Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:24-bk-80579

Illinois Northern - Chicago Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Thomas M Lynch
Case #: 3:24-ap-96010
Nature of Suit68 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury
Case Filed:Jun 05, 2024
Terminated:Oct 11, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
Hotopp Properties, Inc
Represented By
Hotopp Properties, Inc
contact info
Plaintiff
Jennifer Budd
Represented By
Sheryl Melanie Weikal
Sheryl Ring, Esq.
contact info
Plaintiff
Charles Budd
Represented By
Sheryl Melanie Weikal
Sheryl Ring, Esq.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/13/2025 1:06 PM CDT
Friday, October 11, 2024
10 10 court Close Adversary Case Fri 10/11 8:35 AM
Adversary Case 3:24-ap-96010 Closed . (Virgen, Vianey)
Related: [-]
9 9 court Hearing Stricken (Other) Fri 10/11 7:38 AM
Hearing Scheduled for 10/16/2024 Stricken Related [+]. (Kuczynski, Mimi)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Thursday, October 10, 2024
8 8 misc Stipulation to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Thu 10/10 3:42 PM
Stipulation to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Filed by Richard G Larsen on behalf of Hotopp Properties, Inc. (Larsen, Richard)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 02, 2024
7 7 court Hearing Continued (Motion) Wed 10/02 4:28 PM
(E)Hearing Continued Related [+]. Status hearing scheduled for 10/16/2024 at 11:00 AM at Appear in Courtroom 3100, 327 S. Church St., Rockford, IL 61101, or Using Zoom - Judge Lynch. (Kuczynski, Mimi)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Wednesday, August 28, 2024
6 6 court Hearing Continued (Motion) Wed 08/28 4:47 PM
(E)Hearing Continued Related [+]. Status hearing scheduled for 10/02/2024 at 11:30 AM at Appear in Courtroom 3100, 327 S. Church St., Rockford, IL 61101, or Using Zoom - Judge Lynch. (Kuczynski, Mimi)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Wednesday, July 31, 2024
5 5 court Hearing Continued (Motion) Wed 07/31 3:21 PM
(E)Hearing Continued Related [+]. Status hearing scheduled for 08/28/2024 at 11:00 AM at Appear in Courtroom 3100, 327 S. Church St., Rockford, IL 61101, or Using Zoom - Judge Lynch. (Kuczynski, Mimi)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Wednesday, July 03, 2024
4 4 court Hearing Continued (Motion) Wed 07/03 1:46 PM
(E)Hearing Continued Related [+]. Status hearing scheduled for 07/31/2024 at 11:00 AM at Appear in Courtroom 3100, 327 S. Church St., Rockford, IL 61101, or Using Zoom - Judge Lynch. (Kuczynski, Mimi)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Wednesday, June 12, 2024
3 3 crditcrd none Wed 06/12 9:11 AM
Receipt of Complaint([LINK 24-96010 ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A48009601. Fee Amount $ 350.00 (Weikal, Sheryl) Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
Wednesday, June 05, 2024
2 2 court Summons Issued (auto) Wed 06/05 12:39 PM
Summons Issued on Hotopp Properties, Inc Answer Due 07/5/2024 (Admin)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 06/05 12:39 PM
Adversary case 24-96010 (68 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury)): Complaint by Jennifer Budd, Charles Budd against Hotopp Properties, Inc. Fee Amount $350. Status hearing to be held on 7/3/2024 at 11:00 AM at Appear In Courtroom 3100, 327 S. Church St, Rockford, IL 61101 or Using Zoom- Judge Lynch. (Weikal, Sheryl)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Adversary Cover Sheet