California Central District Court
Judge:Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong
Referred: Jacqueline Chooljian
Case #: 2:24-cv-04689
Nature of Suit485 Other Statutes - Telephone Consumer Protection Act
Cause47:227 Restrictions of Use of Telephone Equipment
Case Filed:Jun 05, 2024
Terminated:Nov 13, 2024
Last checked: Monday Dec 02, 2024 12:21 AM PST
Defendant
Auto Knight Motor Club, Inc.
Represented By
Samuel Zeev Hyams
Kilpatrick Townsend And Stockton LLP
contact info
Jeffrey H. Fisher
Kilpatrick Townsend And Stockton LLP
contact info
Raymond O. Aghaian
Bakerhostetler
contact info
Defendant
Auto Services, LLC
Defendant
Dealer Loyalty Protection, Inc.
Defendant
Matrix Warranty Solutions, Inc.
Defendant
Sing for Service, LLC
Represented By
Justin A Allen
Varnum LLP
contact info
Benjamin R. King
Loeb And Loeb LLP
contact info
Brian B. Doyle
Varnum LLP
contact info
Defendant
Vehicle Activaton Center
Defendant
Does
Defendant
Trinity Auto Services, LLC
Plaintiff
Alex Guralnik
Represented By
Charles Z Stein
Davidovich Stein Law Group LLP
contact info
Niv Vladimir Davidovich
Davidovich Stein Law Group, LLP
contact info
Elan N. Stone
Davidovich Stein Law Group LLP
contact info
Solomon Salehani
Davidvoich Stein Law Group LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Wednesday, November 13, 2024
37 37 notice Voluntary Dismissal of a Case (Pursuant to FRCP 41a (1)) Wed 11/13 2:38 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff Alex Guralnik. Dismissal is with prejudice. (Davidovich, Niv)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 01, 2024
34 34 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64) Tue 10/01 6:32 PM
APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Brian B. Doyle to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Sing for Service, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-38321190) filed by Defendant Sing for Service, LLC. (King, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
33 33 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64) Tue 10/01 6:28 PM
APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Justin Andrew Allen to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Sing for Service, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-38321172) filed by Defendant Sing for Service, LLC. (King, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, September 11, 2024
32 32 order Extension of Time to File Mon 09/16 11:43 AM
(IN CHAMBERS) ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT [ECF NO.25 ] by Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong. Finding good cause therefor, the Court hereby GRANTS the Motion for Extension of Time. The Moving Defendants' deadline to respond to Plaintiffs Complaint shall be fourteen (14) days after the Court issues an order on the Motion to Stay the Case Pending Arbitration. (See document for further details) (yl)
Related: [-]
31 31 respm Objection/Opposition (Motion related) Wed 09/11 3:42 PM
OPPOSITION re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Stay Case pending Arbitration 24 filed by Plaintiff Alex Guralnik. (Davidovich, Niv)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 05, 2024
30 30 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Thu 09/05 2:42 PM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER CONTINUING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO STAY ARBITRATION (ECF No.24 ) by Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong: The Court, on its own motion, continues the Motion from October 10, 2024 to January 9, 2025 at 10:00 a.m. before Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong. IT IS SO ORDERED.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (dbe)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 30, 2024
29 29 order Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 08/30 5:10 PM
ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE by Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong: GRANTING28 Non-Resident Attorney Raymond O. Aghaian APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Auto Motor Club, designating Raymond O. Aghaian as local counsel. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (lt)
Related: [-]
28 28 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64) Fri 08/30 1:11 PM
APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Jeffrey H. Fisher to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Auto Knight Motor Club, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500.00 Previously Paid on 8/29/2024, Receipt No. ACACDC-38116197) filed by Defendant Auto Knight Motor Club, Inc.. (Aghaian, Raymond)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Receipt for Payment of Pro Hac Vice Fees,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
Thursday, August 29, 2024
27 27 notice Notice of Deficiency in Electronically filed Pro Hac Vice Application (G-112C) - optional html form Thu 08/29 12:04 PM
NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Jeffrey H. Fisher to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Auto Knight Motor Club, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-38116197)26 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 83-2.1.3.4 Local counsel does not maintain an office within the District for the practice of law, in which the attorney is physically present on a regular basis to conduct business. (lt)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 28, 2024
26 26 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64) Wed 08/28 5:05 PM
APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Jeffrey H. Fisher to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Auto Knight Motor Club, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-38116197) filed by Defendant Auto Knight Motor Club, Inc.. (Hyams, Samuel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
25 25 motion Extension of Time to File Document Wed 08/28 1:51 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Pending Order re Motion to Stay Pending Arbitration filed by Defendants Auto Knight Motor Club, Inc., Dealer Loyalty Protection, Inc., Sing for Service, LLC. Motion set for hearing on 10/10/2024 at 10:00 AM before Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong. (Hyams, Samuel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
24 24 motion Stay Case Wed 08/28 1:33 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Stay Case pending Arbitration filed by Defendants Auto Knight Motor Club, Inc., Dealer Loyalty Protection, Inc., Sing for Service, LLC. Motion set for hearing on 10/10/2024 at 10:00 AM before Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong. (Hyams, Samuel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
23 23 notice Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123) Wed 08/28 12:58 PM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Benjamin R. King counsel for Defendant Sing for Service, LLC. Adding Benjamin King as counsel of record for Sing for Service, LLC dba MEPCO for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Sing for Service, LLC dba MEPCO. (Attorney Benjamin R. King added to party Sing for Service, LLC(pty:dft))(King, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 16, 2024
22 22 2 pgs order Order Extending Answer Due Deadline Mon 08/19 4:25 PM
