New Jersey District Court
Judge:Michael E Farbiarz
Referred: Leda D Wettre
Case #: 2:24-cv-06675
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause18:1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Case Filed:Jun 04, 2024
Terminated:Feb 06, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Dec 01, 2024 3:49 AM EST
Defendant
DOUBLEDAY OFFICE LIQUIDATION
Defendant
ALEXANDER EMPOSIMATO
Plaintiff
JACOB KELLNER
1680 FELDMUS LANE
TOMS RIVER, NJ 08755


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Thursday, February 06, 2025
8 8 order Order of Dismissal Thu 02/06 11:24 AM
TEXT ORDER OF DISMISSAL: The deadline for the Plaintiff to file proper proof of service has passed. See ECF 7. The Clerk of Court is directed to close the case.So Ordered by Judge Michael E. Farbiarz on 2/6/2025. (ro, )
Related: [-]
Friday, January 17, 2025
7 7 order Order Fri 01/17 7:19 PM
TEXT ORDER: The deadline for the Plaintiff to file proper proof of service has passed. See ECF 6. The Plaintiff has not done so, or otherwise provided an explanation. If the Plaintiff does not make the requisite filing on or before January 31, the Court will direct the Clerk of Court to close the case. So Ordered by Judge Michael E. Farbiarz on 1/17/2025. (ro, )
Related: [-]
Friday, November 15, 2024
6 6 order Order Fri 11/15 2:05 PM
TEXT ORDER: It is not clear from the Plaintiff's Affidavit of Service [ECF 5] that the Defendants in this action were properly served. By December 1, 2024, the Plaintiff shall file proof of proper service on the Defendants, or explain his failure to do so. So Ordered by Judge Michael E. Farbiarz on 11/15/2024. (ro, )
Related: [-]
Monday, June 24, 2024
5 5 service Affidavit of Service Fri 06/28 9:31 AM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Notice and Petition of Appeal, filed by JACOB KELLNER. Related [+] (sm)
Related: [-] ceived via Help Desk
Monday, June 10, 2024
4 4 misc Letter Tue 06/11 11:36 AM
NOTICE TO RECEIVE NEF from JACOB KELLNER. (ECF Help Desk) (lag, )
Related: [-]
3 3 service Summons Issued Mon 06/10 1:27 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to DOUBLEDAY OFFICE LIQUIDATION, ALEXANDER EMPOSIMATO. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jr)
Related: [-]
misc Filing Fee Received Mon 06/10 1:22 PM
Filing fee: $ 405, receipt number NEW50339 (jr)
Related: [-]
cmp Complaint Mon 06/10 1:25 PM
COMPLAINT against DOUBLEDAY OFFICE LIQUIDATION, ALEXANDER EMPOSIMATO with JURY DEMAND, filed by JACOB KELLNER. See doc.1 (jr)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 04, 2024
2 2 notice Notice of Guidelines for Pro Se Filers Tue 06/04 2:55 PM
Notice of Guidelines for Appearing Pro Se (pm, )
Related: [-]
1 1 service Complaint Received Tue 06/04 2:55 PM
Complaint Received.(pm, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Summons