Florida Middle District Court
Judge:Carlos E Mendoza
Referred: Daniel C Irick
Case #: 6:24-cv-01037
Nature of Suit485 Other Statutes - Telephone Consumer Protection Act
Cause47:227 Restrictions of Use of Telephone Equipment
Case Filed:Jun 05, 2024
Re-opened:Apr 22, 2025
Terminated:Apr 30, 2025
Last checked: Monday Dec 02, 2024 3:24 AM EST
Defendant
Thomas Roofing and Repair Inc.
Represented By
Thomas Stephen Dolney
Dolney Law, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
David Tom
Represented By
Rachel Elizabeth Kaufman
Kaufman P.A.
contact info
Avi Robert Kaufman
Kaufman P.A.
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Pinnacle Marketing Solutions LLC
Terminated: 09/13/2024


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Thursday, May 01, 2025
42 42 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Thu 05/01 11:20 AM
NOTICE of Local Rule 1.11(e), which provides that, unless an order states another time, a seal under Rule 1.11 expires ninety days after a case is closed and all appeals are exhausted. To prevent the content of a sealed item from appearing on the docket after the seal expires, a party or interested non-party must move for relief before the seal expires. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (JTM)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
41 41 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Wed 04/30 4:58 PM
ORDER dismissing case re 40 Joint Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice. Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii), the Clerk of Court is directed to close this case. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 4/30/2025. (ALL)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
40 40 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Tue 04/29 3:07 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Thomas Roofing and Repair Inc.. (Dolney, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
39 39 order Order Tue 04/22 11:06 AM
ENDORSED ORDER directing the Clerk to reopen this case in light of the 38 Status Report. On or before May 13, 2025, the parties shall file an amended Case Management Report. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 4/22/2025. (KMD)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 21, 2025
38 38 misc Status report Mon 04/21 11:53 AM
STATUS report by Thomas Roofing and Repair Inc. (Dolney, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 20, 2025
37 37 misc Status report Thu 02/20 8:05 PM
STATUS report by Thomas Roofing and Repair Inc.. (Dolney, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 04, 2024
36 36 2 pgs order Order Staying Case Mon 11/04 4:17 PM
It is ORDERED that this case is STAYED until further order of the Court. Defendant shall file a status report every 180 days and within fourteen days of the conclusion of the bankruptcy proceedings. The Clerk is directed to administratively close this case. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 11/4/2024. (ALL)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 01, 2024
35 35 2 pgs misc Suggestion of Fri 11/01 10:11 AM
SUGGESTION of Bankruptcy by Thomas Roofing and Repair Inc.. (Dolney, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 22, 2024
34 34 adr Notice of selection of mediator Tue 10/22 12:19 PM
NOTICE OF SELECTION of David E. Jones as mediator by David Tom.(Kaufman, Avi)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 08, 2024
33 33 1 pgs order Order directing compliance Tue 10/08 11:29 AM
The parties are directed to confer, and then advise the Court, on the selection of a mediator, on or before October 22, 2024. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 10/8/2024. (ALL)
Related: [-]
32 32 order Case Management Scheduling Order Tue 10/08 11:27 AM
CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 12/13/2024, Joinder of Parties due by 12/13/2024, Discovery due by 10/3/2025, Dispositive motions due by 11/4/2025, Pretrial statement due by 3/9/2026, All other motions due by 3/9/2026, Plaintiff disclosure of expert report due by 8/5/2025, Defendant disclosure of expert report due by 9/4/2025, Trial Status Conference set for 3/19/2026 at 10:00 AM in Orlando Courtroom 5 B before Judge Carlos E. Mendoza. Jury Trial set for April 2026 trial term at 08:30 AM in Orlando Courtroom 5 B before Judge Carlos E. Mendoza. Conduct mediation hearing by 10/17/2025. Lead counsel to coordinate dates. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 10/8/2024. (ALL)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 01, 2024
31 31 misc Case Management Report Tue 10/01 9:49 AM
CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Kaufman, Avi)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 24, 2024
29 29 minutes Case Management Conference Tue 09/24 2:17 PM
Minute Entry. Virtual Proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick: IDEAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE held on 9/24/2024. (Digital / Zoom) (TNP)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 13, 2024
28 28 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Fri 09/13 5:13 PM
ORDER dismissing case 27 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal without prejudice as to Defendant Pinnacle Marketing Solutions LLC. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate Pinnacle Marketing Solutions LLC as a Defendant in this case and amend the case style accordingly. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 9/13/2024. (ALL)
Related: [-]
27 27 notice Notice (Other) Fri 09/13 9:14 AM
NOTICE of voluntary dismissal of Defendant Pinnacle Marketing Solutions LLC Only re 26 Order to show cause by David Tom (Kaufman, Avi) Modified text on 9/13/2024 (MCB)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 06, 2024
26 26 order Order to show cause Fri 09/06 10:55 AM
ENDORSED ORDER directing Plaintiff to SHOW CAUSE within seven days from the date of this Order as to why this case should not be dismissed for failing to effectuate service and file proof of the same in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(l)-(m) as to Defendant Pinnacle Marketing Solutions LLC. Alternatively, Plaintiff may cure their failure by filing proof of service within seven days, thereby discharging the order to show cause. Failure to comply with this Order may result in the dismissal of this action without further notice. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 9/6/2024. (MEH)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 04, 2024
25 25 10 pgs answer Answer to Complaint Wed 09/04 9:25 PM
ANSWER and affirmative defenses to 1 Complaint by Thomas Roofing and Repair Inc..(Dolney, Thomas)
