Genevieve Morton v. Aylo Holdings, S.A.R.L. et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Kenly Kiya Kato |
Referred: | Steve Kim |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-04677 |
Nature of Suit | 370 Torts - Personal Property - Other Fraud |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-(Citizenship) |
Case Filed: | Jun 04, 2024 |
Case in other court: | Los Angeles Superior Court, 24STCV12282 |
Last checked: Sunday Dec 01, 2024 12:38 AM PST |
Defendant
Aylo Billing US Corp.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Aylo Global Entertainment, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Aylo Holdings U.S.A. Corp.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Aylo Holdings, S.A.R.L.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Aylo USA Incorporated
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Ethical Capital Partners
|
|
Defendant
Pornhub.com
|
|
Defendant
Does
|
|
Defendant
Mindgeek USA Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
Genevieve Morton
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/04/2025 11:59 PM PDT |
Friday, March 07, 2025 | ||
115 | 115
![]() MINUTES (In Chambers) Order DENYING Plaintiff's Motion to Reconsider [Dkt. 112] by Judge Kenly Kiya Kato. For the reasons set forth above, Plaintiff's Motion to Reconsider is DENIED. (See document for further information).; denying112 MOTION for Reconsideration. (aco) |
|
Wednesday, March 05, 2025 | ||
114 | 114
textonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Wed 03/05 3:26 PM
(IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge Kenly Kiya Kato: The Court finds Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration of Order Dismissing [Dkt. 112] appropriate for resolution without oral argument. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 78; L.R. 7-15. Accordingly, the hearing set for March 13, 2025 is hereby VACATED and the matter is taken under submission. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (npo) |