Indiana Northern District Court
Judge:Cristal C Brisco
Referred: Scott J Frankel
Case #: 3:24-cv-00464
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
Cause15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Case Filed:Jun 05, 2024
Last checked: Monday Dec 02, 2024 3:26 AM EST
Defendant
Nickel City Group LLC
Defendant
Gregory Cipressi
Defendant
Alicia Hintz
Defendant
Nickel City Acquisitions LLC
Plaintiff
Kim Hart
Represented By
Jeffrey Wood
Jeff Wood
contact info


Docket last updated: 32 minutes ago
Monday, April 07, 2025
23 23 order Scheduling Order 1 - Terminate Hearings Mon 04/07 2:18 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Parties are REMINDED of their obligation to comply with court-imposed deadlines and orders. The Court now ADOPTS, in part, by reference the parties' agreed discovery plan22 . Consistent with that plan, the Court now enters the instant Rule 16(b) Scheduling Order. The parties will exchange the information required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) by 4/15/2025. The last date to amend the pleadings without leave of court as to plaintiff is 6/11/2025; as to defendant(s) is 6/25/2025. The serving of reports from retained experts under Rule 26(a)(2) are due from plaintiff by 8/8/2025; and from defendant(s) by 9/8/2025. Supplementation under Rule 26(e) is due every six weeks until trial.The last date for the completion of ALL DISCOVERY is 10/3/2025. The deadline to file any discovery-related nondispositive motion is 10/10/2025. The deadline to file any dispositive motions is 11/7/2025. Parties shall name a mediator no later than 7/8/2025. The parties are authorized to mediate until 10/17/2025. The Court hereby VACATES the Preliminary Pretrial Conference scheduled for 4/8/2025, at 9:30 a.m. ET. Signed by Magistrate Judge Scott J Frankel on 4/7/2025. (mrm)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 21, 2025
22 22 misc Report of Rule 26f Planning Meeting Fri 03/21 7:04 PM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Wood, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 27, 2025
21 21 order Clerks Entry of Default - form will be generated Thu 02/27 11:57 AM
CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT against *Nickel City Acquisition LLC and Gregory Cipressi.* regarding20 Application for Clerk's Entry of Default filed by Kim Hart (mrm)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 26, 2025
20 20 misc Application for Clerks Entry of Default Wed 02/26 2:08 PM
APPLICATION FOR CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT by Kim Hart as to Nickel City Acquisition LLC and Gregory Cipressi.(Wood, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - affidavit re military service
19 19 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 02/26 1:13 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kim Hart. Gregory Cipressi served on 12/20/2024, answer due 1/10/2025. (Wood, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
18 18 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 02/26 1:11 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kim Hart. Nickel City Acquisitions LLC served on 12/11/2024, answer due 1/2/2025. (Wood, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 13, 2025
17 17 misc Mag Consent Forms Sent - Standard with pptc - form will be generated Thu 02/13 9:51 AM
MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties. (ers)
Related: [-]
16 16 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Thu 02/13 9:50 AM
ORDER: Telephonic Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 4/8/2025 at 9:30 AM ET before Magistrate Judge Scott J Frankel. Joint Proposed Discovery due by 3/17/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Scott J Frankel on 2/13/2025. (ers)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 16, 2025
15 15 notice Notice Pursuant to Rule 4m - form will be generated Thu 01/16 10:23 AM
NOTICE pursuant to Rule 4(m) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure as to *Nickel City Acquisitions LLC and Gregory Cipressi* that this action may be dismissed for failure to serve process. (ers)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Thu 01/16 10:46 AM
Set Deadlines: Rule 4(m) 90 Day Deadline is 1/31/2025. (ers)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 30, 2024
14 14 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Mon 12/30 9:55 AM
ANSWER to4 Amended Complaint, by Alicia Hintz.(Little, Brendan)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 05, 2024
13 13 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Thu 12/05 5:20 PM
ORDER: Plaintiff's instant motion is GRANTED11 . The deadline to serve Defendants Nickel City Acquisitions LLC, Gregory Cipressi, and Alicia Trinder a/k/a Alicia Hintz, is EXTENDED to 12/20/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Scott J Frankel on 12/5/2024. (rmf)
Related: [-]
12 12 order Clerks Entry of Default - form will be generated Thu 12/05 11:31 AM
CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT against *Nickel City Group LLC* regarding10 Application for Clerk's Entry of Default filed by Kim Hart (nae)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Thu 12/05 11:17 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Per DE9 Nickel City Group LLC answer due 11/5/2024. (nae)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 04, 2024
11 11 motion Extension of Time to File Document Wed 12/04 1:09 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Return of Service Executed as to Nickel City Acquisitions LLC, Gregory Cipressi and Alicia Trider by Plaintiff Kim Hart.(Wood, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - affidavit of Jeffrey Wood,
Att: 2 proposed order
10 10 misc Application for Clerks Entry of Default Wed 12/04 12:45 PM
APPLICATION FOR CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT by Kim Hart as to Nickel City Group LLC.(Wood, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - designation of registered agent
9 9 service Affidavit of Service Wed 12/04 11:14 AM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and First Amended Complaint served on Nickel City Group LLC on 10/15/2024, filed by Kim Hart.(Wood, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - CMRRR card and tracking info
Wednesday, September 18, 2024
8 8 service Summons Issued Wed 09/18 12:35 PM
Summons Issued as to Gregory Cipressi, Alicia Hintz, Nickel City Acquisitions LLC. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (sej)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Summons Reissued/Alias Wed 09/18 12:35 PM
ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED as to Nickel City Group LLC. NOTE: The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (sej)
Related: [-]
6 6 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Wed 09/18 12:34 PM
ORDER: Plaintiffs instant motion is GRANTED5 . The deadline to serve Defendant Nickel City Group, LLC, is EXTENDED to 10/18/2024. While the Court has granted the instant extension request despite no showing good cause, Plaintiff is ADVISED that any future extension requests that fail to meet the requirements of Rule 4(m) may be denied and that this action may be dismissed without prejudice against Nickel City Group, LLC. The Court further ADVISES the plaintiff, through counsel, to use care to comply fully with applicable deadlines and Court rules going forward. Signed by Magistrate Judge Scott J Frankel on 9/18/2024. (sej)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 03, 2024
5 5 motion Extension of Time to File Document Tue 09/03 6:47 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Return of Service Executed by Plaintiff Kim Hart.(Wood, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 proposed order
4 4 cmp Amended Complaint Tue 09/03 5:56 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Kim Hart.(Wood, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 summons as to Nickel City Group,
Att: 2 summons as to Nickel City Acquisitions,
Att: 3 summons as to Alicia Trider Hintz,
Att: 4 summons as to Gregory Cipressi
Wednesday, August 14, 2024
3 3 utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 08/14 1:08 PM
Pursuant to General Order 2024-22 and the retirement of Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr., this case is now reassigned to Magistrate Judge Scott J Frankel. (ksc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 06, 2024
2 2 service Summons Issued Thu 06/06 10:38 AM
Summons Issued as to Nickel City Group LLC. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (rmf)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges Thu 06/06 10:27 AM
**NEW CASE** Judge Cristal C Brisco and Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr added. (rmf)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 05, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 06/05 3:40 PM
COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AINNDC-5593866.), filed by KIM HART.(Wood, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Proposed Summons