Related: [-]
24 24 notice Notice of Hearing Wed 09/04 3:30 PM
NOTICE of hearing: IDEAL Case Management Conference set for 9/24/2024 at 10:00 AM via Zoom Video Conference before Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick. A Zoom link will be sent to counsel via email. (TNP)
Related: [-]
23 23 order Order on Motion to Continue Wed 09/04 8:38 AM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 22 Unopposed Motion to Continue Hearing. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 9/4/2024. (Irick, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 29, 2024
22 22 motion Continue Thu 08/29 6:40 PM
Unopposed MOTION to Continue by Thomas Roofing and Repair Inc..(Dolney, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Hearing Agenda
21 21 notice Notice of Hearing Thu 08/29 3:59 PM
NOTICE of hearing: IDEAL Case Management Conference set for 9/4/2024 at 10:30 AM via Zoom Video Conference before Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick. A Zoom link will be sent to counsel via email. (TNP) Modified on 8/29/2024 (TNP)
Related: [-]
20 20 order Order on Motion for Hearing / Conference Thu 08/29 2:50 PM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 18 Joint Motion for Case Management Conference. The conference will be set pursuant to separate notice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 8/29/2024. (JEB)
Related: [-]
19 19 misc Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 08/29 9:28 AM
CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re3 Order by Thomas Roofing and Repair Inc.. (Dolney, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 28, 2024
18 18 motion Hearing / Conference Wed 08/28 11:49 AM
Joint MOTION for Case Management Conference re9 Notice of Referral to IDEAL Program by David Tom. (Kaufman, Avi)
Related: [-]
17 17 misc Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 08/28 11:48 AM
CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by David Tom. (Kaufman, Avi)
Related: [-]
16 16 order Order to Strike Wed 08/28 11:26 AM
ENDORSED ORDER striking 13 Disclosure Statement. The filing fails to comply with the amended disclosure form, which went into effect on April 1, 2024, and is available on Judge Mendoza's page of the Middle District of Florida website. On or before September 4, 2024, Defendant Thomas Roofing and Repair, Inc. is directed to file a compliant disclosure form. Failure to do so may result in the entry of default without further notice. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 8/28/2024. (ALL)
Related: [-]
15 15 order Order to Strike Wed 08/28 11:25 AM
ENDORSED ORDER striking 6 Disclosure Statement. The filing fails to comply with the amended disclosure form, which went into effect on April 1, 2024, and is available on Judge Mendoza's page of the Middle District of Florida website. On or before September 4, 2024, Plaintiff is directed to file a compliant disclosure form. Failure to do so may result in the dismissal of this action without further notice. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 8/28/2024. (ALL)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 27, 2024
14 14 notice Notice of a Related Action Tue 08/27 2:15 PM
NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Thomas Roofing and Repair Inc.. Related case(s): No (Dolney, Thomas)
Related: [-]
13 13 misc Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 08/27 2:14 PM
CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re3 Order by Thomas Roofing and Repair Inc.. (Dolney, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 19, 2024
12 12 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Mon 08/19 11:41 AM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 11 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant Thomas Roofing and Repair Inc. must respond to the Complaint by 9/4/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 8/19/2024. (Irick, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 14, 2024
11 11 motion Extension of Time to File Answer / Respond to Complaint Wed 08/14 5:02 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint by Thomas Roofing and Repair Inc.. (Dolney, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 02, 2024
10 10 service Summons returned executed Fri 08/02 11:11 AM
RETURN of service executed on 7/24/24 by David Tom as to Thomas Roofing and Repair Inc.. (Kaufman, Avi)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 12, 2024
9 9 notice Notice of Referral to IDEAL Program Wed 06/12 10:33 AM
NOTICE of Order Referring Case to U.S. Magistrate Judge for IDEAL Program. See attached Order for important deadlines and information about the IDEAL Program. (TNP)
Related: [-]
8 8 order Standing Order Wed 06/12 10:33 AM
ORDER ON DISCOVERY MOTIONS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 1/2/2020. (TNP)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 07, 2024
7 7 notice Notice of a Related Action Fri 06/07 1:14 PM
NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by David Tom. Related case(s): No (Kaufman, Avi)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 06/07 1:13 PM
CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by David Tom. (Kaufman, Avi)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 06, 2024
5 5 service Summons issued Thu 06/06 10:22 AM
SUMMONS issued as to Pinnacle Marketing Solutions LLC, Thomas Roofing and Repair Inc. (ELM)
Related: [-]
4 4 order Order Thu 06/06 8:56 AM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL AND PARTIES: Failure to comply with ANY Local Rules or Court Orders may result in the imposition of sanctions including, but not limited to, the dismissal of this action or entry of default without further notice. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 6/6/2024. (MEH)
Related: [-]
3 3 2 pgs order Order Thu 06/06 8:56 AM
INITIAL ORDER re: Case Management and Deadlines. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 6/6/2024. (MEH)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 05, 2024
2 2 utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 06/05 3:08 PM
NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Carlos E. Mendoza and Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick. New case number: 6:24-cv-1037-CEM-DCI. (TNP)
Related: [-]
1 1 22 pgs cmp Complaint Wed 06/05 1:50 PM
COMPLAINT against Pinnacle Marketing Solutions LLC, Thomas Roofing and Repair Inc. with Jury Demand (Filing fee $405 receipt number AFLMDC-22165529) filed by David Tom.(Kaufman, Avi)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Proposed Summons,
Att: 3 Proposed Summons