Michigan Eastern District Court
Judge:Brandy R Mcmillion
Referred: Kimberly G Altman
Case #: 2:24-cv-11471
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Injunctive & Declaratory Relief
Case Filed:Jun 04, 2024
Terminated:Oct 23, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Dec 01, 2024 4:03 AM EST
Defendant
Mitchell R McCann
Represented By
Joshua Apel
Miller Johnson
contact info
Todd A. Holleman
Miller Johnson
contact info
Defendant
Wesley McCann
Represented By
Joshua Apel
Miller Johnson
contact info
Todd A. Holleman
Miller Johnson
contact info
Defendant
LPL Financial, LLC
Represented By
Ari M. Charlip
Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani, LLP
contact info
Kendra S Canape
Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani LLP
contact info
Luke D. Wolf
Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani
contact info
Plaintiff
Ameriprise Financial Services, LLC
Represented By
Brandon Taaffe
Shumaker, Loop And Kendrick
contact info


Docket last updated: 67 minutes ago
Tuesday, January 07, 2025
30 30 1 pgs order Order Tue 01/07 10:42 AM
ORDER RELEASING SURETY BOND (ECF No.23 ). Signed by District Judge Brandy R. McMillion. (LHos)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 23, 2024
29 29 order Dismissing Case Wed 10/23 9:29 AM
DISMISSAL ORDER. Signed by District Judge Brandy R. McMillion. (LHos)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 22, 2024
28 28 notice Notice - Other Tue 10/22 2:54 PM
NOTICE by LPL Financial, LLC of Order in Arbitration Matter (Wolf, Luke)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 15, 2024
27 27 order Stipulation and Order Staying Case Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Mon 07/15 9:26 AM
STIPULATION AND ORDER GRANTING FOR ENTRY OF PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AND TO STAY ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS. Hearing before Judge McMillion on 7/15/24 is cancelled. Signed by District Judge Brandy R. McMillion. (LHos)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 12, 2024
26 26 notice Appearance Fri 07/12 1:03 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Kendra S Canape on behalf of LPL Financial, LLC. (Canape, Kendra)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 11, 2024
25 25 notice Appear* Thu 07/11 1:11 PM
**NOTICE TO CONVERT PROCEEDING TO TEAMS VIDEO** NOTICE TO APPEAR REMOTELY: Show Cause Hearing set for 7/15/2024 at 11:30 AM before District Judge Brandy R. McMillion . |Public may access audio with the following information (Telephone Number,,Conference ID): tel:+13132617355,,535512643| (LHos)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 09, 2024
24 24 misc Transcript Tue 07/09 9:12 AM
TRANSCRIPT of Motion for Temporary Restraining Order held on 07/01/2024. (Court Reporter/Transcriber: Timothy Floury) (Number of Pages: 31) The parties have 21 days to file with the court and Court Reporter/Transcriber a Redaction Request of this transcript. If no request is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 days. Redaction Request due 7/30/2024. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/9/2024. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/7/2024. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, the transcript is publicly available. (Floury, Timothy)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 08, 2024
23 23 misc Bond Mon 07/08 4:37 PM
Surety BOND in the amount of $ $50,000.00 posted by Ameriprise Financial Services, LLC (Taaffe, Brandon)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Doc 2 Order Granting TRO
Monday, July 01, 2024
22 22 3 pgs order Order ~Util - Terminate Motions ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Mon 07/01 2:42 PM
ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AS TO LPL FINANCIAL, LLC AND DENYING MOTION FOR EXPEDITED DISCOVERY re (ECF No.2 ). Show Cause Hearing set for 7/15/2024 at 11:30 AM before District Judge Brandy R. McMillion on Zoom . Signed by District Judge Brandy R. McMillion. (LHos)
Related: [-]
21 21 notice Appearance Mon 07/01 9:15 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua Apel on behalf of Mitchell R McCann, Wesley McCann. (Apel, Joshua)
Related: [-]
minutes Motion Hearing Mon 07/01 11:51 AM
Minute Entry for remote proceedings before District Judge Brandy R. McMillion: Motion Hearing held on 7/1/2024 re2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and for Expedited Discovery filed by Ameriprise Financial Services, LLC. Disposition: Order to follow. (Court Reporter: Timothy Floury) (LHos)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 28, 2024
20 20 misc Redacted Document Fri 06/28 3:47 PM
REDACTED VERSION of ECF Nos. 2-1, 2-2, and 2-3 by Ameriprise Financial Services, LLC (Taaffe, Brandon)
Related: [-]
19 19 misc Redacted Document Fri 06/28 3:40 PM
REDACTED VERSION of ECF Nos. 1-4, 1-5 and 1-7 by Ameriprise Financial Services, LLC (Taaffe, Brandon)
Related: [-]
18 18 respm Reply to Response to Motion Fri 06/28 3:15 PM
REPLY to Response re2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and for Expedited Discovery filed by Ameriprise Financial Services, LLC. (Taaffe, Brandon)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Exhibit,
Att: 3 Exhibit,
Att: 4 Exhibit
minutes Status Conference Fri 06/28 1:54 PM
Minute Entry for telephonic proceedings before District Judge Brandy R. McMillion: Telephonic Status Conference held on 6/28/2024. (Court Reporter: None Present, Not on the Record) (LHos)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 27, 2024
17 17 notice Appear* Thu 06/27 12:37 PM
RE-NOTICE TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE: Status Conference reset for 6/28/2024 at 01:30 PM before District Judge Brandy R. McMillion . **Please see notice for call information. (LHos)
Related: [-]
16 16 notice Appear* Thu 06/27 12:32 PM
