New York Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Alan S Trust
Case #: 8:24-bk-72148
Case Filed:Jun 04, 2024
Dismissed:Mar 04, 2025
Terminated:May 05, 2025

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$500,001 to $1 million
Est. Liabilities $500,001 to $1 million
Nature of Business Single Asset Real Estate
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
M & T 99 Lafayette Inc
139 Centre St Ste 213
New York, NY 10013-4553
Represented By
M & T 99 Lafayette Inc
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
Long Island Federal Courthouse 560 Federal Plaza - Room 560
Central Islip, NY 11722


Docket last updated: 06/03/2024 8:00 PM EDT
Tuesday, June 04, 2024
court Receipt Number and Filing Fee - Generic Auto Tue 06/04 7:30 PM
Receipt of Chapter 11 Installment Filing Fee - $1,000.00. Receipt Number 80271442. (AH) (admin)
Related: [-]
court Receipt Number and Filing Fee - Generic Auto Tue 06/04 7:30 PM
Receipt of Chapter 11 Installment Filing Fee - $738.00. Receipt Number 80271442. (AH) (admin)
Related: [-]
1 1 10 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Tue 06/04 3:36 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals. Fee Amount $ 1738. Filed by M & T 99 Lafayette Inc Chapter 11 Plan due by 10/2/2024. Disclosure Statement due by 10/2/2024. (alh)
Related: [-]
2 2 court Deficient Filing Chapter 11 Tue 06/04 3:51 PM
Deficient Filing Chapter 11: Affidavit Pursuant to E.D.N.Y. LBR 1007-4 due 6/4/2024. 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors due 6/4/2024. Corporate Resolution Pursuant to E.D.N.Y. LBR 1074-1(a) due by 6/4/2024. Corporate Ownership Statement Pursuant to FBR 1007(a)(1) due 6/4/2024. Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant to FBR 1073-3 due 6/4/2024. Summary of Assets and Liabilities for Non-Individuals Official Form 206Sum due by 6/18/2024. Schedule A/B due 6/18/2024. Schedule D due 6/18/2024. Schedule E/F due 6/18/2024. Schedule G due 6/18/2024. Schedule H due 6/18/2024. Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non Individual Debtors Official Form 202 due 6/18/2024. List of Equity Security Holders due 6/18/2024. Statement of Financial Affairs Non-Ind Form 207 due 6/18/2024. Incomplete Filings due by 6/18/2024. (alh)
Related: [-]