Virginia Eastern District Court
Judge:Michael S Nachmanoff
Referred: William B Porter
Case #: 1:24-cv-00961
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Case Filed:Jun 05, 2024
Last checked: Monday Dec 02, 2024 3:59 AM EST
Defendant
ShiftMed, LLC
Represented By
Michael S. McIntosh
Littler Mendelson Pc (mclean)
contact info
Plaintiff
Kimberly Lohr
Represented By
Melinda Arbuckle
Wage And Hour Firm
contact info
Samantha Galina
Butler Curwood, PLC
contact info
Zev Hillel Antell
Butler Curwood, PLC
contact info
Ricardo J. Prieto
Wage And Hour Firm
contact info
Craig Juraj Curwood
Butler Curwood PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 8 hours ago
Tuesday, July 23, 2024
15 15 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Compel Wed 07/24 8:53 AM
ORDERED that Plaintiff must arbitrate her claim in this action on an individual basis. It is further ORDERED that the instant action is STAYED pending completion of the arbitration in re11 Motion to Compel. Signed by District Judge Michael S Nachmanoff on 7/23/2024. (Sbro, )
Related: [-]
Monday, July 15, 2024
14 14 motion Compel Mon 07/15 2:23 PM
Consent MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Waiver of Hearing by Kimberly Lohr. (Antell, Zev)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 02, 2024
misc Notice of Correction Tue 07/02 12:46 PM
Notice of Correction: Filing user notified to file a Notice of Hearing or Notice of Waiver of Oral Argument in re11 MOTION to Compel Individual Arbitration and Stay Case, or in the Alternative, Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint (Sbro, )
Related: [-]
Monday, July 01, 2024
13 13 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 07/01 8:28 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by ShiftMed, LLC. (McIntosh, Michael)
Related: [-]
12 12 23 pgs respm Memorandum in Support Mon 07/01 8:27 PM
Memorandum in Support re11 MOTION to Compel Individual Arbitration and Stay Case, or in the Alternative, Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by ShiftMed, LLC.(McIntosh, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit Declaration of Matthew Abbott
11 11 motion Compel Mon 07/01 8:25 PM
MOTION to Compel Individual Arbitration and Stay Case, or in the Alternative, Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by ShiftMed, LLC.(McIntosh, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, June 13, 2024
10 10 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Pro hac vice Fri 06/14 8:19 AM
ORDER granting8 Motion for Pro hac vice Appointed Melinda Arbuckle for Kimberly Lohr. Signed by District Judge Michael S Nachmanoff on 6/13/2024. (swil)
Related: [-]
9 9 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Pro hac vice Fri 06/14 8:18 AM
ORDER granting7 Motion for Pro hac vice Appointed Ricardo J. Prieto for Kimberly Lohr. Signed by District Judge Michael S Nachmanoff on 6/13/2024. (swil)
Related: [-]
8 8 motion Pro Hac Vice Thu 06/13 8:48 AM
Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Melinda Arbuckle and Certification of Local Counsel Zev Antell Filing fee $ 75, receipt number AVAEDC-9579278. by Kimberly Lohr. (Antell, Zev)
Related: [-]
7 7 motion Pro Hac Vice Thu 06/13 8:46 AM
Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Ricardo Jose Prieto and Certification of Local Counsel Zev Antell Filing fee $ 75, receipt number AVAEDC-9579268. by Kimberly Lohr. (Antell, Zev)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 11, 2024
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 06/11 1:40 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Samantha Galina on behalf of Kimberly Lohr (Galina, Samantha)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 06/11 1:38 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Zev Hillel Antell on behalf of Kimberly Lohr (Antell, Zev)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 06/11 10:56 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kimberly Lohr ShiftMed, LLC served on 6/10/2024, answer due 7/1/2024 (Curwood, Craig)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 07, 2024
3 3 service Summons Issued Fri 06/07 1:04 PM
Summons Issued as to ShiftMed, LLC, NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Please remove the headers and print two duplexed copies of the electronically issued summons for each Defendant. Please serve one copy of the summons and a copy of the Complaint upon each Defendant. Please ensure that your process server returns the service copy (executed or unexecuted) to your attention and electronically file it using the filing events, Summons Returned Executed or Summons Returned Unexecuted.(Cwel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice to Attorney
Wednesday, June 05, 2024
2 2 misc Proposed Summons Wed 06/05 9:50 AM
Proposed Summons re1 Complaint, by Kimberly Lohr. (Curwood, Craig)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 06/05 9:49 AM
Complaint Plaintiff's Original Collective Action Complaint ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number AVAEDC-9564444.), filed by Kimberly Lohr.(Curwood, Craig)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Ex. 1 Consent of Kimberly Lohr,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Initial Case Assignment Fri 06/07 1:02 PM
Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Michael S Nachmanoff and US Magistrate Judge William B. Porter. (Cwel)
Related: [-]