NOTICE TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE: Status Conference set for 6/28/2024 at 10:00 AM before District Judge Brandy R. McMillion. *Please see notice for call information. (LHos)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 26, 2024
15 15 notice Notice - Other Wed 06/26 11:23 AM
NOTICE by LPL Financial, LLC re12 Response to Motion, NOTICE OF ERRATA (Wolf, Luke)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Corrected Response In Opposition to Ameriprise TRO Motion
Monday, June 24, 2024
14 14 order Seal ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Mon 06/24 2:47 PM
TEXT-ONLY ORDER to Seal Exhibits ECF Nos. 1-4, 1-5, 1-7, 2-1, 2-2, 2-3. Plaintiff is ordered to identify any other pleadings or exhibits that require redaction and is further ordered to file redacted exhibits on the docket by 6/28/2024 . Entered by District Judge Brandy R. McMillion. (LHos)
Related: [-]
13 13 order Stipulation and Order Mon 06/24 12:08 PM
STIPULATED ORDER TO ENTER TEMPORARY INJUNCTION AGAINST MITCHELL R. MCCANN AND WESLEY MCCANN AND TO STAY PROCEEDINGS AS TO THE MCCANNS ONLY PENDING THE ALREADY FILED FINRA ACTION re2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, Motion for Preliminary Injunction and for Expedited Discovery. Signed by District Judge Brandy R. McMillion. (LHos)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 21, 2024
12 12 respm Response to Motion Fri 06/21 11:37 PM
RESPONSE to2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and for Expedited Discovery filed by LPL Financial, LLC. (Wolf, Luke)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Index of Exhibits,
Att: 2 Exhibit AStatement of Claim,
Att: 3 Exhibit BAmended Statement of Claim,
Att: 4 Exhibit CThe Broker Protocol, J.S. Held,
Att: 5 Exhibit DProtocol for Broker Recruiting
Tuesday, June 11, 2024
11 11 notice Hearing on Motion* Tue 06/11 3:01 PM
NOTICE OF REMOTE HEARING on2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and for Expedited Discovery . Response due by 6/21/2024 ; Reply due by 6/28/2024 ; and Motion Hearing set for 7/1/2024 at 11:00 AM before District Judge Brandy R. McMillion on Zoom. |Remote Access Phone Number: 669-254-5252 and Meeting ID: 161 076 6098| (LHos)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Appearance Tue 06/11 12:32 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Luke D. Wolf on behalf of LPL Financial, LLC. (Wolf, Luke)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Appearance Tue 06/11 12:29 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Ari M. Charlip on behalf of LPL Financial, LLC. (Charlip, Ari)
Related: [-]
minutes Status Conference Tue 06/11 2:57 PM
Minute Entry for telephonic proceedings before District Judge Brandy R. McMillion: Telephonic Status Conference held on 6/11/2024. (Court Reporter: None Present, Not on the Record) (LHos)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 10, 2024
8 8 notice Appear* Mon 06/10 10:35 AM
NOTICE TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE: Status Conference set for 6/11/2024 at 02:30 PM before District Judge Brandy R. McMillion . Call information will be emailed. (LHos)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 07, 2024
7 7 notice Appearance Fri 06/07 3:45 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Todd A. Holleman on behalf of Mitchell R McCann, Wesley McCann. (Holleman, Todd)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 05, 2024
6 6 notice Consent and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge Wed 06/05 11:28 AM
Notice of Consent and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge filed by Ameriprise Financial Services, LLC . (Taaffe, Brandon)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Summons Issued* Wed 06/05 8:04 AM
SUMMONS Issued for *LPL Financial, LLC* (DPer)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Summons Issued* Wed 06/05 8:03 AM
SUMMONS Issued for *Wesley McCann* (DPer)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Summons Issued* Wed 06/05 8:02 AM
SUMMONS Issued for *Mitchell R McCann* (DPer)
Related: [-]
notice Notice to Parties of Consent of a Civil Action before a Magistrate Judge Option Wed 06/05 8:02 AM
A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at[LINK:http://www.mied.uscourts.gov] (DPer)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 04, 2024
2 2 motion Temporary Restraining Order Preliminary Injunction Tue 06/04 5:13 PM
MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and for Expedited Discovery by Ameriprise Financial Services, LLC. (Taaffe, Brandon)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit M McCann FA Agmt,
Att: 2 Exhibit W McCann Employ Agmt,
Att: 3 Exhibit Declaration of S. Warner,
Att: 4 Exhibit FINRA Rule 13804,
Att: 5 Exhibit Declaration of J Swihart,
Att: 6 Exhibit Customer Complaint,
Att: 7 Exhibit Proposed discovery requests
1 1 43 pgs cmp Civil Case - Complaint Tue 06/04 4:51 PM
COMPLAINT for TRO and Injunctive Relief filed by Ameriprise Financial Services, LLC against Ameriprise Financial Services, LLC. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-9817474 - Fee: $ 405. County of 1st Plaintiff: Minneapolis, MN - County Where Action Arose: Oakland - County of 1st Defendant: Oakland. [ Previously dismissed case: No] (Taaffe, Brandon)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit FINRA Rule 13804,
Att: 2 Exhibit Mitchell McCann CRD,
Att: 3 Exhibit Wesley McCann CRD,
Att: 4 Exhibit Mitchell McCann FA Agmt,
Att: 5 Exhibit Wesley McCann Employment Agmt,
Att: 6 Exhibit The Protocol,
Att: 7 Exhibit Reminder of Obligations,
Att: 8 Exhibit Security Camera Photos,
Att: 9 Exhibit Forensic Investigation Report,
Att: 10 Exhibit McCann Sample Letterhead,
Att: 11 Exhibit Customer Complaint,
Att: 12 Exhibit Document in shred bin,
Att: 13 Exhibit FINRA Letter of Acceptance