Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:24-bk-80046

Texas Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Jeffrey P Norman
Case #: 3:24-ap-08002
Nature of Suit41 Bankruptcy - Objection / revocation of discharge - §727(c),(d),(e)
62 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud
Case Filed:Jun 03, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
Khristopher D. McClellen
4821 Lorca Lane
League City, TX 77573
Represented By
Khristopher D. McClellen
contact info
Defendant
Stephanie Boggs-McClellen
4821 Lorca Lane
League City, TX 77573
Represented By
Stephanie Boggs-McClellen
contact info
Plaintiff
First National Bank of Lake Jackson
1415 Louisiana St. C210
Houston, TX 77002
Represented By
First National Bank of Lake Jackson
contact info


Docket last updated: 12 hours ago
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
36 36 motion Substitute Attorney Wed 04/30 6:09 PM
Motion To Substitute Attorney. Filed by First National Bank of Lake Jackson (Gibbs, Reagan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Saturday, April 12, 2025
35 35 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sat 04/12 11:30 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 04/12/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 34 Generic Order
Thursday, April 10, 2025
34 34 2 pgs order Order on Generic Motion (Adversary) Thu 04/10 4:14 PM
Order Granting Agreed Motion for Trial Continuance Related [+], Signed on 4/10/2025. (abm4)
Related: [-] 33
33 33 motion Generic Motion (Adversary) Thu 04/10 2:35 PM
Agreed Motion for Trial Continuance Filed by First National Bank of Lake Jackson (Shadwick, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
court Hearing Cont Thu 04/10 4:16 PM
Hearing Continued Related [+]. Trial date set for 6/11/2025 at 11:00 AM at telephone and video conference. (abm4)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Wednesday, March 05, 2025
court Hearing Cont Wed 03/05 8:36 AM
Notice of Location Change Only. Hearing Location Reset Related [+]. Trial date set for 4/16/2025 at 10:00 AM at telephone and video conference. (tjl4)
Related: [-] 31 Scheduling Order
Thursday, January 30, 2025
32 32 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Thu 01/30 11:38 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 01/30/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 31 Scheduling Order
Tuesday, January 28, 2025
31 31 order Scheduling Order Tue 01/28 5:15 PM
Second Amended Order Scheduling Trial, Signed on 1/28/2025. Discovery due by 2/28/2025. Trial date set for 4/16/2025 at 10:00 AM at Galveston 7th Floor Courtroom. (abm4)
Related: [-]
30 30 motion Generic Motion (Adversary) Tue 01/28 2:41 PM
Joint Motion for Entry of a Second Amended Order Scheduling Trial Filed by Stephanie Boggs-McClellen, First National Bank of Lake Jackson, Khristopher D. McClellen (Lewinski, Kim)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, January 10, 2025
29 29 motion Summary Judgment Fri 01/10 5:55 PM
Motion For Summary Judgment. Objections/Request for Hearing Due in 21 days. Filed by First National Bank of Lake Jackson (Lewinski, Kim)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Att: 3 Exhibit C
Att: 4 Exhibit
Att: 5 Exhibit
Att: 6 Exhibit
Att: 7 Exhibit
Att: 8 Exhibit
Att: 9 Exhibit
Att: 10 Exhibit
Att: 11 Proposed Order
Friday, January 03, 2025
28 28 notice Notice Fri 01/03 2:07 PM
Amended Notice of Deposition of Stephanie Boggs-McClellen . Filed by First National Bank of Lake Jackson (Lewinski, Kim)
Related: [-]
27 27 notice Notice Fri 01/03 2:05 PM
Amended Notice of Deposition of Khristopher McClellen . Filed by First National Bank of Lake Jackson (Lewinski, Kim)
Related: [-]
Saturday, September 14, 2024
26 26 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sat 09/14 11:33 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 09/14/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 23 Scheduling Order
25 25 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sat 09/14 11:33 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 09/14/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 22 Generic Order
Thursday, September 12, 2024
24 24 audio MP3 Thu 09/12 5:30 PM
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 9/12/2024 11:00:18 AM ]. File Size [ 2719 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:05:40 ]. (admin)
Related: [-]
23 23 order Scheduling Order Thu 09/12 2:57 PM
Amended Order Scheduling Trial Related [+], Signed on 9/12/2024 Trial date set for 2/12/2025 at 10:00 AM at Galveston 7th Floor Courtroom. (abm4)
Related: [-] ument16
22 22 order Generic Order Thu 09/12 2:15 PM
COPY OF Order Setting Aside Entry of Default and Default Judgment Related [+]
Related: [-] ument9 , Signed on 9/12/2024 (abm4) Modified on 9/12/2024 (AkeitaHouse)
21 21 court Courtroom Minutes Thu 09/12 11:05 AM
Courtroom Minutes. Appearances: Kim Lewinski for plainiff; Gabe Perez for defendants. Status conference held. Order to be entered. ERO: yes. Related [+]. (abm4)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Tuesday, September 10, 2024
court Hearing Set Tue 09/10 8:18 AM
Notice of Location Change. Hearing Location Reset Due to Inclement Weather Related [+]. Status conference to be held on 9/12/2024 at 11:00 AM at telephone and video conference. (tjl4)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Friday, September 06, 2024
