California Central District Court
Judge:Kenly Kiya Kato
Referred: Steve Kim
Case #: 2:24-cv-04677
Nature of Suit370 Torts - Personal Property - Other Fraud
Cause28:1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)
Case Filed:Jun 04, 2024
Case in other court:Los Angeles Superior Court, 24STCV12282
Last checked: Sunday Dec 01, 2024 12:38 AM PST
Defendant
Aylo Billing US Corp.
Represented By
David A. Steinberg
Mitchell Silberberg And Knupp LLP
contact info
Theresa B. Bowman
Mitchell Silberberg And Knupp LLP
contact info
Marc Ellis Mayer
Mitchell Silberberg And Knupp LLP
contact info
Defendant
Aylo Global Entertainment, Inc.
Represented By
David A. Steinberg
Mitchell Silberberg And Knupp LLP
contact info
Theresa B. Bowman
Mitchell Silberberg And Knupp LLP
contact info
Marc Ellis Mayer
Mitchell Silberberg And Knupp LLP
contact info
Defendant
Aylo Holdings U.S.A. Corp.
Represented By
David A. Steinberg
Mitchell Silberberg And Knupp LLP
contact info
Theresa B. Bowman
Mitchell Silberberg And Knupp LLP
contact info
Marc Ellis Mayer
Mitchell Silberberg And Knupp LLP
contact info
Defendant
Aylo Holdings, S.A.R.L.
Represented By
David A. Steinberg
Mitchell Silberberg And Knupp LLP
contact info
Theresa B. Bowman
Mitchell Silberberg And Knupp LLP
contact info
Marc Ellis Mayer
Mitchell Silberberg And Knupp LLP
contact info
Defendant
Aylo USA Incorporated
Represented By
David A. Steinberg
Mitchell Silberberg And Knupp LLP
contact info
Theresa B. Bowman
Mitchell Silberberg And Knupp LLP
contact info
Marc Ellis Mayer
Mitchell Silberberg And Knupp LLP
contact info
Defendant
Ethical Capital Partners
Defendant
Pornhub.com
Defendant
Does
Defendant
Mindgeek USA Inc.
Plaintiff
Genevieve Morton
Represented By
Jennifer Holliday
Jennifer Holliday
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Friday, March 07, 2025
115 115 order Reconsideration Fri 03/07 1:16 PM
MINUTES (In Chambers) Order DENYING Plaintiff's Motion to Reconsider [Dkt. 112] by Judge Kenly Kiya Kato. For the reasons set forth above, Plaintiff's Motion to Reconsider is DENIED. (See document for further information).; denying112 MOTION for Reconsideration. (aco)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 05, 2025
114 114 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Wed 03/05 3:26 PM
(IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge Kenly Kiya Kato: The Court finds Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration of Order Dismissing [Dkt. 112] appropriate for resolution without oral argument. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 78; L.R. 7-15. Accordingly, the hearing set for March 13, 2025 is hereby VACATED and the matter is taken under submission. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (npo)
Related: [-]