAINT against Peter Brelia, Bob Harrison, Joe Noon, Christina Robinson, David Spencer, Town of Greensboro, MD, filed by Christopher F Mason.(ar6s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Tue 06/04 10:47 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court for Caroline County, case number C-05-CV-24-000129. ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AMDDC-11297934), filed by Town Greensboro, David Spencer, Peter Brelia, Christina Robinson, Peter Noon, Bob Harrison.(Mulera, Raymond)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Summons,
Att: 2 Exhibit Complaint,
Att: 3 Exhibit Docket Sheet,
Att: 4 Exhibit Notice of Appearance
notice Notice (Other) Tue 06/04 2:44 PM
THE ABOVE DOCUMENTS (2) ARE COPIES OF ORIGINAL PAPERS FILED IN THE CIRCUIT COURT FOR CAROLINE COUNTY. (ar6s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
notice Deficiency Notice Tue 06/04 2:49 PM
Deficiency Notice -- Your Local Rule 103.3 disclosure statement has not been filed. The Statement must be filed by 6/11/2024 (ar6s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]