ORDER GRANTING SECOND STIPULATION AND EXTENDING DEFENDANT AUTO KNIGHT MOTOR CLUB INC.'S TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT [ECF NO.20 ] by Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong. Upon stipulation of Plaintiff and Defendant Auto Knight Motor Club, Inc., and upon good cause shown, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: The time within which Defendant Auto Knight Motor Club, Inc. may respond to the Complaint is extended to August 28, 2024. (yl)
Related: [-]
21 21 2 pgs order Order Fri 08/16 2:21 PM
ORDER APPROVING SECOND STIPULATION AND EXTENDING DEFENDANT AUTO KNIGHT MOTOR CLUB INC.'S TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT by Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong. Upon stipulation of Plaintiff and Defendant Auto Knight Motor Club, Inc., and upon good cause shown, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: The time within which Defendant Auto Knight Motor Club, Inc. may respond to the Complaint is extended to August 28, 2024. (yl)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 14, 2024
20 20 stip Extending Time to Answer (More than 30 days) Wed 08/14 10:58 AM
Second STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to 08/28/2024 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Defendant Auto Knight Motor Club, Inc..(Hyams, Samuel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, July 05, 2024
19 19 order Extending Answer Due Deadline Mon 07/08 11:57 AM
ORDER APPROVING JOINT STIPULATION AND EXTENDING DEFENDANT AUTO KNIGHT MOTOR CLUB INC.'S TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT,18 by Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: 1. The time within which Defendant Auto Knight Motor Club, Inc. may respond to the Complaint is extended to August 14, 2024 (es)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 02, 2024
18 18 stip Extending Time to Answer (More than 30 days) Tue 07/02 1:51 PM
STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to August 14, 2024 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Defendant Auto Knight Motor Club, Inc..(Attorney Samuel Zeev Hyams added to party Auto Knight Motor Club, Inc. (pty:dft))(Hyams, Samuel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, June 21, 2024
17 17 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Fri 06/21 1:06 PM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong: This matter has been assigned to District Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong. The Court refers counsel to the Court's Initial Standing Order found on the Court's website under Judge Frimpong's Procedures and Schedules. Please read the Standing Order carefully. It is the responsibilities of the parties to maintain familiarly with the Standing Order and any future amendments that the Court may issue by periodically checking the Court's website for the operative version of the Standing Order. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (dbe)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 18, 2024
16 16 service Waiver of Service Executed Tue 06/18 5:07 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Alex Guralnik. upon Sing for Service, LLC waiver sent by Plaintiff on 6/17/2024, answer due 8/16/2024. Waiver of Service signed by Justin A. Allen (P84698). (Davidovich, Niv)
Related: [-]
15 15 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Tue 06/18 2:33 PM
CORRECTED NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong and Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. (lh)
Related: [-]
14 14 notice Clerical Error (G-11) Tue 06/18 10:35 AM
NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: Due to clerical error this case was assigned to Judge David O. Carter and Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. This case has been randomly reassigned to Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong and Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian for all further proceedings. The case will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:24-cv-04689 MEMF(JCx). (rn)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 11, 2024
13 13 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Tue 06/11 5:56 PM
CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Alex Guralnik, (Davidovich, Niv)
Related: [-]
12 12 service Summons Issued Tue 06/11 12:22 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendants Auto Knight Motor Club, Inc., Dealer Loyalty Protection, Inc., Matrix Warranty Solutions, Inc., Sing for Service, LLC, Trinity Auto Services, LLC, Vehicle Activaton Center. (twdb)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 10, 2024
11 11 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Mon 06/10 4:22 PM
INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOLLOWING ASSIGNMENT OF CIVIL CASE by Judge David O. Carter. (kdu)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Summons Request Mon 06/10 1:48 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Notice of Deficiency in Request to Issue Summons,9 filed by Plaintiff Alex Guralnik.(Davidovich, Niv)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Supplement Summons-Attachment A
9 9 notice Deficiency in Summons Mon 06/10 12:35 PM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request8 . The following error(s) was found: Add one defendant's name in the TO: Section and then see attached. There is no Trinity Auto Services LLC named as a defendant in this case. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (twdb)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 07, 2024
8 8 notice Summons Request Fri 06/07 7:00 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff Alex Guralnik.(Davidovich, Niv)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Supplement Summons-Attachment A
7 7 notice Deficiency in Summons Fri 06/07 2:09 PM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request3 . The following error(s) was found: The caption of the summons must match the caption of the complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write see attached.Next, attach a face page of the complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. Summons is not directed to the defendant(s). The defendants name must appear in the To:section of the summons. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (et)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Fri 06/07 1:58 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (et)
Related: [-]
5 5 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Fri 06/07 1:57 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Fri 06/07 1:57 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge David O. Carter and Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (et)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 05, 2024
3 3 notice Summons Request Wed 06/05 1:35 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)2 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff Alex Guralnik.(Davidovich, Niv)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Supplement Summons-Attachment A
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Wed 06/05 1:27 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Alex Guralnik. (Davidovich, Niv)
Related: [-]
1 1 18 pgs cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Wed 06/05 1:21 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: BCACDC-37596155 - Fee: $405, filed by Plaintiff Alex Guralnik. (Attorney Niv Vladimir Davidovich added to party Alex Guralnik(pty:pla))(Davidovich, Niv)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit