California Central District Court
Judge:Dale S Fischer
Referred: Charles F Eick
Case #: 8:24-cv-01208
Nature of Suit880 Civil Rights - Defend Trade Secrets Act of 2016 (DTSA)
Cause18:1836(b) Civil Action to Protect Trade Secrets
Case Filed:Jun 04, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Dec 01, 2024 12:39 AM PST
Counter Claimant
Marcus Uribe
Represented By
William M Crosby
William M Crosby Law Offices
contact info
Counter Claimant
Reliable Capital Solutions, LLC
Represented By
William M Crosby
William M Crosby Law Offices
contact info
Counter Defendant
KVC Group, LLC
Represented By
Tyler E Sanchez
Salisian Lee LLP
contact info
Counter Defendant
Huy Nguyen
Defendant
Reliable Capital Solutions LLC
Represented By
William M Crosby
William M Crosby Law Offices
contact info
Defendant
Marcus Uribe
Represented By
William M Crosby
William M Crosby Law Offices
contact info
Defendant
Emmie Mackey
Plaintiff
KVC Group, LLC
Represented By
Jared T Densen
Salisian Lee LLP
contact info
Neal S Salisian
Salisian Lee LLP
contact info
Tyler E Sanchez
Salisian Lee LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 33 minutes ago
Wednesday, March 19, 2025
65 65 order Order/Referral to ADR (No 3) (Private Mediator) (ADR-12) Wed 03/19 3:17 PM
ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 3 by Judge Dale S. Fischer. Case ordered to a private mediator based upon a stipulation of the parties or by the court order. ADR Proceeding to be held no later than 09/22/2025. (doc)
Related: [-]
64 64 order Pretrial-Trial Scheduling Order - form only Wed 03/19 3:14 PM
Order re Jury Trial by Judge Dale S. Fischer. These dates and requirements are firm. The Court is very unlikely to grant continuances unless the parties establish good cause through a concrete showing. Failure to complete discovery in a timely manner does not constitute good cause, nor does the fact that a settlement conference is pending. Each side is limited to five motions in limine, unless the Court orders otherwise. See Trial Order for specifics. Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/17/2025 03:00 PM. Jury Trial set for 12/16/2025 08:30 AM. Trial will not proceed unless the parties engage in additional effort to resolve the matter through ADR. (doc)
Related: [-]
63 63 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Wed 03/19 2:55 PM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer. The Court approves the schedule set forth in docket no. 60-1. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (eo)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 14, 2025
62 62 misc Declaration Fri 03/14 6:24 PM
DECLARATION of Nathaniel G. Kelly re Stipulation to Continue60 filed by Plaintiff KVC Group, LLC. (Sanchez, Tyler)
Related: [-]
61 61 misc Declaration Fri 03/14 6:22 PM
DECLARATION of Tyler E. Sanchez re Stipulation to Continue60 filed by Plaintiff KVC Group, LLC. (Sanchez, Tyler)
Related: [-]
60 60 stip Continue Fri 03/14 6:11 PM
STIPULATION to Continue Trial and All Related Discovery Dates from June 17, 2025 to December 16, 2025 filed by Plaintiff KVC Group, LLC.(Sanchez, Tyler)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Proposed Order