20 20 misc Initial Disclosure Rule 26 Fri 09/06 6:17 PM
Initial Disclosure Rule 26 (Filed By First National Bank of Lake Jackson ). (Lewinski, Kim)
Related: [-]
Sunday, August 25, 2024
19 19 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sun 08/25 11:27 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 08/25/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 17 Generic Order (Adversary)
18 18 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sun 08/25 11:27 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 08/25/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 16 Scheduling Order
Friday, August 23, 2024
17 17 order Generic Order (Adversary) Fri 08/23 10:50 AM
Order Transferring Adversary Signed on 8/23/2024 (trc4)
Related: [-]
16 16 order Scheduling Order Fri 08/23 10:47 AM
Order Scheduling Trial Signed on 8/23/2024. Trial date set for 2/20/2025 at 09:00 AM at Galveston 7th Floor Courtroom. (trc4)
Related: [-]
15 15 court Courtroom Minutes Fri 08/23 9:59 AM
Courtroom Minutes. Time Hearing Held: 9:30. Appearances: Michael Durrschmidt for the Plaintiff, Gabe Perez for the Defendant. Related [+] Pretrial Conference held. Mr. Durrschmidt addressed concerns with a possible related case - 24-80205 SDM Construction. The Court will enter a scheduling order setting deadlines and trial date. 1 day estimated for trial. (trc4)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
court Case Reassigned Fri 08/23 10:50 AM
Judge Alfredo R Perez added to case. Involvement of Judge Jeffrey P Norman Terminated (trc4)
Related: [-]
court Hearing Set Fri 08/23 11:00 AM
Hearing Set On Related [+]. Status conference to be held on 9/12/2024 at 11:00 AM at Galveston 7th Floor Courtroom. (tjl4)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Thursday, August 22, 2024
14 14 misc Joint Discovery/Case Management Plan(for Attorney) Thu 08/22 10:06 AM
Joint Discovery Plan/Case Management Plan (Filed By First National Bank of Lake Jackson ). (Durrschmidt, Michael)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 01, 2024
13 13 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Thu 08/01 11:37 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 08/01/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 12 Order Setting Hearing
Tuesday, July 30, 2024
12 12 order Setting Hearing Tue 07/30 9:21 AM
Order Resetting Pretrial Conference Signed on 7/30/2024 Related [+] Hearing rescheduled for 8/23/2024 at 09:30 AM at Galveston 7th Floor Courtroom. (trc4)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Saturday, July 27, 2024
11 11 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sat 07/27 11:29 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 07/27/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 9 Order on Motion for Entry of Default
Thursday, July 25, 2024
10 10 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 07/25 2:05 PM
Answer to Complaint Related [+] Filed by Stephanie Boggs-McClellen, Khristopher D. McClellen (Perez, Gabe)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
9 9 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Entry of Default Thu 07/25 11:45 AM
Entry of Default Signed on 7/25/2024. (trc4)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 24, 2024
8 8 motion Entry of Default Wed 07/24 5:38 PM
Motion for Entry of Default pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 55(a) Filed by First National Bank of Lake Jackson (Lewinski, Kim)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit Affidavit of Kim Lewinski
Friday, June 07, 2024
7 7 cmp Summons Service Executed Fri 06/07 5:11 PM
Summons Service Executed on Stephanie Boggs-McClellen 6/7/2024. (Durrschmidt, Michael)
Related: [-]
6 6 cmp Summons Service Executed Fri 06/07 5:06 PM
Summons Service Executed on Khristopher D. McClellen 6/7/2024. (Durrschmidt, Michael)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 06, 2024
5 5 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Thu 06/06 11:36 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 3. Notice Date 06/06/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 2 Scheduling Order
4 4 court Summons Issued Thu 06/06 8:19 AM
Summons Issued on Khristopher D. McClellen and Stephanie Boggs-McClelle; Date Issued 6/6/2024. (rlm4) (Main Document 4 replaced on 6/6/2024) (RhondaMooreKonieczny)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 05, 2024
3 3 misc Summons - Request for Issuance Wed 06/05 4:42 PM
Request for Issuance of Summons on Khristopher McClellen and Stephanie Boggs-McClellen. (Lewinski, Kim)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 04, 2024
2 2 order Scheduling Order Tue 06/04 11:17 AM
Preliminary Pretrial Order Signed on 6/4/2024 Pre-Trial Conference set for 8/16/2024 at 09:30 AM at Galveston 7th Floor Courtroom. (trc4)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 03, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint [system event] Mon 06/03 11:29 PM
Adversary case 24-08002 Nature of Suit: (62 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud)),(41 (Objection / revocation of discharge - 727(c),(d),(e))) Complaint to Determine Nondischargeability under 11 U.S.C. § 523(a)(2)(A)&(B) and Objection to Discharge under 11 U.S.C. § 727(a)(4) and (5) by First National Bank of Lake Jackson against Khristopher D. McClellen, Stephanie Boggs-McClellen. Fee Amount $350 (Lewinski, Kim)
Related: [-]