Virginia Eastern District Court
Judge:Anthony J Trenga
Referred: Ivan D Davis
Case #: 1:24-cv-00963
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Case Filed:Jun 05, 2024
Terminated:Mar 07, 2025
Last checked: Monday Dec 02, 2024 4:00 AM EST
Defendant
The United States Senate Federal Credit Union
1310 Braddock Place
Alexandria, VA 22314
Represented By
Andrew Joseph Smith
Berenzweig Leonard LLP
contact info
Kristin A. Zech
Berenzweig Leonard LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Omar Ramsay
43400 Blantyre Court
Ashburn, VA 20147
Represented By
Samantha Vanterpool
The Spiggle Law Firm, PC
contact info
Michael Steven Ludwig
The Spiggle Law Firm, P.C.
contact info
Francisco Egbert Mundaca
The Spiggle Law Firm
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, March 07, 2025
50 50 order Judgment - Clerk Mon 03/10 10:41 AM
JUDGMENT is hereby entered in favor of Defendant The United States Senate Federal Credit Union and Against Plaintiff Omar Ramsay on all Remaining counts Pursuant to the Order of this Court entered on March 7, 2025 and in accordance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 58. Signed by Clerk on 3/7/2025. (Sbro, )
Related: [-]
49 49 18 pgs order Order on Motion for Summary Judgment Mon 03/10 10:35 AM
ORDERED that Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment, [Doc. No. 42], be, and the same hereby is, GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 3/7/2025. (Sbro, )
Related: [-]