Florida Middle District Court
Judge:Steven D Merryday
Referred: Sean P Flynn
Case #: 8:24-cv-01374
Nature of Suit880 Civil Rights - Defend Trade Secrets Act of 2016 (DTSA)
Cause18:1836(a) Injunction against Misappropriation of Trade Secrets
Case Filed:Jun 05, 2024
Terminated:Sep 06, 2024
Last checked: Monday Dec 02, 2024 3:24 AM EST
Defendant
Bigbattery, Inc.
Represented By
Matthew S. Nelles
Johnson & Martin, P.A.
contact info
Plaintiff
Icon EV LLC
Represented By
David S. Delrahim
Shumaker, Loop & Kendrick, LLP
contact info
Jillian Margaret Askren
Shumaker, Loop & Kendrick, LLP
contact info
Jeffrey B. Fabian
Shumaker, Loop & Kendrick, LLP
contact info
John Todd Timmerman
Shumaker, Loop & Kendrick, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Monday, September 09, 2024
29 29 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Mon 09/09 9:29 AM
NOTICE of Local Rule 1.11(e), which provides that, unless an order states another time, a seal under Rule 1.11 expires ninety days after a case is closed and all appeals are exhausted. To prevent the content of a sealed item from appearing on the docket after the seal expires, a party or interested non-party must move for relief before the seal expires. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (ARL)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 06, 2024
28 28 order Order on Motion to Dismiss Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Order on Motion for Hearing / Conference Fri 09/06 4:22 PM
ENDORSED ORDER: In accord with the parties' stipulation (Doc. 27 ), the action is DISMISSED. The pending motions (Doc. 15 , Doc. 24 ) are DENIED AS MOOT. The clerk must close the case. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 9/6/2024. (DJL)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 05, 2024
27 27 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Thu 09/05 9:58 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal (Joint) by Icon EV LLC. (Delrahim, David)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 14, 2024
26 26 misc Case Management Report Wed 08/14 2:08 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Timmerman, John)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 01, 2024
25 25 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Thu 08/01 1:18 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re24 MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically Hearing on Motion to Dismiss or alternatively, for Leave to File Reply filed by Icon EV LLC. (Fabian, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
24 24 motion Miscellaneous Relief Hearing / Conference Thu 08/01 11:26 AM
UNOPPOSED MOTION for Hearing and/or Oral Argument on15 Motion to Dismiss or alternatively, MOTION for Leave to File Reply by Bigbattery, Inc. (Nelles, Matthew) . Added MOTION for Hearing on 8/1/2024 (ELM). Modified on 8/1/2024 to edit text (ELM)
Related: [-]
23 23 notice Notice (Other) Thu 08/01 11:03 AM
NOTICE of Filing Hearing Transcript by Bigbattery, Inc.(Nelles, Matthew) Modified on 8/1/2024 to edit text (ELM)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Hearing Transcript
22 22 notice Notice (Other) Thu 08/01 9:40 AM
NOTICE of Filing Amended Exhibit 6 by Icon EV LLC re21 Response to Motion(Fabian, Jeffrey) Modified on 8/1/2024 to edit text (ELM)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 6 to Icon's Response to BigBattery's Motion to Dismiss
Monday, July 29, 2024
21 21 respm Response to motion Mon 07/29 5:35 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re15 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint Based on First to File Rule filed by Icon EV LLC.(Timmerman, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - California Litigation Docket,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - 2nd Amended Complaint,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 - Ex Parte Application,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4 - Order,
Att: 5 Exhibit 5 - June 11th Transcript,
Att: 6 Exhibit 6 - June 13th Transcript
20 20 misc Declaration Mon 07/29 3:56 PM
DECLARATION of Kalyan Pokala re15 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint Based on First to File Rule by Bigbattery, Inc..(Nelles, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Declaration K Pokala
Tuesday, July 16, 2024
19 19 misc Supplement Tue 07/16 7:28 PM
SUPPLEMENT re15 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint Based on First to File Rule (Specifically Local Rule 3.01(g) Certification) by Bigbattery, Inc.. (Nelles, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 15, 2024
18 18 notice Notice of a Related Action Mon 07/15 11:04 PM
NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Bigbattery, Inc.. Related case(s): Yes (Nelles, Matthew)
Related: [-]
17 17 notice Notice of Lead Counsel Designation Mon 07/15 11:01 PM
NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Matthew S. Nelles on behalf of Bigbattery, Inc.. Lead Counsel: Matthew S. Nelles. (Nelles, Matthew)
Related: [-]
16 16 misc Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 07/15 10:55 PM
CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Bigbattery, Inc.. (Nelles, Matthew)
Related: [-]
15 15 motion Dismiss Mon 07/15 10:39 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Complaint Based on First to File Rule by Bigbattery, Inc..(Nelles, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D
Monday, July 08, 2024
14 14 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Mon 07/08 5:00 PM
ENDORSED ORDER: The defendant's unopposed motion (Doc. 13 ) to extend the time within which to respond to the complaint is GRANTED. No later than JULY 15, 2024, the defendant must respond. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 7/8/2024. (WBW)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 03, 2024
13 13 motion Extension of Time to File Answer / Respond to Complaint Wed 07/03 4:40 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint by Bigbattery, Inc.. (Nelles, Matthew)
Related: [-]
12 12 3 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Wed 07/03 3:21 PM
ORDER denying without prejudice 11 --motion for an extension of time. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 7/3/2024. (WBW)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 01, 2024
11 11 motion Extension of Time to File Answer / Respond to Complaint Mon 07/01 4:02 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint by Bigbattery, Inc.. (Nelles, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 18, 2024
10 10 service Summons returned executed Tue 06/18 3:03 PM
RETURN of service executed on June 10, 2024 by Icon EV LLC as to Bigbattery, Inc.. (Timmerman, John)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 07, 2024
9 9 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 06/07 9:43 AM
CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Icon EV LLC. (Timmerman, John)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice of a Related Action Fri 06/07 9:41 AM
NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Icon EV LLC. Related case(s): Yes (Timmerman, John)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 06, 2024
7 7 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Thu 06/06 9:37 AM
NOTICE of Local Rule 1.07(c) and Local Rule 3.02(a)(2). -Local Rule 1.07(c) requires lead counsel to file promptly a Notice of a Related Action identifying and describing any related action either pending or closed in the Middle District or elsewhere. -Local Rule 3.02(a)(2) requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (DAY)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 05, 2024
6 6 service Summons issued Wed 06/05 2:38 PM
SUMMONS issued as to Bigbattery, Inc. (CTR)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Lead Counsel Designation Wed 06/05 2:13 PM
NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by John Todd Timmerman on behalf of ICON EV LLC. Lead Counsel: J. Todd Timmerman. (Timmerman, John)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Wed 06/05 12:29 PM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL David Delrahim of Local Rule 2.01(b)(2)(B), which requires members of the Middle District bar to maintain with the clerk a current telephone number, mailing address, and email address. Update your contact information for the Middle District through PACER. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (ARL)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Wed 06/05 12:29 PM
NOTICE of Local Rule 2.02(a) to ALL COUNSEL, which states, "The first paper filed on behalf of a party must designate only one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action." Counsel must file a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation identifying lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (ARL)
Related: [-]
2 2 utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 06/05 12:28 PM
NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Steven D. Merryday and Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn. New case number: 8:24-cv-1374-SDM-SPF. (ARL)
Related: [-]
1 1 10 pgs cmp Complaint Wed 06/05 12:14 PM
COMPLAINT for Declaratory Relief, Permanent Injunctive Relief Requested against Bigbattery, Inc. (Filing fee $405 receipt number AFLMDC-22164839) filed by Icon EV LLC.(Timmerman, John) Modified on 6/5/2024 (CTR)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Proposed Summons